EP1105041 - METHOD OF AND DEVICE FOR CLEANING A SLIP RING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.09.2005 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.06.2006 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 02.08.2006 [2006/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2001/24] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SOUPART, Ronald, R., J. Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [2001/24] | Representative(s) | Cohen, Julius Simon Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2001/24] | Cohen, Julius Simon Internationaal Octrooibureau B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6 5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 00940385.8 | 19.06.2000 | [2001/24] | WO2000EP05640 | Priority number, date | EP19990201994 | 22.06.1999 Original published format: EP 99201994 | [2001/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0078216 | Date: | 28.12.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1105041 | Date: | 13.06.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.12.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1105041 | Date: | 10.11.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.12.2000 | Classification | IPC: | A61B6/00, H05G1/10 | [2001/24] | CPC: |
A61B6/56 (EP,US);
H01R39/08 (EP,US);
H01R43/002 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [2004/46] |
Former [2001/24] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND GERÄT ZUR REINIGUNG EINES SCHLEIFRINGES | [2001/24] | English: | METHOD OF AND DEVICE FOR CLEANING A SLIP RING | [2001/24] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF DE NETTOYAGE D'UNE BAGUE COLLECTRICE | [2001/24] | Entry into regional phase | 22.03.2001 | National basic fee paid | 28.06.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.06.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.06.2001 | Examination requested [2001/34] | 20.11.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.01.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.02.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.09.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 06.09.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.08.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 10.11.2004 | NL | 10.11.2004 | [2006/31] |
Former [2006/14] | NL | 10.11.2004 | Cited in | International search | [A]JPH04241843 ; | [A]JPH07163554 ; | [A]US5224138 (HIRAO YOSHIKI [JP], et al) [A] 1 * column 4, line 35 - line 54; tables 3,4 *; | [A]US5402461 (KUDO HIDETOSHI [JP]) [A] 1,12 * column 1, line 43 - line 62 * * column 4, line 57 - column 5, line 10 * * column 9, line 25 - line 30 * * column 10, line 54 - line 61 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930108), vol. 017, no. 011, Database accession no. (C - 1015), & JP04241843 A 19920828 (TOSHIBA CORP) [A] 1,12 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19951031), vol. 1995, no. 09, & JP07163554 A 19950627 (HITACHI MEDICAL CORP) [A] 1 * abstract * | by applicant | US5018174 |