EP1183031 - QUINOXALINE CONTAINING MEDICAMENTS FOR POST EXPOSURE PROPHYLAXIS OF AN HIV INFECTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 28.05.2004 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.05.2004 | Withdrawal of application | published on 14.07.2004 [2004/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Japanese National Institute of Infectious Diseases 1 Hachimandai, Tsukuba Ibaraki 305-8043 / JP | For all designated states Mori, Kazuyasu 1-803-603 Takezone Tsukuba 306-0032 / JP | For all designated states Yasutomi, Yasuhiro 511-B-42 Kannonji-cho Tsu Mie 514-0062 / JP | For all designated states Sugama, Kazushige 2-2-227-14-103 Sakyo Nara 631-0801 / JP | For all designated states Sawada, Shuzo 6-19-6 Kanokadai-Kitamachi, Kita-ku Kobe 651-1513 / JP | For all designated states Rübsamen-Waigmann, Helga, Prof.Dr. Königsteiner Strasse 113 65812 Bad Soden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/10] | For all designated states The Japanese National Institute of Infectious Diseases 1 Hachimandai, Tsukuba Ibaraki 305-8043 / JP | ||
For all designated states Mori, Kazuyasu 1-803-603 Takezone Tsukuba 306-0032 / JP | |||
For all designated states Yasutomi, Yasuhiro 511-B-42 Kannonji-cho Tsu, Mie 514-0062 / JP | |||
For all designated states Sugama, Kazushige 2-2-227-14-103 Sakyo Nara 631-0801 / JP | |||
For all designated states Sawada, Shuzo 6-19-6 Kanokadai-Kitamachi, Kita-ku Kobe 651-1513 / JP | |||
For all designated states Rübsamen-Waigman, Helga, Prof.Dr. Königsteiner Strasse 113 65812 Bad Soden / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mori, Kazuyasu 1-803-603 Takezone Tsukuba 306-0032 / JP | 02 /
Yasutomi, Yasuhiro 511-B-42 Kannonji-cho Tsu, Mie 514-0062 / JP | 03 /
Sugama, Kazushige 2-2-227-14-103 Sakyo Nara 631-0801 / JP | 04 /
Sawada, Shuzo 6-19-6 Kanokodai-kitamachi, Kita-ku Kobe 651-1513 / JP | 05 /
Rübsamen-Waigmann, Helga Königssteiner Strasse 113 65812 Bad Soden/Taunus / DE | [2002/10] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/10] | HOFFMANN - EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00938669.9 | 22.05.2000 | [2002/10] | WO2000EP04646 | Priority number, date | GB19990011887 | 21.05.1999 Original published format: GB 9911887 | [2002/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0071126 | Date: | 30.11.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1183031 | Date: | 06.03.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.11.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.11.2000 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/495, A61K45/06, A61P31/18 | [2002/10] | CPC: |
A61K31/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/495 (EP,US);
A61K31/498 (EP,US);
A61K31/70 (EP,US);
A61K31/7068 (EP,US);
A61K45/06 (EP,US);
A61P31/18 (EP)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A61K31/495, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/495, A61K31/445 (US,EP);
A61K31/7068, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/7068, A61K31/495 (US,EP); | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT [2002/10] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | CHINOXALIN ENTHALTENDE ARZNEIMITTEL ZUR HIV-INFEKTIONSVERHÜTUNG NACH KONTAKT MIT DEM VIRUS | [2002/10] | English: | QUINOXALINE CONTAINING MEDICAMENTS FOR POST EXPOSURE PROPHYLAXIS OF AN HIV INFECTION | [2002/10] | French: | MEDICAMENTS CONTENANT DE LA QUINOXALINE DESTINES A LA PROPHYLAXIE D'UNE INFECTION A VIH APRES EXPOSITION | [2002/10] | Entry into regional phase | 21.12.2001 | National basic fee paid | 21.12.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.12.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.12.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 21.12.2001 | Examination requested [2002/10] | 18.05.2004 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2004/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]DE19703131 (BAYER AG [DE]) [X] 1-15 * claims 1-6 *; | [X]EP0728481 (BAYER AG [DE]) [X] 1-11 * claims 1-5 *; | [XD]EP0708093 (HOECHST AG [DE]) [XD] 1-11 * claims 1-4,7-9 * * page 5, line 4 - line 27 *; | [XD]DE4342024 (HOECHST AG [DE]) [XD] 1-11 * claim 1 * * page 8, line 46 - line 48 * * page 15, line 58 - page 16, line 9 *; | [A] - KLEIM J -P ET AL, "ACTIVITY OF A NOVEL QUINOXALINE DERIVATIVE AGAINST HUMAN IMMUNODIFICIENCY VIRUS TYPE 1 REVERSE TRANSCRIPTASE AND VIRAL REPLICATION", ANTIMICROBIAL AGENTS AND CHEMOTHERAPY,US,AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR MICROBIOLOGY, WASHINGTON, DC, (1993), vol. 37, no. 8, ISSN 0066-4804, pages 1659 - 1664, XP000885676 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * |