EP1230335 - SURFACTANT EMULSIONS AND STRUCTURED SURFACTANT SYSTEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.04.2006 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.04.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 31.05.2006 [2006/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HUNTSMAN INTERNATIONAL LLC 500 Huntsman Way Salt Lake City, Utah 84108 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2002/33] | For all designated states HUNTSMAN INTERNATIONAL LLC 500 Huntsman Way Salt Lake City, Utah 84108 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAWKINS, John 21 Chandler Avenue Kinver, South Staffordshire DY7 6AG / GB | [2002/33] | Representative(s) | Lawrence, John, et al Barker Brettell LLP 100 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 8QQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/10] | Lawrence, John, et al Barker Brettell 138 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 9PW / GB | ||
Former [2002/33] | Savidge, Roger Gordon Madgwick Huntsman Surface Sciences UK Limited P.O. Box 9792 210-222 Hagley Road West Oldbury, West Midlands B68 0WA / GB | Application number, filing date | 00940616.6 | 22.06.2000 | [2002/33] | WO2000GB02450 | Priority number, date | GB19990014674 | 24.06.1999 Original published format: GB 9914674 | [2002/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0100780 | Date: | 04.01.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1230335 | Date: | 14.08.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.01.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.01.2001 | Classification | IPC: | C11D17/00, C11D1/72, C11D3/04 | [2002/33] | CPC: |
C11D3/046 (EP);
C11D1/72 (EP);
C11D1/83 (EP);
C11D1/94 (EP);
C11D17/0026 (EP);
C11D1/02 (EP);
C11D1/90 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/33] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TENSIDEMULSIONEN UND STRUKTURIERTE TENSIDSYSTEME | [2002/33] | English: | SURFACTANT EMULSIONS AND STRUCTURED SURFACTANT SYSTEMS | [2002/33] | French: | EMULSIONS TENSIOACTIVES ET SYSTEMES TENSIOACTIFS STRUCTURES | [2002/33] | Entry into regional phase | 24.01.2002 | National basic fee paid | 24.01.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.01.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.12.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 24.01.2002 | Examination requested [2002/33] | 03.03.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.04.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.07.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.11.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/22] | 21.12.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2006/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2005 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]CN1096010 ; | [A]EP0079646 (UNILEVER NV [NL], et al) [A] 2-5 * abstract *; | [DA]EP0414549 (ALBRIGHT & WILSON [GB]) [DA] 2-5 * example 1 *; | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1995, no. 48, Database accession no. 1995-366904, XP002149038 & CN1096010 A 19941207 (LIAO S) [A] 1 * abstract * |