EP1200311 - APPARATUS FOR GRIPPING AND DIVIDING A FILM USED FOR WRAPPING A PALETTISED LOAD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2002/18] | APPARATUS FOR GRIPPING AND CUTTING A FILM USED FOR WRAPPING A PALETTISED LOAD | ||
[2003/20] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.04.2004 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.11.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 12.01.2005 [2005/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Robopac S.A. Strada Rovereta, 27 47031 Falciano / SM | [2002/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ROSSI, Bruno Via Dario Campana, 18 I-47900 Rimini / IT | 02 /
BETTINI, Rodolfo Via Lombardia, 8 I-40139 Bologna / IT | [2002/18] | Representative(s) | Lanzoni, Luciano, et al Bugnion S.p.A. Via di Corticella, 87 40128 Bologna / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2002/18] | Lanzoni, Luciano, et al c/o BUGNION S.p.A. Via Goito, 18 40126 Bologna / IT | Application number, filing date | 00939004.8 | 10.07.2000 | [2002/18] | WO2000IB00930 | Priority number, date | IT1999BO00402 | 16.07.1999 Original published format: IT BO990402 | [2002/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0105661 | Date: | 25.01.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1200311 | Date: | 02.05.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.01.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1200311 | Date: | 28.05.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.01.2001 | Classification | IPC: | B65B11/04 | [2002/18] | CPC: |
B65B11/045 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/18] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUM ERGREIFEN UND ZERSCHNEIDEN EINER ZUM UMHÜLLEN EINER PALETTISIERTEN LADUNG ANGEWENDETEN FOLIE | [2002/18] | English: | APPARATUS FOR GRIPPING AND DIVIDING A FILM USED FOR WRAPPING A PALETTISED LOAD | [2003/20] | French: | APPAREIL PERMETTANT DE PRENDRE ET COUPER UN FILM UTILISE POUR EMBALLER DES CHARGES EN PALETTE | [2002/18] |
Former [2002/18] | APPARATUS FOR GRIPPING AND CUTTING A FILM USED FOR WRAPPING A PALETTISED LOAD | Entry into regional phase | 08.02.2002 | National basic fee paid | 08.02.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.02.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.02.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 08.02.2002 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.02.2002 | Examination requested [2002/18] | 26.09.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.12.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 10.12.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.03.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 28.05.2003 | CH | 28.05.2003 | LI | 28.05.2003 | CY | 10.07.2003 | IE | 10.07.2003 | LU | 10.07.2003 | MC | 31.07.2003 | GR | 28.08.2003 | PT | 28.08.2003 | [2005/02] |
Former [2004/40] | AT | 28.05.2003 | |
CH | 28.05.2003 | ||
LI | 28.05.2003 | ||
CY | 10.07.2003 | ||
IE | 10.07.2003 | ||
LU | 10.07.2003 | ||
GR | 28.08.2003 | ||
PT | 28.08.2003 | ||
Former [2004/39] | AT | 28.05.2003 | |
CH | 28.05.2003 | ||
LI | 28.05.2003 | ||
CY | 10.07.2003 | ||
LU | 10.07.2003 | ||
GR | 28.08.2003 | ||
PT | 28.08.2003 | ||
Former [2004/36] | AT | 28.05.2003 | |
CH | 28.05.2003 | ||
LI | 28.05.2003 | ||
CY | 10.07.2003 | ||
GR | 28.08.2003 | ||
PT | 28.08.2003 | ||
Former [2004/03] | AT | 28.05.2003 | |
CH | 28.05.2003 | ||
LI | 28.05.2003 | ||
GR | 28.08.2003 | ||
PT | 28.08.2003 | ||
Former [2004/02] | CH | 28.05.2003 | |
LI | 28.05.2003 | ||
GR | 28.08.2003 | ||
PT | 28.08.2003 | ||
Former [2004/01] | CH | 28.05.2003 | |
LI | 28.05.2003 | Cited in | International search | [Y]US4216640 (KAUFMAN CHARLES R [US]) [Y] 5 * column 8, line 23 - column 11, line 8; figure - *; | [A]US4255918 (LANCASTER PATRICK R, et al); | [XY]US5138818 (HUMPHREY JOHN R [US]) [X] 1-3,6,11 * column 10, line 21 - column 12, line 36; figure -; claim - * [Y] 5,7,12; | [X]EP0630813 (ITW MIMA EUROP [FR]) [X] 1,7,11 * column 3, line 18 - column 6, line 29; figure - *; | [Y]WO9906279 (ROBOPAC SA [SM], et al) [Y] 7,12 * page 12, line 1 - page 18, line 19; figure - * |