25.07.2008 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] |
25.07.2008 |
Change - representative |
published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] |
04.04.2008 |
Change: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
04.04.2008 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
23.10.2007 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
18.08.2007 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
27.07.2007 |
Change - applicant |
published on 29.08.2007 [2007/35] |
10.07.2007 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
06.04.2007 |
First examination report |
|
04.04.2007 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
19.09.2006 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
07.07.2006 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
16.05.2006 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
17.02.2006 |
Change - representative |
published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] |
08.07.2005 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
22.04.2005 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 08.06.2005 [2005/23] |
22.04.2005 |
Change - classification |
published on 08.06.2005 [2005/23] |
22.04.2005 |
Change - classification |
published on 08.06.2005 [2005/23] |
07.07.2004 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
02.04.2004 |
Change - designated states |
published on 19.05.2004 [2004/21] |
08.07.2003 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
23.08.2002 |
Change - extension states |
|
13.07.2002 |
Correction of patent application |
published on 28.08.2002 [2002/35] |
10.07.2002 |
Renewal fee |
|
26.04.2002 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 12.06.2002 [2002/24] |
26.04.2002 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 12.06.2002 [2002/24] |
28.03.2002 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
21.02.2002 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
11.02.2002 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
24.01.2002 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
27.06.2001 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
09.01.2001 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
29.12.2000 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
03.08.2000 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|