EP1187998 - DUAL LOBE AIRSPRING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.02.2006 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.09.2008 | Change - representative | published on 08.10.2008 [2008/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Gates Corporation 900 South Broadway Denver, Colorado 80209 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2002/12] | For all designated states THE GATES CORPORATION 900 South Broadway Denver, Colorado 80209 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CRABTREE, Michael, L. 6500 Saulsbury Ct. Arvada, CO 80003 / US | 02 /
STIEG, Richard, F. 2215 Hillsdale Circle Boulder, CO 80303 / US | [2002/12] | Representative(s) | Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/41] | Carpmaels & Ransford One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | ||
Former [2002/40] | Carpmaels & Ransford 43 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | ||
Former [2002/12] | Carpmael, John William Maurice, et al CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square London, WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 00938169.0 | 05.06.2000 | [2002/12] | WO2000US15535 | Priority number, date | US19990139056P | 11.06.1999 Original published format: US 139056 P | [2002/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0077417 | Date: | 21.12.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1187998 | Date: | 20.03.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.12.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.12.2000 | Classification | IPC: | F16F9/05 | [2002/12] | CPC: |
F16F9/05 (EP,US);
H04L9/40 (EP,US);
F16F9/057 (EP,US);
B60G2206/424 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/12] | Extension states | AL | 08.01.2002 | LT | 08.01.2002 | LV | 08.01.2002 | MK | 08.01.2002 | RO | 08.01.2002 | SI | 08.01.2002 | Title | German: | ZWEIBALGLUFTFEDER | [2002/12] | English: | DUAL LOBE AIRSPRING | [2002/12] | French: | RESSORT PNEUMATIQUE A DEUX LOBES | [2002/12] | Entry into regional phase | 08.01.2002 | National basic fee paid | 08.01.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.01.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.12.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 08.01.2002 | Examination requested [2002/12] | 11.11.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.05.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.07.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.01.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.03.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.10.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/15] | 11.11.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2006/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2005 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]FR1161423 (BOURCIER DE CARBON); | [X]GB818604 (GEN TIRE & RUBBER CO) [X] 10-17 * figure -; example 1 *; | [A]US3876193 (CLARY EDWARD L); | [X]US4718650 (GENO WAYNE H [US]) [X] 1,4-7 * abstract *; | [A]US5501432 (TATTERMUSCH PETER [DE], et al) | by applicant | US4629170 | US19560601390 |