EP1293464 - OPERATING BOARD FOR ELEVATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.09.2011 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.09.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.10.2011 [2011/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | [2006/18] |
Former [2003/12] | For all designated states MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHIDA, Akihiro Mitsubishi Denki Kabushiki Kaisha 22-3, Marunouchi Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | 02 /
YAMAMOTO, Mitsuhiko Mitsubishi Denki Kabushiki Kaisha 22-3, Marunouchi Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | 03 /
MIYAWAKI, Masayuki Mitsubishi Denki Kabushiki Kaisha 22-3, Marunouchi Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | 04 /
TAMAKI, Yasuyuki Mitsubishi Denki Kabushiki Kaisha 22-3, Marunouchi Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | [2003/12] | Representative(s) | Prins, Adrianus Willem, et al V.O. Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2003/12] | Prins, Adrianus Willem, et al Vereenigde, Nieuwe Parklaan 97 2587 BN Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 00937320.0 | 20.06.2000 | [2003/12] | WO2000JP04016 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0198190 | Date: | 27.12.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1293464 | Date: | 19.03.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.12.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1293464 | Date: | 17.11.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 27.12.2001 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.07.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B66B1/46, H01H13/48 | [2003/12] | CPC: |
H01H13/70 (EP,US);
H01H2215/006 (EP,US);
H01H2217/024 (EP,US);
H01H2221/018 (EP,US);
H01H2229/062 (EP,US);
H01H2231/016 (EP,US);
H01H2231/03 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | NL [2004/21] |
Former [2003/12] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | BEDIENTAFEL FÜR EINEN AUFZUG | [2010/20] | English: | OPERATING BOARD FOR ELEVATOR | [2003/12] | French: | PANNEAU DE COMMANDE D'ASCENSEUR | [2003/12] |
Former [2003/12] | BETRIEBS-BOARD FÜR EINEN AUFZUG | Entry into regional phase | 20.03.2002 | Translation filed | 20.03.2002 | National basic fee paid | 20.03.2002 | Search fee paid | 20.03.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.03.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.03.2002 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.03.2002 | Examination requested [2003/12] | 25.08.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.03.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.06.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.09.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 30.09.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.08.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 18.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 17.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 15.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 16.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0636569 (KONE OY [FI]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]US5679934 (JUNTUNEN ASKO [FI], et al) [A] 1 * abstract * | International search | [Y]JPH10245166 (TOSHIBA F A SYSTEM ENG, et al); | [Y]JP2000156134 (OKADA AKIRA); | [Y]JP2000156130 (OKADA AKIRA); | [Y]JPH07210283 (CANON KK) | by applicant | JPH06144726 | DE29703968U |