EP1316061 - DATA PACKAGE TEMPLATE WITH DATA EMBEDDING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.10.2011 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.05.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 19.06.2013 [2013/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Silverbrook Research Pty Limited 393 Darling Street Balmain, NSW 2041 / AU | [N/P] |
Former [2003/23] | For all designated states Silverbrook Research Pty. Limited 393 Darling Street Balmain, NSW 2041 / AU | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WALMSLEY, Simon Robert, Unit 3 9 Pembroke Street Epping, NSW 2121 / AU | 02 /
LAPSTUN, Paul 13 Duke Avenue Rodd Point, NSW 2046 / AU | [2003/23] | Representative(s) | Moore, Barry, et al Hanna Moore + Curley Garryard House 25/26 Earlsfort Terrace Dublin 2, D02 PX51 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Moore, Barry, et al Hanna Moore & Curley 13 Lower Lad Lane Dublin 2 / IE | ||
Former [2008/32] | Moore, Barry, et al Hanna, Moore & Curley 13 Lower Lad Lane Dublin 2 / IE | ||
Former [2003/23] | McCarthy, Denis Alexis, et al MacLachlan & Donaldson 47 Merrion Square Dublin 2 / IE | Application number, filing date | 00938330.8 | 30.06.2000 | [2003/23] | WO2000AU00757 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0203321 | Date: | 10.01.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1316061 | Date: | 04.06.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.01.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1316061 | Date: | 01.12.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 10.01.2002 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.06.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G06K19/06 | [2003/23] | CPC: |
G06K19/06037 (EP,US);
G06K1/121 (EP,US);
G06K19/06 (EP,US);
G06K19/06168 (EP,US);
G06K7/1417 (EP,US);
G06K7/1421 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2003/23] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DATENVERPACKUNGSSCHABLONE MIT DATENEINBETTUNG | [2003/23] | English: | DATA PACKAGE TEMPLATE WITH DATA EMBEDDING | [2003/23] | French: | GABARIT D'ENSEMBLE DE DONNEES AVEC INCORPORATION DE DONNEES | [2003/23] | Entry into regional phase | 30.01.2003 | National basic fee paid | 30.01.2003 | Search fee paid | 30.01.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.01.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.06.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: AU | 30.01.2003 | Examination requested [2003/23] | 24.01.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.05.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.03.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.05.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.05.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.09.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.03.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.05.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.06.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.10.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 19.10.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.09.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 19.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 29.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 01.12.2010 | BE | 01.12.2010 | CY | 01.12.2010 | DK | 01.12.2010 | FI | 01.12.2010 | IT | 01.12.2010 | NL | 01.12.2010 | SE | 01.12.2010 | GR | 02.03.2011 | ES | 12.03.2011 | PT | 01.04.2011 | CH | 30.06.2011 | LI | 30.06.2011 | LU | 30.06.2011 | MC | 30.06.2011 | [2013/25] |
Former [2013/21] | AT | 01.12.2010 | |
BE | 01.12.2010 | ||
CY | 01.12.2010 | ||
DK | 01.12.2010 | ||
FI | 01.12.2010 | ||
IT | 01.12.2010 | ||
NL | 01.12.2010 | ||
SE | 01.12.2010 | ||
GR | 02.03.2011 | ||
ES | 12.03.2011 | ||
PT | 01.04.2011 | ||
CH | 30.06.2011 | ||
LI | 30.06.2011 | ||
MC | 30.06.2011 | ||
Former [2012/20] | AT | 01.12.2010 | |
BE | 01.12.2010 | ||
CY | 01.12.2010 | ||
DK | 01.12.2010 | ||
FI | 01.12.2010 | ||
IT | 01.12.2010 | ||
NL | 01.12.2010 | ||
SE | 01.12.2010 | ||
GR | 02.03.2011 | ||
ES | 12.03.2011 | ||
PT | 01.04.2011 | ||
CH | 30.06.2011 | ||
LI | 30.06.2011 | ||
Former [2012/03] | AT | 01.12.2010 | |
BE | 01.12.2010 | ||
CY | 01.12.2010 | ||
DK | 01.12.2010 | ||
FI | 01.12.2010 | ||
IT | 01.12.2010 | ||
NL | 01.12.2010 | ||
SE | 01.12.2010 | ||
GR | 02.03.2011 | ||
ES | 12.03.2011 | ||
PT | 01.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | AT | 01.12.2010 | |
BE | 01.12.2010 | ||
CY | 01.12.2010 | ||
DK | 01.12.2010 | ||
FI | 01.12.2010 | ||
NL | 01.12.2010 | ||
SE | 01.12.2010 | ||
GR | 02.03.2011 | ||
ES | 12.03.2011 | ||
PT | 01.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/35] | AT | 01.12.2010 | |
BE | 01.12.2010 | ||
CY | 01.12.2010 | ||
FI | 01.12.2010 | ||
NL | 01.12.2010 | ||
SE | 01.12.2010 | ||
GR | 02.03.2011 | ||
ES | 12.03.2011 | ||
PT | 01.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/31] | AT | 01.12.2010 | |
CY | 01.12.2010 | ||
FI | 01.12.2010 | ||
NL | 01.12.2010 | ||
SE | 01.12.2010 | ||
GR | 02.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/24] | CY | 01.12.2010 | |
FI | 01.12.2010 | ||
NL | 01.12.2010 | ||
SE | 01.12.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH08185492 ; | US6302329 [ ] (IWAI TOSHIYUKI [JP], et al) [ ] * column 8, line 50 - column 17, line 31 * * column 23, line 1 - column 25, line 56 ** figures 1,24 * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19961129), vol. 1996, no. 11, & JP08185492 A 19960716 (SHARP CORP) [X] 1-12 * abstract * | International search | [X]US5288986 (PINE JERROLD S [US], et al); | [X]US5343031 (YOSHIDA HIROKAZU [JP]); | [X]US5477012 (SEKENDUR ORAL F [US]); | [X]US5591956 (LONGACRE ANDREW JR [US], et al); | [X]US5661506 (LAZZOUNI MOHAMED [US], et al); | [X]US5726435 (HARA MASAHIRO [JP], et al); | [X]WO9950787 (XEROX CORP [US], et al) |