EP1181206 - RECLOSABLE STORAGE BAG WITH COLOUR CLOSURE INDICATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.12.2002 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.2008 | Change - representative | published on 24.09.2008 [2008/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2002/09] | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CERONE, Daniel, Raymond 5400 Creekside Court West Chester, OH 45069 / US | 02 /
RANDALL, Catherine, Jean 3202 Ashwood Drive Cincinnati, OH 45213 / US | [2002/09] | Representative(s) | Kremer, Véronique Marie Joséphine, et al Procter & Gamble Service GmbH IP Department Sulzbacher Straße 40-50 65824 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/39] | Kremer, Véronique Marie Joséphine, et al Procter & Gamble Service GmbH Sulzbacher Strasse 40-50 65824 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE | ||
Former [2002/09] | Kremer, Véronique, et al Procter & Gamble Service GmbH Sulzbacher Strasse 40 65824 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE | Application number, filing date | 00939315.8 | 19.05.2000 | [2002/09] | WO2000US13850 | Priority number, date | US19990316832 | 21.05.1999 Original published format: US 316832 | [2002/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0071433 | Date: | 30.11.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1181206 | Date: | 27.02.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.11.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.11.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B65D33/20, B65D33/25 | [2002/09] | CPC: |
B65D33/2508 (EP);
B65D33/25 (KR);
B65D33/20 (EP);
B65D33/255 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU [2002/09] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WIEDERVERSCHLIESSBARE BEUTEL MIT FARBENVERSCHLIESSANZEIGE | [2002/09] | English: | RECLOSABLE STORAGE BAG WITH COLOUR CLOSURE INDICATOR | [2002/09] | French: | SAC DE RANGEMENT REFERMABLE AVEC TEMOIN DE FERMETURE COLORE | [2002/09] | Entry into regional phase | 23.11.2001 | National basic fee paid | 23.11.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.11.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.11.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 23.11.2001 | Examination requested [2002/09] | 22.03.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.07.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/06] | 06.09.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2003/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]US5783012 (PORCHIA JOSE [US], et al) [X] 1,2,5,6,8,10 * column W * [Y] 3,4,7,9; | [Y]US5836056 (PORCHIA JOSE [US], et al) [Y] 3,4 * column A *; | [Y]US5407277 (BURKE JAMES W [US], et al) [Y] 7 * column 3, line 10 - line 30 *; | [YX]WO9513225 (H D PLASTICS LTD [GB], et al) [Y] 9 * page 13, paragraph L - page 14, paragraph 1 * [X] 1,2,5,6,10; | [X]US5397182 (GAIBLE SUSAN C [US], et al) [X] 1-3,6,10 * column W *; | [X]US5832145 (DAIS BRIAN C [US], et al) [X] 1,2,5,6,10 * column W * | by applicant | US5554093 | US5575747 |