EP1203093 - 2'-FLUOROPYRIMIDINE ANTI-CALF INTESTINAL PHOSPHATASE NUCLEIC ACID LIGANDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.08.2004 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.08.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.10.2004 [2004/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GILEAD SCIENCES, INC. 333 Lakeside Drive Foster City CA 94404 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2002/19] | For all designated states GILEAD SCIENCES, INC. 333 Lakeside Drive Foster City CA 94404 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DROLET, Daniel 6844 Bugle Court Boulder, CO 80301 / US | 02 /
GOLD, Larry 1033 5th Street Boulder, CO 80302 / US | [2002/19] | Representative(s) | Uexküll & Stolberg Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/19] | UEXKÜLL & STOLBERG Patentanwälte Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 00939737.3 | 09.06.2000 | [2002/19] | WO2000US15920 | Priority number, date | US19990335012 | 17.06.1999 Original published format: US 335012 | [2002/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0079004 | Date: | 28.12.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1203093 | Date: | 08.05.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.12.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 28.12.2000 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.01.2003 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/68, C12P19/34, C07H19/00, C07H21/00, C07H21/02, C07H21/04 | [2002/19] | CPC: |
C12N15/1137 (EP,US);
C12Q1/6811 (EP,US);
C12N2310/18 (EP,US);
C12N2310/322 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C12Q1/6811, C12Q2565/531, C12Q2523/313 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/19] | Extension states | AL | 17.01.2002 | LT | 17.01.2002 | LV | 17.01.2002 | MK | 17.01.2002 | RO | 17.01.2002 | SI | 17.01.2002 | Title | German: | 2'-FLUOROPYRIMIDIN-NUKLEINSÄURELIGANDEN DIE GEGEN DIE PHOSPHATASE AUS KÄLBERDARM GERICHTET SIND | [2002/19] | English: | 2'-FLUOROPYRIMIDINE ANTI-CALF INTESTINAL PHOSPHATASE NUCLEIC ACID LIGANDS | [2002/19] | French: | LIGANDS D'ACIDE NUCLEIQUE A BASE DE 2'-FLUOROPYRIMIDINE ET DIRIGES CONTRE LA PHOSPHATASE INTESTINALE DU VEAU | [2002/19] | Entry into regional phase | 17.01.2002 | National basic fee paid | 17.01.2002 | Search fee paid | 17.01.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.01.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.12.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 17.01.2002 | Examination requested [2002/19] | 30.09.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.04.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/42] | 17.05.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2004/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5843653 (GOLD LARRY [US], et al) [X] 1-13,20-23 * column 1, line 16 - line 35 *; | [X]WO9221959 (DIAGNOSTIC CONCEPTS INT [US]) [X] 1-13,20-23 * abstract * * page 17, line 12 - page 18, line 2 *; | [XP] - DROLET D W ET AL, "A high throughput platform for systematic evolution of ligands by exponential enrichment (SELEX).", COMBINATORIAL CHEMISTRY & HIGH THROUGHPUT SCREENING. NETHERLANDS OCT 1999, (199910), vol. 2, no. 5, ISSN 1386-2073, pages 271 - 278, XP001104963 [XP] 1-13,20-23 * the whole document * | International search | [Y]US5731424 (TOOTHMAN PENELOPE J [US], et al); | [Y]US5580737 (POLISKY BARRY [US], et al) |