EP1177409 - NON-LETHAL PROJECTILE SYSTEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.06.2008 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.08.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 03.10.2012 [2012/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pepperball Technologies, Inc. 6142 Nancy Ridge Drive, Suite 101 San Diego, CA 92121 / US | [2007/26] |
Former [2002/06] | For all designated states JAYCOR 9775 Towne Center Drive San Diego California 92121 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VASEL, Edward, J. 12843 Corbet Court San Diego, CA 92130 / US | 02 /
NUNAN, Scott, C. 10670 Granby Way San Diego, CA 92126 / US | 03 /
NIEDERHAUS, Gregory, A. 4032 Ashford Street San Diego, CA 92111 / US | 04 /
COAKLEY, Peter, G. 1266 Sea Village Drive Cardiff, CA 92007 / US | 05 /
WENAAS, Eric 12936 Via Latina Del Mar, CA 92014 / US | 06 /
BEHRENDT, Roger 1159 Wild Canary Lane Olivenhain, CA 92024 / US | [2002/06] | Representative(s) | Stein-Dräger, Christiane Hoffmann - Eitle ATTENTION : ADDRESS INACTIVE - USE ASS-NR - CDR / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/06] | Stein-Dräger, Christiane Hoffmann - Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00937513.0 | 07.04.2000 | [2002/06] | WO2000US09331 | Priority number, date | US19990289258 | 09.04.1999 Original published format: US 289258 | US20000543289 | 05.04.2000 Original published format: US 543289 | [2002/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0062006 | Date: | 19.10.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/42] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1177409 | Date: | 06.02.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.10.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1177409 | Date: | 08.08.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 01.03.2001 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.02.2005 | Classification | IPC: | F42B12/46, F42B12/40 | [2004/52] | CPC: |
F41B15/02 (EP,US);
F41B11/57 (EP);
F41B11/62 (EP,US);
F41H9/10 (EP,US);
F42B12/40 (EP,US);
F42B12/50 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2002/06] | F42B12/46 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2007/32] |
Former [2002/06] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | NICHT-LETHALE GESCHOSSE | [2002/06] | English: | NON-LETHAL PROJECTILE SYSTEMS | [2002/06] | French: | SYSTEMES DE PROJECTILES NON LETAUX | [2002/06] | Entry into regional phase | 07.11.2001 | National basic fee paid | 07.11.2001 | Search fee paid | 07.11.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.11.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.11.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 07.11.2001 | Examination requested [2002/06] | 15.02.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 25.09.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.10.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 29.12.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.02.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.06.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 13.06.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.05.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 08.08.2007 | BE | 08.08.2007 | CH | 08.08.2007 | CY | 08.08.2007 | DK | 08.08.2007 | FI | 08.08.2007 | LI | 08.08.2007 | NL | 08.08.2007 | SE | 08.11.2007 | DE | 09.11.2007 | GR | 09.11.2007 | ES | 19.11.2007 | PT | 08.01.2008 | FR | 04.04.2008 | IE | 07.04.2008 | LU | 07.04.2008 | IT | 30.04.2008 | MC | 30.04.2008 | [2012/40] |
Former [2011/13] | AT | 08.08.2007 | |
BE | 08.08.2007 | ||
CH | 08.08.2007 | ||
CY | 08.08.2007 | ||
DK | 08.08.2007 | ||
FI | 08.08.2007 | ||
LI | 08.08.2007 | ||
NL | 08.08.2007 | ||
SE | 08.11.2007 | ||
DE | 09.11.2007 | ||
GR | 09.11.2007 | ||
ES | 19.11.2007 | ||
PT | 08.01.2008 | ||
IE | 07.04.2008 | ||
LU | 07.04.2008 | ||
IT | 30.04.2008 | ||
MC | 30.04.2008 | ||
Former [2010/32] | AT | 08.08.2007 | |
BE | 08.08.2007 | ||
CH | 08.08.2007 | ||
CY | 08.08.2007 | ||
DK | 08.08.2007 | ||
FI | 08.08.2007 | ||
LI | 08.08.2007 | ||
NL | 08.08.2007 | ||
SE | 08.11.2007 | ||
DE | 09.11.2007 | ||
GR | 09.11.2007 | ||
ES | 19.11.2007 | ||
PT | 08.01.2008 | ||
IE | 07.04.2008 | ||
LU | 07.04.2008 | ||
MC | 30.04.2008 | ||
Former [2009/33] | AT | 08.08.2007 | |
BE | 08.08.2007 | ||
CH | 08.08.2007 | ||
CY | 08.08.2007 | ||
