EP1306864 - ELECTROLYTE COMPOSITION FOR ELECTRIC DOUBLE-LAYER CAPACITOR, SOLID POLYMER ELECTROLYTE, COMPOSITION FOR POLAR ELECTRODE, POLAR ELECTRODE, AND ELECTRIC DOUBLE-LAYER CAPACITOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2003/18] | ELECTROLYTE COMPOSITION FOR ELECTRIC DOUBLE-LAYER CAPACITOR, SOLID POLYMER ELECTROLYTE, COMPOSITION FOR POLARIZABLE ELECTRODE, POLARIZABLE ELECTRODE, AND ELECTRIC DOUBLE-LAYER CAPACITOR | ||
[2004/51] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.03.2006 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nisshinbo Industries, Inc. 31-11, Nihonbashi Ningyocho 2-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-0013 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2003/18] | For all designated states Nisshinbo Industries, Inc. 31-11, Nihonbashi Ningyocho 2-chome Chuo-ku, Tokyo 103-0013 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HATA, Kimiyo, R & D Center, Nisshinbo Ind., Inc. 2-3, Onodai 1-chome Midori-ku Chiba-shi, Chiba 267-0056 / JP | 02 /
SATO, Takaya, R & D Center, Nisshinbo Ind., Inc. 2-3, Onodai 1-chome Midori-ku Chiba-shi, Chiba 267-0056 / JP | [2003/18] | Representative(s) | Stuart, Ian Alexander Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Stuart, Ian Alexander Mewburn Ellis LLP York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | ||
Former [2003/18] | Stuart, Ian Alexander MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 00937175.8 | 07.06.2000 | [2003/18] | WO2000JP03688 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0195351 | Date: | 13.12.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1306864 | Date: | 02.05.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.12.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1306864 | Date: | 25.05.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 13.12.2001 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.07.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H01G9/038, H01G9/058 | [2003/18] | CPC: |
H01G11/56 (EP,US);
H01G11/64 (EP,US);
Y02E60/13 (EP,US);
Y02T10/70 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2003/18] | Title | German: | ELEKTROLYTZUSAMMENSETZUNG FÜR EINEN ELEKTRISCHEN DOPPELSCHICHTKONDENSATOR, FESTPOLYMERELEKTROLYT, ZUSAMMENSETZUNG FÜR EINE POLARE ELEKTRODE, POLARE ELEKTRODE UND ELEKTRISCHER DOPPELSCHICHTKONDENSATOR | [2004/51] | English: | ELECTROLYTE COMPOSITION FOR ELECTRIC DOUBLE-LAYER CAPACITOR, SOLID POLYMER ELECTROLYTE, COMPOSITION FOR POLAR ELECTRODE, POLAR ELECTRODE, AND ELECTRIC DOUBLE-LAYER CAPACITOR | [2004/51] | French: | COMPOSITION D'ELECTROLYTE POUR CONDENSATEUR ELECTRIQUE DOUBLE COUCHE, ELECTROLYTE POLYMERE SOLIDE, COMPOSITION POUR ELECTRODE POLAIRE, ELECTRODE POLAIRE ET CONDENSATEUR ELECTRIQUE DOUBLE COUCHE | [2004/51] |
Former [2003/18] | ELEKTROLYTZUSAMMENSETZUNG FÜR EINEN ELEKTRISCHEN DOPPELSCHICHTKONDENSATOR, FESTPOLYMERELEKTROLYT, ZUSAMMENSETZUNG FÜR EINE POLARISIERBARE ELEKTRODE, POLARISIERBARE ELEKTRODE UND ELEKTRISCHER DOPPELSCHICHTKONDENSATOR | ||
Former [2003/18] | ELECTROLYTE COMPOSITION FOR ELECTRIC DOUBLE-LAYER CAPACITOR, SOLID POLYMER ELECTROLYTE, COMPOSITION FOR POLARIZABLE ELECTRODE, POLARIZABLE ELECTRODE, AND ELECTRIC DOUBLE-LAYER CAPACITOR | ||
Former [2003/18] | COMPOSITION D'ELECTROLYTE POUR CONDENSATEUR ELECTRIQUE DOUBLE COUCHE, ELECTROLYTE POLYMERE SOLIDE, COMPOSITION POUR ELECTRODE POLARISABLE, ELECTRODE POLARISABLE ET CONDENSATEUR ELECTRIQUE DOUBLE COUCHE | Entry into regional phase | 23.12.2002 | Translation filed | 27.12.2002 | National basic fee paid | 27.12.2002 | Search fee paid | 27.12.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.12.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.11.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 27.12.2002 | Examination requested [2003/18] | 05.03.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.11.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.03.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 21.03.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.02.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 25.05.2005 | BE | 25.05.2005 | CH | 25.05.2005 | FI | 25.05.2005 | IT | 25.05.2005 | LI | 25.05.2005 | NL | 25.05.2005 | CY | 07.06.2005 | IE | 07.06.2005 | LU | 07.06.2005 | MC | 30.06.2005 | DK | 25.08.2005 | GR | 25.08.2005 | SE | 25.08.2005 | ES | 05.09.2005 | PT | 27.10.2005 | [2007/35] |
