EP1190752 - GAME SYSTEM, GAME CONTROL METHOD, AND COMPUTER-READABLE STORAGE MEDIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 21.12.2007 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.12.2007 | Refusal of application | published on 23.01.2008 [2008/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Konami Corporation 4-1, Marunouchi, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6330 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2002/46] | For all designated states Konami Corporation 4-1, Marunouchi Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-6330 / JP | ||
Former [2002/13] | For all designated states Konami Co., Ltd. 3-1, Toranomon 4-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 105-6021 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OHTSU, Yuji, Konami Co. Ltd. 3-1, Toranomon 4-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 105-6021 / JP | 02 /
SUGIYAMA, Arata, Konami Co. Ltd. 3-1, Toranomon 4-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 105-6021 / JP | [2002/13] | Representative(s) | Haley, Stephen Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/13] | Haley, Stephen Gill Jennings & Every, Broadgate House, 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 00937222.8 | 14.06.2000 | [2002/13] | WO2000JP03855 | Priority number, date | JP19990167331 | 14.06.1999 Original published format: JP 16733199 | [2002/13] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0076609 | Date: | 21.12.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1190752 | Date: | 27.03.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.12.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 21.12.2000 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.11.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G07F17/32 | [2004/51] | CPC: |
A63F1/00 (EP,US);
G07F17/3293 (KR);
A63F13/00 (KR);
A63F2001/008 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2002/13] | A63F13/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/13] | Title | German: | SPIELSYSTEM,SPIELKONTROLLVERFAHREN UND KOMPUTERLESBARES AUFZEICHNUNGSMEDIUM | [2002/13] | English: | GAME SYSTEM, GAME CONTROL METHOD, AND COMPUTER-READABLE STORAGE MEDIUM | [2002/13] | French: | SYSTEME DE JEU, PROCEDE DE COMMANDE DE JEU ET SUPPORT DE STOCKAGE LISIBLE PAR ORDINATEUR | [2002/13] | Entry into regional phase | 12.12.2001 | Translation filed | 02.01.2002 | National basic fee paid | 02.01.2002 | Search fee paid | 02.01.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.01.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.01.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 02.01.2002 | Examination requested [2002/13] | 21.06.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.11.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.06.2007 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2008/04] | 07.06.2007 | Date of oral proceedings | 03.09.2007 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 04.09.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2008/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5853325 (KADLIC THOMAS P [US]) [X] 1-15 * column 3, line 29 - line 39 * * column 3, line 65 - column 6, line 61 * * column 10, line 36 - line 47 *; | [X]US5019973 (WILCOX JOSEPH [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * column 2, line 26 - column 5, line 16 *; | [X]WO9732285 (ARISTOCRAT LEISURE IND PTY LTD [AU], et al) [X] 1-15 * column 2, line 9 - column 3, line 36 *; | [X]US5332228 (SCHULTZ PHILLIP C [US]) [X] 1-15 * column 3, line 45 - column 6, line 55 * | International search | [Y]JPH09220369 (KONAMI CO LTD); | [Y]JPH10165593 (TAIYO ELECTRIC CO); | [A]JPH0671019 (MARUHON KOGYO KK); | [A]US4799683 (BRUNER JR GEORGE M [US]); | [AP]US5947821 (STONE JAY [US]) | [A] - KENTARO KIMURA, "Trump to hanafuda: Asobikata kachikata", GODOU SHOIN, (1987), pages 77 - 86, XP002946627 |