EP1209857 - DEVICE CONTROL METHOD AND PROGRAM RECORDED MEDIUM ON WHICH THE METHOD IS RECORDED [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.06.2012 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.06.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.08.2012 [2012/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2008/47] | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | ||
Former [2002/22] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YAMADA, Masazumi 11-14-301, Ikutama-cho, Tennoji-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 543-0071 / JP | 02 /
IITSUKA, Hiroyuki 6-25-6, Kisaichi Katano-shi, Osaka 576-0033 / JP | [2002/22] | Representative(s) | Balsters, Robert, et al Novagraaf International S.A. Chemin de l'Echo 3 1213 Onex / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2002/22] | Balsters, Robert, et al Novapat International S.A. 25, avenue du Pailly 1220 Les Avanchets - Geneva / CH | Application number, filing date | 00940931.9 | 04.07.2000 | [2002/22] | WO2000JP04421 | Priority number, date | JP19990191250 | 06.07.1999 Original published format: JP 19125099 | JP19990251134 | 06.09.1999 Original published format: JP 25113499 | JP19990329517 | 19.11.1999 Original published format: JP 32951799 | [2002/22] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0103377 | Date: | 11.01.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1209857 | Date: | 29.05.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.01.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 11.01.2001 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.03.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/40 | [2002/22] | CPC: |
H04L12/40117 (EP,US);
H04L12/40 (KR);
H04L12/40065 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [2004/20] |
Former [2002/22] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | GERÄTESTEUERUNGSVERFAHREN UND PROGRAMMAUFZEICHNUNGSMEDIUM, AUF DEM DAS VERFAHREN AUFGEZEICHNET IST | [2002/22] | English: | DEVICE CONTROL METHOD AND PROGRAM RECORDED MEDIUM ON WHICH THE METHOD IS RECORDED | [2002/22] | French: | PROCEDE DE COMMANDE DE DISPOSITIF ET SUPPORT D'ENREGISTREMENT DE PROGRAMME SUR LEQUEL CE PROCEDE EST ENREGISTRE | [2002/22] | Entry into regional phase | 05.02.2002 | Translation filed | 05.02.2002 | National basic fee paid | 05.02.2002 | Search fee paid | 05.02.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.02.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.12.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 05.02.2002 | Examination requested [2002/22] | 08.07.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.01.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.02.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/31] | 12.03.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2012/31] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.07.2008 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 19.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 20.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 29.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 12.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2011 | 12   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5883621 (IWAMURA RYUICHI [US]) [Y] 8-15,17 * abstract * * column 2, line 65 - column 4, line 25 * * column 5, line 16 - column 6, line 5 * * column 6, line 19 - line 21 * * column 7, line 41 - column 8, line 19 * * column 8, line 42 - line 44 * * column 8, line 57 - line 65 *; | [Y]JPH10173689 (SONY CORP) [Y] 8-15,17 * abstract * * paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0029] *; | [Y]EP0859322 (SONY CORP [JP]) [Y] 8-15,17 * abstract * * column 14, line 14 - column 16, line 30; figures 10-15,19 * * column 17, line 21 - line 45; figure 20 *; | [Y]EP0835029 (SONY CORP [JP]) [Y] 8-15,17 * abstract * * column 2, line 30 - line 53 * * column 4, line 2 - line 29 * * column 5, line 44 - column 6, line 46 * * column 7, line 2 - column 8, line 3 *; | [Y]EP0658010 (SONY CORP [JP]) [Y] 8-15,17 * abstract * * column 2, line 52 - column 3, line 43 * * column 4, line 34 - line 47 * * column 5, line 11 - line 26 *; | [E]EP1102437 (SONY CORP [JP]) [E] 1-17,23,24 * abstract * * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0013] * * paragraph [0125] - paragraph [0127] * * paragraph [0131] * * paragraph [0171]; figure 34 * * paragraph [0180] - paragraph [0183]; figures 38-40 * | [DXY] - "AV/C Digital Interface Command Set General Specification - VERSION 3.0", TRADE ASSOCIATION - TA DOCUMENT, XX, XX, (19980415), vol. 1998003, XP002111053 [DX] 1,2,6,7,16,23,24 * paragraphs [09.2] , [09.3] , [09.4] * [Y] 8-15,17 | International search | [X]JPH10124454 (SONY CORP); | [X]EP0658010 (SONY CORP [JP]); | [Y]JPH11177591 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | [A]EP0835029 (SONY CORP [JP]) |