Former [2007/26] | AT | 25.05.2005 | |
BE | 25.05.2005 | ||
CH | 25.05.2005 | ||
FI | 25.05.2005 | ||
LI | 25.05.2005 | ||
NL | 25.05.2005 | ||
CY | 07.06.2005 | ||
IE | 07.06.2005 | ||
LU | 07.06.2005 | ||
MC | 30.06.2005 | ||
DK | 25.08.2005 | ||
GR | 25.08.2005 | ||
SE | 25.08.2005 | ||
ES | 05.09.2005 | ||
PT | 27.10.2005 | ||
Former [2007/20] | AT | 25.05.2005 | |
BE | 25.05.2005 | ||
CH | 25.05.2005 | ||
FI | 25.05.2005 | ||
LI | 25.05.2005 | ||
NL | 25.05.2005 | ||
CY | 07.06.2005 | ||
IE | 07.06.2005 | ||
MC | 30.06.2005 | ||
LU | 25.07.2005 | ||
DK | 25.08.2005 | ||
GR | 25.08.2005 | ||
SE | 25.08.2005 | ||
ES | 05.09.2005 | ||
PT | 27.10.2005 | ||
Former [2007/08] | AT | 25.05.2005 | |
BE | 25.05.2005 | ||
CH | 25.05.2005 | ||
FI | 25.05.2005 | ||
LI | 25.05.2005 | ||
NL | 25.05.2005 | ||
IE | 07.06.2005 | ||
MC | 30.06.2005 | ||
LU | 25.07.2005 | ||
DK | 25.08.2005 | ||
GR | 25.08.2005 | ||
SE | 25.08.2005 | ||
ES | 05.09.2005 | ||
PT | 27.10.2005 | ||
Former [2006/28] | AT | 25.05.2005 | |
BE | 25.05.2005 | ||
CH | 25.05.2005 | ||
FI | 25.05.2005 | ||
LI | 25.05.2005 | ||
NL | 25.05.2005 | ||
IE | 07.06.2005 | ||
MC | 30.06.2005 | ||
DK | 25.08.2005 | ||
GR | 25.08.2005 | ||
SE | 25.08.2005 | ||
ES | 05.09.2005 | ||
PT | 27.10.2005 | ||
Former [2006/25] | AT | 25.05.2005 | |
BE | 25.05.2005 | ||
CH | 25.05.2005 | ||
FI | 25.05.2005 | ||
LI | 25.05.2005 | ||
NL | 25.05.2005 | ||
IE | 07.06.2005 | ||
DK | 25.08.2005 | ||
GR | 25.08.2005 | ||
SE | 25.08.2005 | ||
ES | 05.09.2005 | ||
PT | 27.10.2005 | ||
Former [2006/22] | AT | 25.05.2005 | |
BE | 25.05.2005 | ||
CH | 25.05.2005 | ||
FI | 25.05.2005 | ||
LI | 25.05.2005 | ||
NL | 25.05.2005 | ||
DK | 25.08.2005 | ||
GR | 25.08.2005 | ||
SE | 25.08.2005 | ||
ES | 05.09.2005 | ||
PT | 27.10.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 25.05.2005 | |
BE | 25.05.2005 | ||
CH | 25.05.2005 | ||
FI | 25.05.2005 | ||
LI | 25.05.2005 | ||
DK | 25.08.2005 | ||
GR | 25.08.2005 | ||
SE | 25.08.2005 | ||
ES | 05.09.2005 | ||
PT | 27.10.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | AT | 25.05.2005 | |
BE | 25.05.2005 | ||
FI | 25.05.2005 | ||
DK | 25.08.2005 | ||
SE | 25.08.2005 | ||
Former [2005/52] | FI | 25.05.2005 | |
SE | 25.08.2005 | ||
Former [2005/50] | SE | 25.08.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH0238451 ; | [A]JPH06302472 ; | [A]JPH11242951 ; | [A]JPH10204172 ; | [A]EP0714149 (NISSHIN SPINNING [JP], et al) [A] 1-10* the whole document *; | [A]EP0838487 (DAISO CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-10 * claim - * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19900423), vol. 014, no. 197, Database accession no. (C - 0712), & JP02038451 A 19900207 (YOTSUKAICHI GOSEI KK) [A] 1-10 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19950228), vol. 1995, no. 01, & JP06302472 A 19941028 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [A] 1-10 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19991222), vol. 1999, no. 14, & JP11242951 A 19990907 (TDK CORP) [A] 1-10 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19981130), vol. 1998, no. 13, & JP10204172 A 19980804 (DAISO CO LTD) [A] 1-10 * abstract * | International search | [X]JPH0238451 (YOTSUKAICHI GOSEI KK); | [Y]JPH06302472 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | [A]JPH08225626 (NISSHIN SPINNING, et al); | [X]JPH10204172 (DAISO CO LTD); | [Y]JPH11242951 (TDK CORP); | [A]JP2000082329 (NEC CORP) |