EP1191943 - Anti-allergic peptides [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2002/14] | NOVEL ANTI-ALLERGIC AGENTS | ||
[2009/25] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.09.2010 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.09.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): NL | published on 31.10.2012 [2012/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ramot at Tel-Aviv University Ltd. 32 Haim Levanon Street Tel-Aviv 69975 / IL | [2006/21] |
Former [2002/14] | For all designated states Allergene Ltd. 2A Katzir Street, Tel Hashomer 52656 Ramat Gan / IL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
EISENBERG, Ronit 6 Lotus Street 74047 Ness-Ziona / IL | 02 /
RAZ, Tamar 72/12 He-Beiyar Street 48056 Rosh Haayin / IL | [2002/14] | Representative(s) | Wachenfeld, Joachim, et al Vossius & Partner Postfach 86 07 67 81634 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/33] | Wachenfeld, Joachim, et al Vossius & Partner Postfach 86 07 67 81634 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/31] | Vossius & Partner Postfach 86 07 67 81634 München / DE | ||
Former [2002/14] | Becker Kurig Straus Patentanwälte Bavariastrasse 7 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00937154.3 | 14.06.2000 | [2002/14] | WO2000IL00346 | Priority number, date | IL19990130526 | 17.06.1999 Original published format: IL 13052699 | [2002/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0078346 | Date: | 28.12.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1191943 | Date: | 03.04.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.12.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1191943 | Date: | 11.11.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 28.12.2000 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.08.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A61K39/385, A61K47/48, C07K14/47 | [2009/25] | CPC: |
C12N15/625 (EP,US);
A61K39/0008 (EP,US);
A61K47/646 (EP,US);
A61P1/00 (EP);
A61P1/04 (EP);
A61P11/02 (EP);
A61P11/06 (EP);
A61P13/10 (EP);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P17/06 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/06 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P27/14 (EP);
A61P37/00 (EP);
A61P37/06 (EP);
A61P37/08 (EP);
C07K14/4722 (EP,US);
A61K2039/6031 (EP,US);
A61K38/00 (EP,US);
C07K2319/02 (EP,US);
C07K2319/33 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2004/41] | A61K39/385, A61K47/48 | ||
Former IPC [2002/14] | A61K39/385 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/14] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Anti-allergene Peptide | [2009/25] | English: | Anti-allergic peptides | [2009/25] | French: | Peptides antiallergiques | [2009/25] |
Former [2002/14] | NEUARTIGE ANTI-ALLERGENE WIRKSTOFFE | ||
Former [2002/14] | NOVEL ANTI-ALLERGIC AGENTS | ||
Former [2002/14] | NOUVEAUX AGENTS ANTIALLERGIQUES | Entry into regional phase | 28.12.2001 | National basic fee paid | 28.12.2001 | Search fee paid | 28.12.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.12.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.12.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 28.12.2001 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.12.2001 | Examination requested [2002/14] | 16.05.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.10.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.01.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.05.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.01.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.04.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.05.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.09.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 24.09.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP07022898.6 / EP1891969 | Opposition(s) | 12.08.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 16.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Licence(s) | ID: | 01 00/exclusive | For: | AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LU MC NL PT SE | Licencee: | Allergica Ltd. 11 Menachem Begin 52521 Ramat Gan / IL | Date: | 07.05.2007 | [2007/25] | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 11.11.2009 | BE | 11.11.2009 | CY | 11.11.2009 | DK | 11.11.2009 | FI | 11.11.2009 | IT | 11.11.2009 | NL | 11.11.2009 | SE | 11.11.2009 | GR | 12.02.2010 | ES | 22.02.2010 | PT | 11.03.2010 | IE | 14.06.2010 | LU | 14.06.2010 | CH | 30.06.2010 | LI | 30.06.2010 | MC | 30.06.2010 | [2012/44] |
Former [2012/43] | AT | 11.11.2009 | |
BE | 11.11.2009 | ||
CY | 11.11.2009 | ||
DK | 11.11.2009 | ||
FI | 11.11.2009 | ||
IT | 11.11.2009 | ||
SE | 11.11.2009 | ||
GR | 12.02.2010 | ||
ES | 22.02.2010 | ||
PT | 11.03.2010 | ||
IE | 14.06.2010 | ||
LU | 14.06.2010 | ||
CH | 30.06.2010 | ||
LI | 30.06.2010 | ||
MC | 30.06.2010 | ||
Former [2011/20] | AT | 11.11.2009 | |
BE | 11.11.2009 | ||
CY | 11.11.2009 | ||
DK | 11.11.2009 | ||
FI | 11.11.2009 | ||
IT | 11.11.2009 | ||
SE | 11.11.2009 | ||
GR | 12.02.2010 | ||
ES | 22.02.2010 | ||
PT | 11.03.2010 | ||
IE | 14.06.2010 | ||
CH | 30.06.2010 | ||
LI | 30.06.2010 | ||
MC | 30.06.2010 | ||
Former [2011/19] | AT | 11.11.2009 | |
BE | 11.11.2009 | ||
CY | 11.11.2009 | ||
DK | 11.11.2009 | ||
FI | 11.11.2009 | ||
IT | 11.11.2009 | ||
SE | 11.11.2009 | ||
GR | 12.02.2010 | ||
ES | 22.02.2010 | ||
PT | 11.03.2010 | ||
IE | 14.06.2010 | ||
MC | 30.06.2010 | ||
Former [2011/14] | AT | 11.11.2009 | |
BE | 11.11.2009 | ||
CY | 11.11.2009 | ||
DK | 11.11.2009 | ||
FI | 11.11.2009 | ||
IT | 11.11.2009 | ||
SE | 11.11.2009 | ||
GR | 12.02.2010 | ||
ES | 22.02.2010 | ||
PT | 11.03.2010 | ||
MC | 30.06.2010 | ||
Former [2011/07] | AT | 11.11.2009 | |
BE | 11.11.2009 | ||
CY | 11.11.2009 | ||
DK | 11.11.2009 | ||
FI | 11.11.2009 | ||
SE | 11.11.2009 | ||
GR | 12.02.2010 | ||
ES | 22.02.2010 | ||
PT | 11.03.2010 | ||
MC | 30.06.2010 | ||
Former [2010/47] | AT | 11.11.2009 | |
BE | 11.11.2009 | ||
CY | 11.11.2009 | ||
DK | 11.11.2009 | ||
FI | 11.11.2009 | ||
SE | 11.11.2009 | ||
GR | 12.02.2010 | ||
ES | 22.02.2010 | ||
PT | 11.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/35] | AT | 11.11.2009 | |
BE | 11.11.2009 | ||
CY | 11.11.2009 | ||
DK | 11.11.2009 | ||
FI | 11.11.2009 | ||
SE | 11.11.2009 | ||
ES | 22.02.2010 | ||
PT | 11.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/31] | AT | 11.11.2009 | |
BE | 11.11.2009 | ||
CY | 11.11.2009 | ||
FI | 11.11.2009 | ||
SE | 11.11.2009 | ||
ES | 22.02.2010 | ||
PT | 11.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/30] | AT | 11.11.2009 | |
CY | 11.11.2009 | ||
FI | 11.11.2009 | ||
SE | 11.11.2009 | ||
ES | 22.02.2010 | ||
PT | 11.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/25] | CY | 11.11.2009 | |
FI | 11.11.2009 | ||
SE | 11.11.2009 | ||
ES | 22.02.2010 | ||
PT | 11.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/22] | FI | 11.11.2009 | |
SE | 11.11.2009 | ||
ES | 22.02.2010 | ||
PT | 11.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/19] | ES | 22.02.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [A] - SINGH R ET AL, "Antiallergic/antiasthmatic activity of oligopeptide related to IgE.", PHARMACOLOGICAL RESEARCH : THE OFFICIAL JOURNAL OF THE ITALIAN PHARMACOLOGICAL SOCIETY. MAY 1998, (199805), vol. 37, no. 5, ISSN 1043-6618, pages 353 - 356, XP002292857 [A] 1-20 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/phrs.1998.0302 | International search | [Y]US5807746 (LIN YAO-ZHONG [US], et al); | [Y] - ARIDOR ET AL., "Activation of exocytosis by the heterotrimeric G protein G13", SCIENCE, (19931203), vol. 262, no. 5139, pages 1569 - 1573, XP000953320 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.7504324 |