Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP1104804
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
24.02.2006 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 12.04.2006 [2006/15] |
04.03.2005 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 20.04.2005 [2005/16] |
11.02.2005 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
11.02.2005 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
15.10.2004 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
06.07.2004 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
25.06.2004 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
02.04.2004 |
Change - designated states |
published on 19.05.2004 [2004/21] |
13.02.2004 |
First examination report |
|
10.02.2004 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
04.07.2003 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
13.07.2002 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 28.08.2002 [2002/35] |
10.07.2002 |
Renewal fee |
|
20.04.2001 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 06.06.2001 [2001/23] |
20.04.2001 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 06.06.2001 [2001/23] |
01.03.2001 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
01.03.2001 |
Change - extension states |
|
23.02.2001 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
22.02.2001 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
27.12.2000 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
19.07.2000 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|