EP1274431 - 10,11-DIFLUOROMETHYLENEDIOXYCAMPTOTHECIN COMPOUNDS WITH TOPOISOMERASE I INHIBITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.04.2004 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.10.2009 | Change - representative | published on 25.11.2009 [2009/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RESEARCH TRIANGLE INSTITUTE Office of Research Contracs, 3040 Cornwallis Road Research Triangle Park, NC 27709 / US | For all designated states Bristol-Myers Squibb Company Route 206 and Province Line Road Princeton, NJ 08543 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/37] | For all designated states RESEARCH TRIANGLE INSTITUTE Office of Research Contracs, 3040 Cornwallis Road Research Triangle Park, NC 27709 / US | ||
For all designated states Bristol-Myers Squibb Company Route 206 and Province Line Road Princeton NJ 05843-4000 / US | |||
Former [2003/03] | For all designated states RESEARCH TRIANGLE INSTITUTE Office of Research Contracs, 3040 Cornwallis Road Research Triangle Park, NC 27709 / US | ||
For all designated states Bristol-Myers Squibb Company Route 206 & Provinceline Road Princeton, NJ 08543-4000 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WALL, Monroe E. Villa 406, Carolina Meadows Chapel Hill, NC 27514 / US | 02 /
WANI, Manuskh C. 2801 Legion Avenue Durham, NC 27707 / US | 03 /
MANIKUMAR, Govindarajan 8008 Selfridge Court Raleigh, NC 27615 / US | 04 /
BALASUBRAMANIAN, Neelakantan 26 Horsebarn Lane Madison, CT 06443 / US | 05 /
VYAS, Dolatrai 19 Thames Way Madison, CT 06443 / US | [2003/03] | Representative(s) | Ilgart, Jean-Christophe, et al BREVALEX 95, Rue d'Amsterdam 75378 Paris Cedex 8 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/48] | Ilgart, Jean-Christophe, et al Brevalex 3, rue du Docteur Lancereaux 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2003/03] | Ilgart, Jean-Christophe, et al BREVALEX, 3, rue du Docteur Lancereaux 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 00939455.2 | 14.06.2000 | [2003/03] | WO2000US15034 | Priority number, date | US19990474758 | 29.12.1999 Original published format: US 474758 | [2003/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0149291 | Date: | 12.07.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1274431 | Date: | 15.01.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.07.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 12.07.2001 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.03.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/4741, A61K31/4745, C07D491/22, A61K31/435 | [2003/18] | CPC: |
C07D491/22 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/4738 (KR);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P35/02 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2003/03] | A61K31/4741, A61K31/4745, C07D491/22 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2003/03] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | 10,11-DIFLUOROMETHYLENDIOXYCAMTOTHECIN-VERBINDUNGEN MIT TOPOISOMERASE-I INHIBITION | [2003/03] | English: | 10,11-DIFLUOROMETHYLENEDIOXYCAMPTOTHECIN COMPOUNDS WITH TOPOISOMERASE I INHIBITION | [2003/03] | French: | COMPOSES 10, 11-DIFLUOROMETHYLENEDIOXYCAMPTOTHECINE AVEC INHIBITION DE TOPOISOMERASE I | [2003/03] | Entry into regional phase | 08.07.2002 | National basic fee paid | 08.07.2002 | Search fee paid | 08.07.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.07.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.07.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 11.07.2002 | Examination requested [2003/03] | 31.07.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.12.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/25] | 16.01.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2004/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9719085 (RES TRIANGLE INST [US]) [X] 1-10* claim 1 *; | [X]US5646159 (WALL MONROE E [US], et al) [X] 1-10 * claim 1 * | International search | [X] - BRANGI M. ET AL., "Camptothecin resistance: Role of the ATP-binding cassette(ABC), mitoxantrone-resistance half-transporter(MXR) and potential for glucuronidation in MXR-expressing cells", CANCER RES.,, (19991201), vol. 59, pages 5938 - 5946, XP002930493 |