DK | 08.08.2007 | ||
FI | 08.08.2007 | ||
LI | 08.08.2007 | ||
NL | 08.08.2007 | ||
SE | 08.11.2007 | ||
DE | 09.11.2007 | ||
GR | 09.11.2007 | ||
ES | 19.11.2007 | ||
PT | 08.01.2008 | ||
IE | 07.04.2008 | ||
MC | 30.04.2008 | ||
Former [2009/23] | AT | 08.08.2007 | |
BE | 08.08.2007 | ||
CH | 08.08.2007 | ||
DK | 08.08.2007 | ||
FI | 08.08.2007 | ||
LI | 08.08.2007 | ||
NL | 08.08.2007 | ||
SE | 08.11.2007 | ||
DE | 09.11.2007 | ||
GR | 09.11.2007 | ||
ES | 19.11.2007 | ||
PT | 08.01.2008 | ||
IE | 07.04.2008 | ||
MC | 30.04.2008 | ||
Former [2008/51] | AT | 08.08.2007 | |
BE | 08.08.2007 | ||
CH | 08.08.2007 | ||
DK | 08.08.2007 | ||
FI | 08.08.2007 | ||
LI | 08.08.2007 | ||
NL | 08.08.2007 | ||
SE | 08.11.2007 | ||
DE | 09.11.2007 | ||
GR | 09.11.2007 | ||
ES | 19.11.2007 | ||
PT | 08.01.2008 | ||
MC | 30.04.2008 | ||
Former [2008/36] | AT | 08.08.2007 | |
BE | 08.08.2007 | ||
CH | 08.08.2007 | ||
DK | 08.08.2007 | ||
FI | 08.08.2007 | ||
LI | 08.08.2007 | ||
NL | 08.08.2007 | ||
SE | 08.11.2007 | ||
DE | 09.11.2007 | ||
GR | 09.11.2007 | ||
ES | 19.11.2007 | ||
PT | 08.01.2008 | ||
Former [2008/28] | AT | 08.08.2007 | |
BE | 08.08.2007 | ||
CH | 08.08.2007 | ||
DK | 08.08.2007 | ||
FI | 08.08.2007 | ||
LI | 08.08.2007 | ||
NL | 08.08.2007 | ||
SE | 08.11.2007 | ||
GR | 09.11.2007 | ||
ES | 19.11.2007 | ||
PT | 08.01.2008 | ||
Former [2008/26] | AT | 08.08.2007 | |
BE | 08.08.2007 | ||
CH | 08.08.2007 | ||
DK | 08.08.2007 | ||
FI | 08.08.2007 | ||
LI | 08.08.2007 | ||
NL | 08.08.2007 | ||
GR | 09.11.2007 | ||
ES | 19.11.2007 | ||
PT | 08.01.2008 | ||
Former [2008/23] | AT | 08.08.2007 | |
BE | 08.08.2007 | ||
CH | 08.08.2007 | ||
DK | 08.08.2007 | ||
FI | 08.08.2007 | ||
LI | 08.08.2007 | ||
NL | 08.08.2007 | ||
GR | 09.11.2007 | ||
ES | 19.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/19] | AT | 08.08.2007 | |
BE | 08.08.2007 | ||
CH | 08.08.2007 | ||
FI | 08.08.2007 | ||
LI | 08.08.2007 | ||
NL | 08.08.2007 | ||
GR | 09.11.2007 | ||
ES | 19.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/13] | AT | 08.08.2007 | |
CH | 08.08.2007 | ||
FI | 08.08.2007 | ||
LI | 08.08.2007 | ||
NL | 08.08.2007 | ||
ES | 19.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/10] | FI | 08.08.2007 | |
NL | 08.08.2007 | ||
ES | 19.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/09] | NL | 08.08.2007 | |
ES | 19.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/08] | ES | 19.11.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US938836 (FESSENDEN REGINALD A [US]) [A] 30 * page 1, column L, line 42 - column R, line 65; figure 1 *; | [A]US2112758 (STEWART BLACKER LATHAM VALENTI); | [A]US3650213 (ABBOTT DAVID D, et al); | [XY]US3865038 (BARR IRWIN R) [X] 1-11,13-22,31,35-41 * column 1, line 3 - line 14 * * column 1, line 41 - line 53 * * column 2, line 11 - line 27 * * column 2, line 55 - line 62; figures 1-5; claims 1-6 * [Y] 42,43; | [Y]US4696347 (STOLOV MICHAEL [IL], et al) [Y] 32 * column 3, line 65 - line 68; figure 4 *; | [Y]US5018450 (SMITH HENRY J [US]) [Y] 42 * the whole document *; | [YD]US5254379 (KOTSIOPOULOS THOMAS G [US], et al) [YD] 43 * the whole document *; | [A]US5341744 (SHI XIAO [US]); | [XY]US5353712 (OLSON CHRISTY L [US]) [X] 33,34,43 * column 3, line 29 - column 5, line 22; figures 1-5; claims 2,3,7 * [Y] 12-19,23-29; | [XY]WO9914551 (ISHER S A R L [FR], et al) [X] 1-11,20-22,31,33-40 * page 3, line 33 - line 35 * * page 4, line 15 - line 17 * * page 8, line 38 - page 9, line 30; figures 6-9; claims 2,8-10 * [Y] 12-19,23-29,32; | [XPL]US5965839 (VASEL EDWARD J [US], et al) [XPL] 1-7,31,33-39,41,43 * figures 1-19 *; | [E]WO0053999 (PERFECT CIRCLE PAINTBALL INC [US]) [E] 1-3,31,33-39,41,42 * page 17, line 26 - line 30 * * page 18, line 12 - line 22 * * page 19, line 7 - line 10 * * page 20, line 9 - line 26; figures 1a-6; claims 23,24,28,29,37,38 * | International search | [Y]US4449479 (SAUCIER HOWARD J [US]); | [A]US4686905 (SZABO ATTILA [CA]); | [A]US4899660 (BRIGHTON RICHARD W [CA]); | [A]US5009164 (GRINBERG ODED [IL]); | [A]US5018450 (SMITH HENRY J [US]); | [A]US5353712 (OLSON CHRISTY L [US]); | [X]US5361700 (CARBONE ALFRED V [US]); | [A]WO9428371 (BUZICK STEVEN CRAIG [US]); | [A]US5529215 (BANKS RONDAL T [US], et al); | [Y]US5565949 (KASHA JR JOHN R [US]); | [X]US5821450 (FEDIDA JOSE [FR]) | by applicant | US3921614 | US4560168 | US5009164 | US5254379 | US5565649 |