EP1190253 - BIOSENSORS WHICH UTILIZE CHARGE NEUTRAL CONJUGATED POLYMERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.01.2005 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.01.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.03.2005 [2005/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MOTOROLA, INC. 1303 East Algonquin Road Schaumburg, IL 60196 / US | [2002/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LI, Changming 3138 E. Muirwood Drive Phoenix, AZ 85048 / US | 02 /
SHI, Song 4521 E. Gold Poppy Way Phoenix, AZ 84044 / US | 03 /
CHOONG, Vi-En 3730 S. Mill Avenue Apartment B 111 Tempe, AZ 85282 / US | 04 /
MARACAS, George 2613 East Bighorn Avenue Phoenix, AZ 85048-9512 / US | [2002/13] | Representative(s) | Watson, Robert James, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/13] | Watson, Robert James, et al Mewburn Ellis York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 00939709.2 | 09.06.2000 | [2002/13] | WO2000US15832 | Priority number, date | US19990138437P | 10.06.1999 Original published format: US 138437 P | [2002/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0077523 | Date: | 21.12.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1190253 | Date: | 27.03.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.12.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.12.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/543, C12Q1/68 | [2002/13] | CPC: |
G01N33/5438 (EP);
C12Q1/6825 (EP);
B01J2219/00605 (EP);
B01J2219/00612 (EP);
B01J2219/00614 (EP);
B01J2219/00626 (EP);
B01J2219/00637 (EP);
B01J2219/00653 (EP);
B01J2219/00659 (EP);
| C-Set: |
C12Q1/6825, C12Q2565/607 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/13] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANWENDUNG VON NEUTRAL GELADENEN KONJUGIERTEN POLYMEREN IN BIOSENSOREN | [2002/13] | English: | BIOSENSORS WHICH UTILIZE CHARGE NEUTRAL CONJUGATED POLYMERS | [2002/13] | French: | BIOCAPTEURS UTILISANT DES POLYMERES CONJUGUES A CHARGE NEUTRE | [2002/13] | Entry into regional phase | 04.01.2002 | National basic fee paid | 04.01.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.01.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.01.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 04.01.2002 | Examination requested [2002/13] | 31.03.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.08.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/09] | 24.09.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2005/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [DA]US5837859 (ROGET ANDRE ET AL) [DA] 1,9,10,15,17 * column 5, line 35 - column 7, line 37 *; | [DA]WO9529199 (BIO MERIEUX ;GARNIER FRANCIS (FR)) [DA] 1,9,10,15,17 * the whole document *; | [A] - GARNER B; GEORGEVICH A; HODGSON A J; LIU L; WALLACE G G, "Polypyrrole-heparin composites as stimulus-responsive substrates for endothelial cell growth", JOURNAL OF BIOMEDICAL MATERIALS RESEARCH, (199902), vol. 44, pages 121 - 129, XP000964695 [A] 1-6 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/(SICI)1097-4636(199902)44:2<121::AID-JBM1>3.0.CO;2-A | [A] - SARGENT, ANITA ET AL, "The electrochemistry of antibody-modified conducting polymer electrodes", J. ELECTROANAL. CHEM. (1999), 470(2), 144-156, XP000964567 [A] 1-17 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0022-0728(99)00231-4 | [A] - DESIMONI E; BASSANI I, "A polypyrrole-coated, piezoelectric sensor for CrVI. Preliminary results", ANALYTICAL COMMUNICATIONS, (199902), vol. 36, pages 45 - 46, XP000964609 [A] 1,5,15,16 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/a809667h | [A] - PREZYNA, LYNETTE A. ET AL, "Interaction of cationic polypeptides with electroactive polypyrrole /poly(styrene sulfonate) and poly(N- methylpyrrole)/poly(styrenesulfonate) films", SYNTH. MET. (1991), 41(3), 979-81, XP000964589 [A] 1-6,15,16 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0379-6779(91)91540-Q | [DA] - LIVACHE T ET AL, "Polypyrrole DNA chip on a silicon device: Example of hepatitis C virus typing", ANALYTICAL BIOCHEMISTRY,ACADEMIC PRESS, SAN DIEGO, CA,US, (1998), vol. 255, ISSN 0003-2697, pages 188 - 194, XP002114813 [DA] 1,9,10,15,17 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/abio.1997.2462 | Examination | US5766515 |