Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO0203321 | Global Dossier | 10.01.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | AU0000757 | 30.06.2000 | US60699900 | 30.06.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2011284644 | Global Dossier | 24.11.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US66506903 | 22.09.2003 | US201113197598 | 03.08.2011 | US53639809 | 05.08.2009 | US96573704 | 18.10.2004 | US94523807 | 26.11.2007 | US60699900 | 30.06.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7997504 | Global Dossier | 16.08.2011 | B2 | US2009294544 | 03.12.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US66506903 | 22.09.2003 | US53639809 | 05.08.2009 | US96573704 | 18.10.2004 | US94523807 | 26.11.2007 | US60699900 | 30.06.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7784703 | Global Dossier | 31.08.2010 | B2 | US2009084860 | 02.04.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US32453708 | 26.11.2008 | US87659207 | 22.10.2007 | US66493803 | 22.09.2003 | US65054007 | 08.01.2007 | US60699900 | 30.06.2000 | US96239504 | 13.10.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7770804 | Global Dossier | 10.08.2010 | B2 | US2008067259 | 20.03.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US94524407 | 26.11.2007 | US66506903 | 22.09.2003 | US96573704 | 18.10.2004 | US60699900 | 30.06.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7581683 | Global Dossier | 01.09.2009 | B2 | US2008067258 | 20.03.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US66506903 | 22.09.2003 | US96573704 | 18.10.2004 | US94523807 | 26.11.2007 | US60699900 | 30.06.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7464881 | Global Dossier | 16.12.2008 | B2 | US2008035743 | 14.02.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US87659207 | 22.10.2007 | US66493803 | 22.09.2003 | US65054007 | 08.01.2007 | US60699900 | 30.06.2000 | US96239504 | 13.10.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7287706 | Global Dossier | 30.10.2007 | B2 | US2007119956 | 31.05.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US66493803 | 22.09.2003 | US65054007 | 08.01.2007 | US60699900 | 30.06.2000 | US96239504 | 13.10.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7290720 | Global Dossier | 06.11.2007 | B2 | US2007045428 | 01.03.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US29882805 | 12.12.2005 | US66494103 | 22.09.2003 | US60699900 | 30.06.2000 | US59221106 | 03.11.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7152805 | Global Dossier | 26.12.2006 | B2 | US2006091226 | 04.05.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US29882805 | 12.12.2005 | US66494103 | 22.09.2003 | US60699900 | 30.06.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7310157 | Global Dossier | 18.12.2007 | B2 | US2005109852 | 26.05.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US66506903 | 22.09.2003 | US96573704 | 18.10.2004 | US60699900 | 30.06.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7143944 | Global Dossier | 05.12.2006 | B2 | US2005061892 | 24.03.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US66506903 | 22.09.2003 | US97475004 | 28.10.2004 | US60699900 | 30.06.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7175097 | Global Dossier | 13.02.2007 | B2 | US2005061891 | 24.03.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US66493803 | 22.09.2003 | US60699900 | 30.06.2000 | US96239504 | 13.10.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7073724 | Global Dossier | 11.07.2006 | B2 | US2005061882 | 24.03.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US66493903 | 22.09.2003 | US98278604 | 08.11.2004 | US60699900 | 30.06.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7182267 | Global Dossier | 27.02.2007 | B2 | US2004079808 | 29.04.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US66734203 | 23.09.2003 | US60699900 | 30.06.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6830198 | Global Dossier | 14.12.2004 | B2 | US2004060993 | 01.04.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US66506903 | 22.09.2003 | US60699900 | 30.06.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7025279 | Global Dossier | 11.04.2006 | B2 | US2004060992 | 01.04.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US66494103 | 22.09.2003 | US60699900 | 30.06.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6857571 | Global Dossier | 22.02.2005 | B2 | US2004060991 | 01.04.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US66493903 | 22.09.2003 | US60699900 | 30.06.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6817539 | Global Dossier | 16.11.2004 | B2 | US2004056097 | 25.03.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US66493803 | 22.09.2003 | US60699900 | 30.06.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4689935B | Global Dossier | 01.06.2011 | B2 | JP2004501476 | 15.01.2004 | A | Priority number | Date | AU0000757 | 30.06.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU5374700 | Global Dossier | 14.01.2002 | A | Priority number | Date | AU0000757 | 30.06.2000 | US60699900 | 30.06.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2000253747B | Global Dossier | 29.03.2007 | B2 | AU2000253747 | 11.04.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | AU0000757 | 30.06.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1316061 | Global Dossier | 01.12.2010 | B1 | EP1316061 | 14.07.2004 | A4 | EP1316061 | 04.06.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | AU0000757 | 30.06.2000 | US60699900 | 30.06.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE490516T | 15.12.2010 | T1 | Priority number | Date | AU0000757 | 30.06.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN100361145C | 09.01.2008 | C | CN1667648 | 14.09.2005 | A | Priority number | Date | AU0000757 | 30.06.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1265318C | 19.07.2006 | C | CN1454369 | 05.11.2003 | A | Priority number | Date | AU0000757 | 30.06.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE60045318D1 | 13.01.2011 | D1 | Priority number | Date | AU0000757 | 30.06.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | IL153715 | 29.03.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | AU0000757 | 30.06.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6622923 | 23.09.2003 | B1 | Priority number | Date | AU0000757 | 30.06.2000 | US60699900 | 30.06.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ZA200210184 | 27.08.2003 | B | Priority number | Date | AU0000757 | 30.06.2000 |