EP1180003 - STENT DELIVERY SYSTEM WITH NESTED STABILIZER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2002/08] | STENT DELIVERY SYSTEM WITH NESTED STABILIZER AND METHOD OF LOADING AND USING SAME | ||
[2007/16] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.11.2008 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.11.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.12.2008 [2008/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Boston Scientific Limited The Corporate Centre, Bush Hill, Bay Street St. Michael Barbados, West Indies / BB | [2008/03] |
Former [2002/08] | For all designated states Boston Scientific Limited The Corporate Center, Bush Hill, Bay Street St. Michael, Barbados, West Indies / BB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SULLIVAN, Jason, R. 111 Deerfield Road Wayne, NJ 07470 / US | 02 /
KELLER, John 133, Big Ridge E. Stroudsburg, PA 18301 / US | 03 /
KETTERER, Matthew, S. 12 Beaver Run Drive Quakertown, PA 18951 / US | 04 /
DiMATTEO, Kristian, J. 25 Carleton Road Waltham, MA 02451 / US | 05 /
BETTUCHI, Michael, J. 58 Pine Avenue Randolph, Massachusetts 02368 / US | 06 /
GOLDS, Ellen 32 South Drive Hastings-on-Hudson, NY 10706 / US | [2002/23] |
Former [2002/08] | 01 /
SULLIVAN, Jason, R. 111 Deerfield Road Wayne, NJ 07470 / US | ||
02 /
KELLER, John 43 Short Street Shelton, CT 06484 / US | |||
03 /
KETTERER, Matthew, S. 12 Beaver Run Drive Quakertown, PA 18951 / US | |||
04 /
DiMATTEO, Kristian, J. Apartment 3, 50 Carey Avenue Watertown, MA 02472 / US | |||
05 /
BETTUCHI, Michael, J. 36 Cushman Road Brighton, MA 02135 / US | |||
06 /
GOLDS, Ellen 32 South Drive Hastings-on-Hudson, NY 10706 / US | Representative(s) | Wess, Wolfgang Schwabe Sandmair Marx Patentanwälte Stuntzstrasse 16 81677 München / DE | [2008/42] |
Former [2002/08] | Wess, Wolfgang, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwalt, Stuntzstrasse 16 81677 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00937664.1 | 19.05.2000 | [2002/08] | WO2000US14038 | Priority number, date | US19990134985P | 20.05.1999 Original published format: US 134985 P | US19990157335P | 01.10.1999 Original published format: US 157335 P | US20000574418 | 19.05.2000 Original published format: US 574418 | [2002/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0071058 | Date: | 30.11.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1180003 | Date: | 20.02.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.11.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1180003 | Date: | 16.01.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.11.2000 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/06 | [2002/08] | CPC: |
A61F2/95 (EP,US);
A61F2002/9583 (EP,US);
A61F2002/9665 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IE, IT [2004/20] |
Former [2002/08] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Stenteinbringungssystem mit innenliegendem Stabilisator | [2007/16] | English: | STENT DELIVERY SYSTEM WITH NESTED STABILIZER | [2007/16] | French: | SYSTEME DE POSE D'ENDOPROTHESE AVEC STABILISATEUR ENCASTRE | [2007/16] |
Former [2002/08] | STENTEINBRINGUNGSSYSTEM MIT INEINANDERGESTECKTEM STABILISATOR SOWIE VERFAHREN ZUM HERSTELLEN UND BENUTZEN | ||
Former [2002/08] | STENT DELIVERY SYSTEM WITH NESTED STABILIZER AND METHOD OF LOADING AND USING SAME | ||
Former [2002/08] | SYSTEME DE POSE D'ENDOPROTHESE AVEC STABILISATEUR ENCASTRE ET PROCEDE DE CHARGEMENT ET D'UTILISATION | Entry into regional phase | 27.11.2001 | National basic fee paid | 27.11.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.11.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.12.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 26.11.2001 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.11.2001 | Examination requested [2002/08] | 28.07.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.01.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.03.2007 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 14.03.2007 | 14.03.2007 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 07.08.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.11.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 21.11.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.10.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 07.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XAY]EP0834293 (CORDIS EUROP [NL]) [X] 48,49 * the whole document * [A] 54 [Y] 1-9,28,35-38,46,47,53; | [Y]US5591222 (SUSAWA TAKASHI [JP], et al) [Y] 1-9,28,35-38,46,47,53 * column 3, line 49 - line 55; figure 7 *; | [A]WO9533422 (MEADOX MEDICALS INC [US], et al) | Examination | US5026377 | US5702418 | US5484444 | by applicant | US5702418 | US5404377 | US5609627 | US5575816 | US4655771 |