EP1212665 - SYSTEM AND METHOD OF OPERATION OF A DIGITAL MASS FLOW CONTROLLER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.08.2004 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 16.01.2008 [2008/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mykrolis Corporation 129 Concord Road Billerica, MA 01821-4600 / US | [2003/41] |
Former [2003/39] | For all designated states Mykrolis Corporation 129 Concord Road Billeria, MA 01821-4600 / US | ||
Former [2002/27] | For all designated states Mykrolis Corporation One Patriots Park Bedford, MA 01730 / US | ||
Former [2002/24] | For all designated states MILLIPORE CORPORATION 80 Ashby Road Bedford, Massachusetts 01730-2271 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TINSLEY, Kenneth, E. 3128 Timber Brook Drive Plano, TX 75074 / US | 02 /
TARIQ, Faisal 1802 Barton Springs Court Allen, TX 75002 / US | [2002/34] |
Former [2002/24] | 01 /
TINSLEY, Kenneth, E. 3128 Timber Brook Drive Plano, TX 75074 / US | ||
02 /
TARIQ, Faisal 7401 Alma Drive, No. 2822 Plano, TX 75025 / US | Representative(s) | Schäfer, Wolfgang Dreiss Patentanwälte Postfach 10 37 62 70032 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/24] | Schäfer, Wolfgang, Dipl.-Ing. Dreiss, Fuhlendorf, Steimle & Becker Postfach 10 37 62 70032 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 00939986.6 | 21.06.2000 | [2002/24] | WO2000US17062 | Priority number, date | US19990350744 | 09.07.1999 Original published format: US 350744 | [2002/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0104715 | Date: | 18.01.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1212665 | Date: | 12.06.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.01.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1212665 | Date: | 08.10.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.01.2001 | Classification | IPC: | G05D7/06 | [2002/24] | CPC: |
G05D7/0635 (EP,KR,US);
G05D7/0676 (KR);
Y10T137/0324 (EP,US);
Y10T137/0368 (EP,US);
Y10T137/7759 (EP,US);
Y10T137/7761 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/24] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM BERTREIBEN EINES DIGITALEN MASSENDURCHFLUSSREGLERS | [2003/08] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD OF OPERATION OF A DIGITAL MASS FLOW CONTROLLER | [2002/24] | French: | SYSTEME ET PROCEDE DE COMMANDE D'UN REGULATEUR NUMERIQUE DE DEBIT MASSIQUE | [2002/24] |
Former [2002/24] | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM BETRIEB EINES MASSENDURCHFLUSSREGLERS | Entry into regional phase | 22.01.2002 | National basic fee paid | 22.01.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.01.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.02.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 22.01.2002 | Examination requested [2002/24] | 04.07.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.10.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.02.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.08.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 01.08.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP03016602.9 / EP1359487 | Opposition(s) | 09.07.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 08.10.2003 | BE | 08.10.2003 | CH | 08.10.2003 | CY | 08.10.2003 | FI | 08.10.2003 | LI | 08.10.2003 | DK | 08.01.2004 | GR | 08.01.2004 | SE | 08.01.2004 | ES | 19.01.2004 | PT | 08.03.2004 | LU | 21.06.2004 | MC | 30.06.2004 | [2008/03] |
Former [2007/08] | AT | 08.10.2003 | |
BE | 08.10.2003 | ||
CH | 08.10.2003 | ||
CY | 08.10.2003 | ||
FI | 08.10.2003 | ||
LI | 08.10.2003 | ||
DK | 08.01.2004 | ||
GR | 08.01.2004 | ||
SE | 08.01.2004 | ||
ES | 19.01.2004 | ||
LU | 21.06.2004 | ||
MC | 30.06.2004 | ||
Former [2005/23] | AT | 08.10.2003 | |
BE | 08.10.2003 | ||
CH | 08.10.2003 | ||
FI | 08.10.2003 | ||
LI | 08.10.2003 | ||
DK | 08.01.2004 | ||
GR | 08.01.2004 | ||
SE | 08.01.2004 | ||
ES | 19.01.2004 | ||
LU | 21.06.2004 | ||
MC | 30.06.2004 | ||
Former [2005/11] | AT | 08.10.2003 | |
BE | 08.10.2003 | ||
CH | 08.10.2003 | ||
FI | 08.10.2003 | ||
LI | 08.10.2003 | ||
DK | 08.01.2004 | ||
GR | 08.01.2004 | ||
SE | 08.01.2004 | ||
ES | 19.01.2004 | ||
MC | 30.06.2004 | ||
Former [2004/52] | AT | 08.10.2003 | |
BE | 08.10.2003 | ||
CH | 08.10.2003 | ||
FI | 08.10.2003 | ||
LI | 08.10.2003 | ||
DK | 08.01.2004 | ||
GR | 08.01.2004 | ||
SE | 08.01.2004 | ||
ES | 19.01.2004 | ||
Former [2004/46] | AT | 08.10.2003 | |
CH | 08.10.2003 | ||
FI | 08.10.2003 | ||
LI | 08.10.2003 | ||
DK | 08.01.2004 | ||
GR | 08.01.2004 | ||
SE | 08.01.2004 | ||
ES | 19.01.2004 | ||
Former [2004/41] | AT | 08.10.2003 | |
CH | 08.10.2003 | ||
FI | 08.10.2003 | ||
LI | 08.10.2003 | ||
DK | 08.01.2004 | ||
GR | 08.01.2004 | ||
SE | 08.01.2004 | ||
Former [2004/33] | AT | 08.10.2003 | |
CH | 08.10.2003 | ||
FI | 08.10.2003 | ||
LI | 08.10.2003 | ||
GR | 08.01.2004 | ||
SE | 08.01.2004 | ||
Former [2004/31] | AT | 08.10.2003 | |
FI | 08.10.2003 | ||
SE | 08.01.2004 | ||
Former [2004/26] | FI | 08.10.2003 | |
SE | 08.01.2004 | ||
Former [2004/24] | SE | 08.01.2004 | Cited in | International search | [XAY]EP0110325 (FUJI KINZOKU KOSAKU KK [JP]) [X] 1-3,12,13 * the whole document * [A] 4,5,7-11,14-16 [Y] 6; | [XAY]US5062446 (ANDERSON RICHARD L [US]) [X] 12,13 * the whole document * [A] 1-5,7-11,14-16 [Y] 6; | [A]EP0834723 (EMERSON ELECTRIC CO [US]) [A] 1-16* figure 5 * |