EP1194681 - DEVICE AND METHOD FOR REMOVING SOOTY PARTICULATE FROM EXHAUST GASES FROM COMBUSTION PROCESSES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 17.07.2009 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2009 | Patent maintained (B2 publication) | published on 19.08.2009 [2009/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JOHNSON MATTHEY PUBLIC LIMITED COMPANY 2-4 Cockspur Street, Trafalgar Square London SW1Y 5BQ / GB | [2009/34] |
Former [2002/15] | For all designated states JOHNSON MATTHEY PUBLIC LIMITED COMPANY 2-4 Cockspur Street, Trafalgar Square London SW1Y 5BQ / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ALLANSSON, Ronny Alafors 6042 434 96 Kungsbacka / SE | 02 /
ANDREASSON, Anders Klas Traneredsvagen 60 A 426 77 V Frolunda / SE | 03 /
CHANDER, Guy Richard 48 Harlton Road, Little Eversden Cambridge CB3 7HB / GB | 04 /
WARREN, James Patrick, c/o The Open University Cintra House, 12 Hills Road Cambridge CB2 1PF / GB | [2002/15] | Representative(s) | Nunn, Andrew Dominic, et al Johnson Matthey Technology Centre Blount's Court Sonning Common Reading Berkshire RG4 9NH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/15] | Nunn, Andrew Dominic, et al Johnson Matthey Technology Centre, Blount's Court, Sonning Common Reading, Berkshire RG4 9NH / GB | Application number, filing date | 00940554.9 | 15.06.2000 | [2002/15] | WO2000GB02342 | Priority number, date | GB19990015939 | 08.07.1999 Original published format: GB 9915939 | [2002/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0104466 | Date: | 18.01.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1194681 | Date: | 10.04.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.01.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1194681 | Date: | 24.11.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/48] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP1194681 | Date: | 19.08.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.01.2001 | Classification | IPC: | F01N3/021, F01N3/035, F01N3/28 | [2002/15] | CPC: |
F01N3/2066 (EP,US);
F01N13/0097 (EP,US);
F01N3/0231 (EP,US);
F01N3/029 (EP,US);
F01N3/035 (EP,US);
F01N3/2882 (EP,US);
F01N13/14 (EP,US);
F01N2250/02 (EP,US);
F01N2330/06 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/15] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM ENTFERNEN VON RUSSPARTIKELN AUS ABGASEN VON VERBRENNUNGSPROZESSEN | [2002/15] | English: | DEVICE AND METHOD FOR REMOVING SOOTY PARTICULATE FROM EXHAUST GASES FROM COMBUSTION PROCESSES | [2002/15] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCEDE PERMETTANT D'ENLEVER LES PARTICULES DE SUIE DES GAZ D'ECHAPPEMENT PRODUITS PAR LES PROCESSUS DE COMBUSTION | [2002/15] | Entry into regional phase | 04.01.2002 | National basic fee paid | 04.01.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.01.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.01.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 04.01.2002 | Examination requested [2002/15] | 25.05.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.09.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 21.09.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
24.08.2005
05.09.2005
ADMISSIBLE Umicore AG & Co. KG Postfach 1351 63457 Hanau-Wolfgang / DE Opponent's representative Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
24.08.2005
05.09.2005
ADMISSIBLE Umicore AG & Co. KG Postfach 1351 63457 Hanau-Wolfgang / DE Opponent's representative Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/42] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
24.08.2005
Umicore AG & Co. KG Postfach 1351 63457 Hanau-Wolfgang / DE Opponent's representative Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | 28.09.2005 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 28.03.2006 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 10.04.2006 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M07) | 20.11.2006 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 06.11.2008 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 06.11.2008 | Date of oral proceedings | 16.12.2008 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 16.12.2008 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 16.04.2009 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 02.07.2009 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 24.11.2004 | ES | 06.03.2005 | PT | 24.04.2005 | CY | 15.06.2005 | IE | 15.06.2005 | LU | 15.06.2005 | MC | 30.06.2005 | [2008/03] |
Former [2007/26] | AT | 24.11.2004 | |
ES | 06.03.2005 | ||
CY | 15.06.2005 | ||
IE | 15.06.2005 | ||
LU | 15.06.2005 | ||
MC | 30.06.2005 | ||
Former [2007/20] | AT | 24.11.2004 | |
ES | 06.03.2005 | ||
CY | 15.06.2005 | ||
IE | 15.06.2005 | ||
LU | 30.06.2005 | ||
MC | 30.06.2005 | ||
Former [2007/08] | AT | 24.11.2004 | |
ES | 06.03.2005 | ||
IE | 15.06.2005 | ||
LU | 30.06.2005 | ||
MC | 30.06.2005 | ||
Former [2006/28] | AT | 24.11.2004 | |
ES | 06.03.2005 | ||
IE | 15.06.2005 | ||
MC | 30.06.2005 | ||
Former [2006/25] | AT | 24.11.2004 | |
ES | 06.03.2005 | ||
IE | 15.06.2005 | ||
Former [2005/36] | AT | 24.11.2004 | |
ES | 06.03.2005 | ||
Former [2005/27] | ES | 06.03.2005 | Cited in | International search | [Y]EP0319299 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]) [Y] 1,8* figure 1; claim 6 *; | [YD]US4902487 (COOPER BARRY J [US], et al) [YD] 1,8 * the whole document *; | [PX]WO9944725 (JOHNSON MATTHEY PLC [GB], et al) [PX] 1,8 * abstract * | Opposition | DE3337903 |