EP1188092 - ELIMINATION OF POLARIZATION FADING IN UNBALANCED OPTICAL MEASURING INTERFEROMETERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.06.2008 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.08.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 03.10.2012 [2012/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Optoplan AS Boks 1963, Moholtan 7448 Trondheim / NO | [N/P] |
Former [2007/32] | For all designated states OPTOPLAN AS Boks 1963, Moholtan 7448 Trondheim / NO | ||
Former [2002/12] | For all designated states Optoplan AS Boks 1963, Moholtan 7448 Trondheim / NO | Inventor(s) | 01 /
R NNEKLEIV, Erlend Sig. Jorsalfars v. 23b N-7052 Trondheim / NO | [2002/12] | Representative(s) | Hagmann-Smith, Martin P., et al Marks & Clerk LLP Fletcher House Heatley Road The Oxford Science Park Oxford OX4 4GE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/16] | Hagmann-Smith, Martin Peter, et al Marks & Clerk, 4220 Nash Court, Oxford Business Park South Oxford, Oxfordshire OX4 2RU / GB | ||
Former [2003/13] | Harding, Richard Patrick, et al Marks & Clerk 4220 Nash Court Oxford Business Park South Oxford OX4 2RU / GB | ||
Former [2002/12] | Howe, Steven Lloyd Wise, Tregear & Co., Commonwealth House, 1-19 New Oxford Street London WC1A 1LW / GB | Application number, filing date | 00937394.5 | 22.06.2000 | [2002/12] | WO2000NO00219 | Priority number, date | NO19990003135 | 23.06.1999 Original published format: NO 993135 | [2002/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0079335 | Date: | 28.12.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1188092 | Date: | 20.03.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.12.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1188092 | Date: | 08.08.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 28.12.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G02F1/01, G01D5/353 | [2006/12] | CPC: |
G01D5/35383 (EP,US);
G01D5/344 (EP,US);
G01D5/35303 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2002/12] | G02F1/01 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/12] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BESEITIGUNG DER POLARISATIONSDÄMPFUNG IN NICHT ABGEGLICHENEN OPTISCHEN MESSINTERFEROMETERN | [2002/12] | English: | ELIMINATION OF POLARIZATION FADING IN UNBALANCED OPTICAL MEASURING INTERFEROMETERS | [2002/12] | French: | SUPPRESSION DU PHENOMENE D'EVANOUISSEMENT PAR POLARISATION DANS DES INTERFEROMETRES DE MESURE OPTIQUES NON EQUILIBRES | [2002/12] | Entry into regional phase | 23.11.2001 | National basic fee paid | 23.11.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.11.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.01.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 23.11.2001 | Examination requested [2002/12] | 04.10.2002 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.02.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.08.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 19.10.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 19.10.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.05.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/29] | Request for further processing for: | 19.10.2006 | Request for further processing filed | 19.10.2006 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 13.12.2006 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 08.08.2007 | BE | 08.08.2007 | CH | 08.08.2007 | CY | 08.08.2007 | DK | 08.08.2007 | FI | 08.08.2007 | LI | 08.08.2007 | NL | 08.08.2007 | SE | 08.11.2007 | DE | 09.11.2007 | GR | 09.11.2007 | ES | 19.11.2007 | PT | 08.01.2008 | FR | 04.04.2008 | [2012/40] |
Former [2009/33] | AT | 08.08.2007 | |
BE | 08.08.2007 | ||
CH | 08.08.2007 | ||
CY | 08.08.2007 | ||
DK | 08.08.2007 | ||
FI | 08.08.2007 | ||
LI | 08.08.2007 | ||
NL | 08.08.2007 | ||
SE | 08.11.2007 | ||
DE | 09.11.2007 | ||
GR | 09.11.2007 | ||
ES | 19.11.2007 | ||
PT | 08.01.2008 | ||
Former [2008/36] | AT | 08.08.2007 | |
BE | 08.08.2007 | ||
CH | 08.08.2007 | ||
DK | 08.08.2007 | ||
FI | 08.08.2007 | ||
LI | 08.08.2007 | ||
NL | 08.08.2007 | ||
SE | 08.11.2007 | ||
DE | 09.11.2007 | ||
GR | 09.11.2007 | ||
ES | 19.11.2007 | ||
PT | 08.01.2008 | ||
Former [2008/28] | AT | 08.08.2007 | |
BE | 08.08.2007 | ||
CH | 08.08.2007 | ||
DK | 08.08.2007 | ||
FI | 08.08.2007 | ||
LI | 08.08.2007 | ||
NL | 08.08.2007 | ||
SE | 08.11.2007 | ||
GR | 09.11.2007 | ||
ES | 19.11.2007 | ||
PT | 08.01.2008 | ||
Former [2008/26] | AT | 08.08.2007 | |
BE | 08.08.2007 | ||
CH | 08.08.2007 | ||
DK | 08.08.2007 | ||
FI | 08.08.2007 | ||
LI | 08.08.2007 | ||
NL | 08.08.2007 | ||
GR | 09.11.2007 | ||
ES | 19.11.2007 | ||
PT | 08.01.2008 | ||
Former [2008/23] | AT | 08.08.2007 | |
BE | 08.08.2007 | ||
CH | 08.08.2007 | ||
DK | 08.08.2007 | ||
FI | 08.08.2007 | ||
LI | 08.08.2007 | ||
NL | 08.08.2007 | ||
GR | 09.11.2007 | ||
ES | 19.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/19] | AT | 08.08.2007 | |
BE | 08.08.2007 | ||
CH | 08.08.2007 | ||
FI | 08.08.2007 | ||
LI | 08.08.2007 | ||
NL | 08.08.2007 | ||
GR | 09.11.2007 | ||
ES | 19.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/13] | AT | 08.08.2007 | |
CH | 08.08.2007 | ||
FI | 08.08.2007 | ||
LI | 08.08.2007 | ||
NL | 08.08.2007 | ||
ES | 19.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/10] | FI | 08.08.2007 | |
NL | 08.08.2007 | ||
ES | 19.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/09] | NL | 08.08.2007 | |
ES | 19.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/08] | ES | 19.11.2007 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4897543 (KERSEY ALAN D [US]); | [A]US5173743 (KIM BYOUNG Y [KR]); | [A]US5351124 (LASKOSKIE CLARENCE E [US], et al) |