EP1208687 - METHOD FOR TRANSMITTING SYMBOLS AND/OR INFORMATION FROM A SENDER TO A RECIPIENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.05.2010 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.08.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 12.09.2012 [2012/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Freie Erfindungskünstler GmbH Neubrücker Strasse 37 13465 Berlin / DE | [2002/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHÜTZE, Petra Neubrücker Str. 37 D-13465 Berlin / DE | 02 /
SCHARMBERG, Nils Räuschstrasse 70 D-13509 Berlin / DE | 03 /
FLOREK, Christof Neubrücker Strasse 37 D-13465 Berlin / DE | [2002/22] | Representative(s) | Felber, Josef Felber & Partner AG Dufourstrasse 116 8008 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2009/40] | Felber, Josef Felber & Partner AG Dufourstrasse 116 8034 Zürich / CH | ||
Former [2006/33] | Felber, Josef Felber & Partner AG, Patentanwälte, Dufourstrasse 116 8034 Zürich / CH | ||
Former [2006/13] | (deleted) | ||
Former [2002/22] | Schneider, Henry, Dipl.-Ing. Gulde Hengelhaupt Ziebig & Schneider Schützenstrasse 15-17 10117 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 00938639.2 | 12.05.2000 | [2002/22] | WO2000EP04339 | Priority number, date | DE19991022068 | 14.05.1999 Original published format: DE 19922068 | DE19991023026 | 19.05.1999 Original published format: DE 19923026 | DE19991040954 | 20.08.1999 Original published format: DE 19940954 | DE19991041642 | 27.08.1999 Original published format: DE 19941642 | DE19991054032 | 29.10.1999 Original published format: DE 19954032 | [2002/22] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0070848 | Date: | 23.11.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1208687 | Date: | 29.05.2002 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.11.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1208687 | Date: | 15.07.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.11.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H04M1/725, G06T15/70 | [2002/22] | CPC: |
H04M1/271 (EP,US);
H04M1/72427 (EP,US);
H04M1/7243 (EP,US);
A63F2300/406 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2009/29] |
Former [2002/22] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM ÜBERMITTELN VON SYMBOLEN UND/ODER INFORMATIONEN VON EINEM SENDER ZU EINEM EMPFÄNGER | [2002/22] | English: | METHOD FOR TRANSMITTING SYMBOLS AND/OR INFORMATION FROM A SENDER TO A RECIPIENT | [2002/22] | French: | PROCEDES DE TRANSMISSION DE SYMBOLES ET/OU D'INFORMATIONS ENTRE UN EXPEDITEUR ET UN DESTINATAIRE | [2002/22] | Entry into regional phase | 07.03.2002 | National basic fee paid | 14.12.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.12.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.12.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 14.12.2001 | Examination requested [2002/22] | 15.07.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 11.03.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.11.2006 | Date of oral proceedings | 20.06.2008 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 26.06.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.10.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 15.10.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.11.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.03.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Divisional application(s) | EP06025008.1 / EP1838074 | Opposition(s) | 16.04.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 18.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2008 | 09   M06   Fee paid on   18.11.2008 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 15.07.2009 | [2012/37] | Cited in | International search | [X]JPH09233515 ; | [A]WO9103885 (MOTOROLA INC [US]) [A] 1,12-19,24-28 * abstract * * page 3, line 3 - page 5, line 10 ** figures 1,3 *; | [XA]WO9702700 (PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [X] 1-36,38 * abstract * * page 1, line 21 - line 26 * * page 2, line 11 - line 29 * * page 6, line 1 - page 7, line 14 * * page 8, line 24 - page 9, line 3 * * page 9, line 32 - page 10, line 3 * * page 11, line 4 - line 18 * * page 11, line 29 - page 12, line 9 * * figures 1,3-8,10,12 * [A] 56,65; | [X]US5618045 (KAGAN MICHAEL [IL], et al) [X] 56-65,72 * abstract * * column 1, line 43 - column 2, line 47 * * column 4, line 14 - line 67 * * figures 1,2 *; | [XA]WO9735280 (ZAPA DIGITAL ARTS LTD [IL], et al) [X] 1-10,12-29,31,38,46-48,51,56-65,67,69,72 * page 4, line 17 - line 21 * * page 4, line 36 - page 5, line 17 * * page 6, line 5 - line 11 * * page 7, line 10 - line 19 * * page 30, line 25 - page 32, line 6 * * page 32, line 17 - page 33, line 16 * * figures 1,13-15,17 * [A] 52,54,55; | [XA]US5738583 (COMAS NELSON R [US], et al) [X] 56,57,59-65 * abstract * * column 1, line 53 - column 2, line 12 * * column 2, line 61 - column 4, line 62 * * column 5, line 47 - column 6, line 18 * * figures 1,2,6 * [A] 66,70-72; | [XA]US5784001 (DELUCA JOAN [US], et al) [X] 1,12-19,24-29,31,38,73 * column 2, line 42 - column 3, line 50 * * column 4, line 33 - line 67 * * column 6, line 19 - line 36 * * column 6, line 51 - line 67 * * figures 1-8,10,14 * [A] 30,39; | [PX]US6044248 (MOCHIZUKI YASUYUKI [JP], et al) [PX] * abstract * * column 1, line 64 - column 2, line 14 * * column 3, line 52 - column 4, line 10 * * column 4, line 62 - column 5, line 28 * * figures 1,3-6 * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980130), vol. 1998, no. 01, & JP09233515 A 19970905 (NEC SHIZUOKA LTD) [X] 1,12-19,24-28 * abstract * |