EP1104804 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING SINGLE NUCLEUS DETERGENT PARTICLES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.02.2006 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.02.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.04.2006 [2006/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KAO CORPORATION 14-10, Nihonbashi Kayaba-cho 1-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8210 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2005/16] | For all designated states Kao Corporation 14-10, Nihonbashi-Kayabacho 1-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8210 / JP | ||
Former [2001/23] | For all designated states Kao Corporation 14-10, Nihonbashi-Kayabacho 1-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8210 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KUBOTA, Teruo Kao Corporation, Research Lab. 1334, Minato Wakayama-shi Wakayama 640-8580 / JP | 02 /
TAKAYA, Hitoshi Kao Corporation, Research Lab. 1334, Minato Wakayama-shi Wakayama 640-8580 / JP | 03 /
HASUMI, Motomitsu Kao Corporation, Research Lab. 1334, Minato Wakayama-shi Wakayama 640-8580 / JP | 04 /
YAMASHITA, Hiroyuki Kao Corporation, Research Lab. 1334, Minato Wakayama-shi Wakayama 640-8580 / JP | [2001/23] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/23] | HOFFMANN - EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00937224.4 | 14.06.2000 | [2001/23] | WO2000JP03858 | Priority number, date | JP19990167318 | 14.06.1999 Original published format: JP 16731899 | JP19990170363 | 16.06.1999 Original published format: JP 17036399 | [2001/23] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0077149 | Date: | 21.12.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1104804 | Date: | 06.06.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.12.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1104804 | Date: | 20.04.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 21.12.2000 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.07.2002 | Classification | IPC: | C11D11/00, C11D17/06 | [2001/23] | CPC: |
C11D17/065 (EP,US);
C11D11/0082 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/21] |
Former [2001/23] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINKERNIGER WASCHMITTELTEILCHEN | [2001/23] | English: | METHOD FOR PRODUCING SINGLE NUCLEUS DETERGENT PARTICLES | [2001/23] | French: | PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION DE PARTICULES DETERGENTES A UN SEUL NOYAU | [2001/23] | Entry into regional phase | 14.02.2001 | Translation filed | 14.02.2001 | National basic fee paid | 14.02.2001 | Search fee paid | 14.02.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.02.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.02.2001 | Examination requested [2001/23] | 12.02.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.06.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.10.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.02.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 02.02.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.01.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0816485 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [A] 1-7 * page 2, line 3 - page 3, line 2; example 1 *; | [A]JPS6166799 | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 86, no. 20, Database accession no. 1986-128643, XP002195324 & JPS6166799 A 19860405 (KAO CORP) [A] 1-7 * abstract * | International search | [A]JPH06128598 (LION CORP); | [A]WO9405761 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US], et al); | [AP]WO9929830 (KAO CORP [JP], et al) |