EP1191982 - DEVICE FOR AUTOMATICALLY PICKING UP OBJECTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.04.2005 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 16.01.2008 [2008/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Solar & Robotics S.A. rue Franz Merjay 117 1050 Bruxelles / BE | [2004/23] |
Former [2002/14] | For all designated states Solar & Robotics S.A. 117, rue Franz Merjay 1050 Bruxelles / BE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
COLENS, André 5, rue du Baillois B-1330 Rixensart / BE | [2002/14] | Representative(s) | Colens, Alain M.G.M. Bureau Colens SPRL Rue Franz Merjay 21 1050 Bruxelles / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/14] | Colens, Alain c/o Bureau Colens SPRL rue Franz Merjay 21 1050 Bruxelles / BE | Application number, filing date | 00938347.2 | 16.06.2000 | [2002/14] | WO2000BE00064 | Priority number, date | BE19990000422 | 17.06.1999 Original published format: BE 9900422 | [2002/14] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0078410 | Date: | 28.12.2000 | Language: | FR | [2000/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1191982 | Date: | 03.04.2002 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.12.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1191982 | Date: | 02.06.2004 | Language: | FR | [2004/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.12.2000 | Classification | IPC: | A63B47/02, A01G1/12 | [2002/14] | CPC: |
E01H1/00 (EP,US);
A63B47/021 (EP,US);
G05D1/244 (EP);
G05D1/646 (EP);
G05D1/661 (EP);
A63B2047/022 (EP,US);
G05D2105/14 (EP);
G05D2107/24 (EP);
G05D2109/10 (EP);
G05D2111/36 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/14] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AUTOMATISCHE VORRICHTUNG ZUM SAMMELN VON GEGENSTÄNDEN | [2002/14] | English: | DEVICE FOR AUTOMATICALLY PICKING UP OBJECTS | [2002/14] | French: | DISPOSITIF AUTOMATIQUE DE RAMASSAGE D'OBJETS | [2002/14] | Entry into regional phase | 15.01.2002 | National basic fee paid | 15.01.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.01.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.01.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 15.01.2002 | Examination requested [2002/14] | 16.07.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.11.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.02.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.08.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.10.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.02.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 27.02.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.03.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 02.06.2004 | CY | 02.06.2004 | FI | 02.06.2004 | IE | 02.06.2004 | NL | 02.06.2004 | LU | 16.06.2004 | CH | 30.06.2004 | LI | 30.06.2004 | MC | 30.06.2004 | DK | 02.09.2004 | GR | 02.09.2004 | SE | 02.09.2004 | PT | 02.11.2004 | [2008/03] |
Former [2007/08] | AT | 02.06.2004 | |
CY | 02.06.2004 | ||
FI | 02.06.2004 | ||
IE | 02.06.2004 | ||
NL | 02.06.2004 | ||
LU | 16.06.2004 | ||
CH | 30.06.2004 | ||
LI | 30.06.2004 | ||
MC | 30.06.2004 | ||
DK | 02.09.2004 | ||
GR | 02.09.2004 | ||
SE | 02.09.2004 | ||
Former [2006/13] | AT | 02.06.2004 | |
FI | 02.06.2004 | ||
IE | 02.06.2004 | ||
NL | 02.06.2004 | ||
CH | 30.06.2004 | ||
LI | 30.06.2004 | ||
MC | 30.06.2004 | ||
DK | 02.09.2004 | ||
GR | 02.09.2004 | ||
SE | 02.09.2004 | ||
Former [2005/25] | AT | 02.06.2004 | |
FI | 02.06.2004 | ||
IE | 02.06.2004 | ||
CH | 30.06.2004 | ||
LI | 30.06.2004 | ||
MC | 30.06.2004 | ||
DK | 02.09.2004 | ||
GR | 02.09.2004 | ||
SE | 02.09.2004 | ||
Former [2005/22] | AT | 02.06.2004 | |
FI | 02.06.2004 | ||
IE | 02.06.2004 | ||
MC | 30.06.2004 | ||
DK | 02.09.2004 | ||
GR | 02.09.2004 | ||
SE | 02.09.2004 | ||
Former [2005/19] | AT | 02.06.2004 | |
FI | 02.06.2004 | ||
IE | 02.06.2004 | ||
MC | 30.06.2004 | ||
GR | 02.09.2004 | ||
SE | 02.09.2004 | ||
Former [2005/11] | AT | 02.06.2004 | |
FI | 02.06.2004 | ||
MC | 30.06.2004 | ||
GR | 02.09.2004 | ||
SE | 02.09.2004 | ||
Former [2005/06] | FI | 02.06.2004 | |
GR | 02.09.2004 | ||
SE | 02.09.2004 | ||
Former [2005/02] | FI | 02.06.2004 | |
SE | 02.09.2004 | ||
Former [2004/52] | SE | 02.09.2004 | Cited in | International search | [XA]JPH08276037 ; | [A]JPH04164464 ; | [A]DE3918867 (DRESSEN NORBERT [DE]) [A] 1,2,4-7 * column 2, line 4 - line 62 *; | [A]DE19711298 (NOPPER HANS [DE]) [A] 1,3,11-13 * column 1, line 23 - line 59; figure 1 *; | [PA]US5980392 (COX ALVIN EMISON [US]) [PA] 1,3,9,10,14,17 * column 3, line 44 - column 4, line 24 ** column 6, line 23 - line 43 * | [XA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970228), vol. 1997, no. 02, & JP08276037 A 19961022 (HIYAMUTA SHOTA) [X] 1,3,6,14,15,17 * abstract * [A] 5 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19920925), vol. 016, no. 461, Database accession no. (C - 0988), & JP04164464 A 19920610 (TAKESHI NAKAGAWA) [A] 1,3,11-13 * abstract * | by applicant | WO9204817 | EP0550473 | EP0744093 | US5711388 | WO9841081 | US5869910 |