27.07.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.08.2007 [2007/35] |
19.01.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.02.2007 [2007/08] |
23.09.2005 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.11.2005 [2005/45] |
22.04.2005 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.06.2005 [2005/23] |
24.09.2004 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.11.2004 [2004/46] |
20.08.2004 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.10.2004 [2004/41] |
23.07.2004 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 08.09.2004 [2004/37] |
11.06.2004 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.07.2004 [2004/31] |
28.05.2004 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.07.2004 [2004/29] |
27.02.2004 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.04.2004 [2004/16] |
13.02.2004 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 31.03.2004 [2004/14] |
06.02.2004 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.03.2004 [2004/13] |
30.01.2004 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.03.2004 [2004/12] |
14.11.2003 |
Change - applicant |
published on 02.01.2004 [2004/01] |
14.11.2003 |
Change - representative |
published on 02.01.2004 [2004/01] |
02.08.2003 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 17.09.2003 [2003/38] |
24.07.2003 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
24.07.2003 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
07.06.2003 |
Renewal fee |
|
24.02.2003 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
13.07.2002 |
Renewal fee |
|
08.03.2002 |
Change - representative |
published on 24.04.2002 [2002/17] |
22.02.2002 |
Change - inventor |
published on 10.04.2002 [2002/15] |
22.02.2002 |
Change - representative |
published on 10.04.2002 [2002/15] |
18.01.2002 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 06.03.2002 [2002/10] |
18.01.2002 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 06.03.2002 [2002/10] |
14.01.2002 |
Change - extension states |
|
23.11.2001 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
06.02.2001 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
19.12.2000 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
18.12.2000 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
15.09.2000 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
26.07.2000 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|