EP1180132 - DETERGENT COMPOSTITIONS COMPRISING POLYMERIC SUDS ENHANCERS WHICH HAVE IMPROVED MILDNESS AND SKIN FEEL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.01.2007 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.01.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.02.2007 [2007/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2002/08] | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KASTURI, Chandrika 10044 Cliffwood Court Cincinnati, OH 45241 / US | 02 /
SCHAFER, Michael, Gayle 6032 South Kramer Drive Alexandria, KY 41001 / US | 03 /
SPEARS, Marsha, Jean 21 Hartweg Avenue Ft. Thomas, KY 41075 / US | 04 /
HUTTON, Howard, David 6611 Oregonia Road Oregonia, OH 45054 / US | 05 /
SIVIK, Mark, Robert 2434 Sheffield Court Ft. Mitchell, KY 41017 / US | 06 /
SCHEPER, William, Michael 2393 Picnic Woods Drive Lawrenceburg, IN 47025 / US | 07 /
KLUESENER, Bernard, William 11619 New Biddinger Road Harrison, OH 45030 / US | [2002/08] | Representative(s) | Goodier, Claire-Louise, et al N.V.Procter & Gamble Services Company S.A. Temselaan 100 1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/36] | Goodier, Claire, et al N.V.Procter & Gamble Services Company S.A. Temselaan 100 B-1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE | ||
Former [2002/08] | Mather, Peter Geoffrey, et al BVBA Procter & Gamble Europe SPRL, Temselaan 100 1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE | Application number, filing date | 00939347.1 | 25.05.2000 | [2002/08] | WO2000US14405 | Priority number, date | US19990135888P | 26.05.1999 Original published format: US 135888 P | [2002/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0071658 | Date: | 30.11.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1180132 | Date: | 20.02.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.11.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.11.2000 | Classification | IPC: | C11D3/37, A61K7/48, C11D3/30 | [2002/08] | CPC: |
A61K8/39 (EP);
A61K8/40 (EP);
A61K8/44 (EP);
A61K8/463 (EP);
A61K8/466 (EP);
A61K8/55 (EP);
A61K8/8152 (EP);
A61K8/8158 (EP);
A61Q19/10 (EP);
A61Q5/02 (EP);
C11D1/008 (EP);
C11D3/0094 (EP);
C11D3/30 (EP);
C11D3/3757 (EP);
C11D3/3769 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/08] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WASCHMITTELZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN ENTHALTEND POLYMERE SCHAUMBILDER MIT VERBESSERTEN HAUTSANFTHEIT UND HAUTGEFÜHL | [2002/08] | English: | DETERGENT COMPOSTITIONS COMPRISING POLYMERIC SUDS ENHANCERS WHICH HAVE IMPROVED MILDNESS AND SKIN FEEL | [2002/08] | French: | COMPOSITIONS DETERGENTS COMPRENANT DES RENFOR ATEURS DE SAVONNAGE POLYMERES OFFRANT UNE PLUS GRANDE DOUCEUR ET UNE MEILLEURE SENSATION AU CONTACT DE LA PEAU | [2002/08] | Entry into regional phase | 23.11.2001 | National basic fee paid | 23.11.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.11.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.11.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 23.11.2001 | Examination requested [2002/08] | 29.03.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.12.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.03.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.08.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/06] | 15.09.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2007/06] | Request for further processing for: | 18.12.2004 | Request for further processing filed | 18.12.2004 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 04.01.2005 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [PXD]WO9927058 (KASTURI CHANDRIKA ;KLUESENER BERNARD WILLIAM (US); SCHAFER MICHAEL) [PXD] 1,4,8,11-13,15-23,26,27 * example -; claims 1-11; table - *; | [PXD]WO9927054 (KASTURI CHANDRIKA ;SCHAFER MICHAEL GAYLE (US); PROCTER & GAMBLE (U) [PXD] 1,15-23,26,27 * example -; claims 1-10; table - *; | [PXD]WO9927053 (KASTURI CHANDRIKA ;KLUESENER BERNARD WILLIAM (US); SCHAFER MICHAEL) [PXD] 1,4,6,7,14-23,26 * example -; claims 1-10; table - *; | [X]GB1584127 (NAT STARCH CHEM CORP) [X] 1-5,8,10-13,15-17,22-24 * page 3, line 58 - page 4, line 5; examples I-VIII; claims 1-4; tables I-III *; | [X]US4784789 (JESCHKE PETER ET AL) [X] 1,8,15-17,22,23,27 * examples XI,XII; claims 1-13 *; | [X]DE19545630 (HENKEL KGAA) [X] 1,8,15-17,22,23,27 * polymer b;; examples B3,B8,B13,B17,B21; claims 3-14; tables 1,2,5-5 *; | [X]EP0013585 (UNILEVER LTD) [X] 1,4,5,15-17,22,23 * page 1, line 4 - line 7; claims 1,11 *; | [X]EP0308190 (PROCTER & GAMBLE) [X] 8-10,12,23,24 * page 6, line 53 - line 60; examples G,H; claims 1,10; table 2 *; | [XP]JPH11217588 | [XP] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19991130), vol. 1999, no. 13, & JP11217588 A 19990810 (NOF CORP;NAKABAYASHI NORIO; ISHIHARA KAZUHIKO) [XP] 1 * abstract * |