EP1190282 - PROCESS DEVICE DIAGNOSTICS USING PROCESS VARIABLE SENSOR SIGNAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.07.2007 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.07.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.08.2007 [2007/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROSEMOUNT INC. 12001 Technology Drive Eden Prairie, MN 55344 / US | [2002/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ERYUREK, Evren 4952 York Avenue South Minneapolis, MN 55410 / US | 02 /
KAVAKLIOGLU, Kadir 5837 Fairfax Avenue Edina, MN 55424 / US | 03 /
ESBOLDT, Steven, R. 4540 Whitetail Way Eagan, MN 55123 / US | [2002/13] | Representative(s) | Cross, Rupert Edward Blount, et al Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/13] | Cross, Rupert Edward Blount, et al BOULT WADE TENNANT, Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 00937914.0 | 30.05.2000 | [2002/13] | WO2000US14798 | Priority number, date | US19990344631 | 25.06.1999 Original published format: US 344631 | [2002/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0101213 | Date: | 04.01.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1190282 | Date: | 27.03.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.01.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1190282 | Date: | 13.09.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.01.2001 | Classification | IPC: | G05B23/02 | [2002/13] | CPC: |
G05B23/024 (EP,US);
G01K15/00 (EP,US);
G05B9/03 (EP,US);
G07C3/00 (EP,US);
G08C19/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [2004/21] |
Former [2002/13] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FEHLERDIAGNOSE EINER PROZESSEINRICHTUNG UNTER VERWENDUNG EINES PROZESSABHÄNGIGEN SENSORSIGNALS | [2002/13] | English: | PROCESS DEVICE DIAGNOSTICS USING PROCESS VARIABLE SENSOR SIGNAL | [2002/13] | French: | DIAGNOSTICS DE DISPOSITIFS DE COMMANDE DE PROCESSUS A L'AIDE D'UN SIGNAL DE DETECTEUR DE VARIABLE DE PROCESSUS | [2002/13] | Entry into regional phase | 29.11.2001 | National basic fee paid | 29.11.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.11.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.12.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 29.11.2001 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.11.2001 | Examination requested [2002/13] | 06.06.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.12.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.06.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.09.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.05.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1} | 25.01.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.02.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.05.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.08.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 25.08.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Appeal following examination | 05.07.2004 | Appeal received | 16.09.2004 | Statement of grounds filed | 26.10.2004 | Interlocutory revision of appeal | Opposition(s) | 14.06.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2002 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   05.07.2002 | 31.05.2004 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   04.06.2004 | 31.05.2006 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   27.07.2006 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]JPH08247076 ; | [X]JPS6230915 ; | [X]WO9721157 (HONEYWELL INC [US]) [X] 1,3,25,41-46 * the whole document * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970131), vol. 1997, no. 01, & JP08247076 A 19960924 (MATSUSHITA REFRIG CO LTD) [X] 1,3,25,41-46 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19870707), vol. 011, no. 208, Database accession no. (P - 593), & JP62030915 A 19870209 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD) [X] 1,3,25,41-46 * abstract * | by applicant | US5637802 | US5754596 |