EP1200800 - TERRAIN NAVIGATION APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.05.2004 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.01.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 21.02.2007 [2007/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BAE Systems PLC P.O. Box 87 Warwick House Farnborough Aerospace Centre Farnborough Hampshire GU14 6YU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/18] | For all designated states BAE SYSTEMS plc Warwick House, P.O. Box 87, Farnborough Aerospace Centre Farnborough, Hampshire GU14 6YU / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HICKS, Andrew Christopher 66 Church Park Road, Woolwell Plymouth, Devon PL6 7SA / GB | 02 /
SCAYSBROOK, Ian William Courtney Brook Farm, Brook Lane Tavistock, Devon PL19 9DP / GB | 03 /
FOUNTAIN, John Richard 20 Trecarne View, St. Cleer Liskeard, Devon PL14 5BS / GB | [2002/18] | Representative(s) | Rooney, Paul Blaise BAE Systems plc Group Intellectual Property Dept. Lancaster House - P.O. Box 87, Farnborough Aerospace Centre Farnborough, Hampshire GU14 6YU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/18] | Rooney, Paul Blaise BAE Systems plc, Group IP Department, Lancaster House, P.O. Box 87, Farnborough Aerospace Centre Farnborough, Hampshire GU14 6YU / GB | Application number, filing date | 00937077.6 | 08.06.2000 | [2002/18] | WO2000GB02223 | Priority number, date | GB19990015362 | 02.07.1999 Original published format: GB 9915362 | [2002/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0102804 | Date: | 11.01.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1200800 | Date: | 02.05.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.01.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1200800 | Date: | 23.07.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.01.2001 | Classification | IPC: | G01C5/00, G01C21/00, G01C21/16, G01S13/86, G01S17/93 | [2002/18] | CPC: |
G01S17/933 (EP,US);
G01C21/005 (EP,US);
G01S17/42 (EP,US);
G01S17/86 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2004/01] |
Former [2002/18] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BODENNAVIGATIONSGERAET | [2002/18] | English: | TERRAIN NAVIGATION APPARATUS | [2002/18] | French: | APPAREIL DE NAVIGATION SUR LE TERRAIN | [2002/18] | Entry into regional phase | 29.11.2001 | National basic fee paid | 29.11.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.11.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.01.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 29.11.2001 | Examination requested [2002/18] | 23.01.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.05.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 08.05.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.04.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 23.07.2003 | BE | 23.07.2003 | CH | 23.07.2003 | CY | 23.07.2003 | FI | 23.07.2003 | LI | 23.07.2003 | NL | 23.07.2003 | DK | 23.10.2003 | GR | 23.10.2003 | PT | 23.12.2003 | [2007/08] |
Former [2004/31] | AT | 23.07.2003 | |
BE | 23.07.2003 | ||
CH | 23.07.2003 | ||
FI | 23.07.2003 | ||
LI | 23.07.2003 | ||
NL | 23.07.2003 | ||
DK | 23.10.2003 | ||
GR | 23.10.2003 | ||
PT | 23.12.2003 | ||
Former [2004/29] | AT | 23.07.2003 | |
BE | 23.07.2003 | ||
CH | 23.07.2003 | ||
FI | 23.07.2003 | ||
LI | 23.07.2003 | ||
NL | 23.07.2003 | ||
DK | 23.10.2003 | ||
GR | 23.10.2003 | ||
Former [2004/28] | AT | 23.07.2003 | |
BE | 23.07.2003 | ||
CH | 23.07.2003 | ||
FI | 23.07.2003 | ||
LI | 23.07.2003 | ||
NL | 23.07.2003 | ||
GR | 23.10.2003 | ||
Former [2004/22] | AT | 23.07.2003 | |
CH | 23.07.2003 | ||
FI | 23.07.2003 | ||
LI | 23.07.2003 | ||
NL | 23.07.2003 | ||
GR | 23.10.2003 | ||
Former [2004/14] | AT | 23.07.2003 | |
FI | 23.07.2003 | ||
NL | 23.07.2003 | ||
GR | 23.10.2003 | ||
Former [2004/13] | FI | 23.07.2003 | |
NL | 23.07.2003 | ||
Former [2004/12] | FI | 23.07.2003 | Cited in | International search | [Y]US4168524 (SOLTZ J ARNOLD, et al) [Y] 1,2,7,15 * column 3, line 26 - column 5, line 21 * * column 5, line 52 - column 9, line 43; figures 1,3 *; | [YA]EP0061564 (E SYSTEMS INC [US]) [Y] 1-7,15 * page 9, line 1 - page 12, line 23; figure 1 * [A] 10-13; | [Y]US5216236 (BLAIS FRANCOIS [CA]) [Y] 6 * column 1, lines 10-28 * * column 2, lines 49-55 ** column 5, lines 13-25; figures 1,5,7-9 *; | [Y]US5359403 (GROSMANN BENOIST [FR], et al) [Y] 3-5 * column 1, lines 8-12 * * column 3, line 41 - column 4, line 37; figures 1,4,6 * |