EP1209347 - METHOD FOR COMBINED PROCESSING OF DIESEL FUEL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.03.2008 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.08.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 09.09.2009 [2009/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Obschestvo S Ogranichennoi Otvetstvennostiju Firma "Dito" proezd Serebryakova, 14 Moscow, 129343 / RU | [2007/19] |
Former [2002/22] | For all designated states Obschestvo S Ogranichennoi Otvetstvennostiju Firma "Dito" proezd Serebryakova, 14 Moscow, 129343 / RU | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZEGE, Oleg Nikolaevich ul. Planetnaya 47-23 Moscow, 125319 / RU | 02 /
ZHARCHENKOV, Jury Nikolaevich ul. Pushkina, 2-88, Zheleznodorozhny Moskovskaya obl., 143980 / RU | 03 /
MITUSOVA, Tamara Nikitovna ul. Storozhevaya, 20-135 Moscow, 111020 / RU | 04 /
MISHIN, Alexandr Ivanovich Ljubertsy 3, p/o 80-76 Moskovskaya obl., 140003 / RU | 05 /
POPOV, Andrei Sergeevich Sredny Kislovsky per., 7/10-26 Moscow, 103009 / RU | 06 /
TSIVULIN, Alexandr Veniaminovich ul. Planetnaya, 47-20 Moscow, 125319 / RU | [2002/22] | Representative(s) | BOVARD AG Patent- und Markenanwälte Optingenstrasse 16 3013 Bern / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2002/22] | BOVARD AG - Patentanwälte Optingenstrasse 16 3000 Bern 25 / CH | Application number, filing date | 00941049.9 | 20.06.2000 | [2002/22] | WO2000RU00238 | Priority number, date | RU19990117061 | 05.08.1999 Original published format: RU 99117061 | [2002/22] | Filing language | RU | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0111218 | Date: | 15.02.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1209347 | Date: | 29.05.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.02.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1209347 | Date: | 09.05.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | RU | 15.02.2001 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.08.2004 | Classification | IPC: | F02M31/16, F02M37/22, B04B1/08 | [2002/22] | CPC: |
F02M31/16 (EP,US);
F02M37/30 (EP,US);
F02B3/06 (EP,US);
Y02T10/12 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2007/19] |
Former [2002/22] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM KOMBINIERTEN BEHANDELN VON DIESELBRENNSTOFF | [2002/22] | English: | METHOD FOR COMBINED PROCESSING OF DIESEL FUEL | [2002/22] | French: | PROCEDE DE TRAITEMENT COMBINE D'UN CARBURANT DIESEL | [2002/22] | Entry into regional phase | 04.03.2002 | Translation filed | 04.03.2002 | National basic fee paid | 04.03.2002 | Search fee paid | 04.03.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.03.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.02.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: RU | 04.03.2002 | Examination requested [2002/22] | 06.12.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.02.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.10.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.02.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 07.02.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.02.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 09.05.2007 | BE | 09.05.2007 | CH | 09.05.2007 | CY | 09.05.2007 | DK | 09.05.2007 | FI | 09.05.2007 | IT | 09.05.2007 | LI | 09.05.2007 | NL | 09.05.2007 | IE | 20.06.2007 | LU | 20.06.2007 | MC | 30.06.2007 | SE | 09.08.2007 | GR | 10.08.2007 | ES | 20.08.2007 | PT | 09.10.2007 | [2009/37] |
Former [2009/33] | AT | 09.05.2007 | |
BE | 09.05.2007 | ||
CH | 09.05.2007 | ||
CY | 09.05.2007 | ||
DK | 09.05.2007 | ||
FI | 09.05.2007 | ||
IT | 09.05.2007 | ||
LI | 09.05.2007 | ||
NL | 09.05.2007 | ||
IE | 20.06.2007 | ||
MC | 30.06.2007 | ||
SE | 09.08.2007 | ||
GR | 10.08.2007 | ||
ES | 20.08.2007 | ||
PT | 09.10.2007 | ||
Former [2008/23] | AT | 09.05.2007 | |
BE | 09.05.2007 | ||
CH | 09.05.2007 | ||
DK | 09.05.2007 | ||
FI | 09.05.2007 | ||
IT | 09.05.2007 | ||
LI | 09.05.2007 | ||
NL | 09.05.2007 | ||
IE | 20.06.2007 | ||
MC | 30.06.2007 | ||
SE | 09.08.2007 | ||
GR | 10.08.2007 | ||
ES | 20.08.2007 | ||
PT | 09.10.2007 | ||
Former [2008/19] | AT | 09.05.2007 | |
BE | 09.05.2007 | ||
CH | 09.05.2007 | ||
DK | 09.05.2007 | ||
FI | 09.05.2007 | ||
LI | 09.05.2007 | ||
NL | 09.05.2007 | ||
MC | 30.06.2007 | ||
SE | 09.08.2007 | ||
GR | 10.08.2007 | ||
ES | 20.08.2007 | ||
PT | 09.10.2007 | ||
Former [2008/10] | AT | 09.05.2007 | |
BE | 09.05.2007 | ||
CH | 09.05.2007 | ||
DK | 09.05.2007 | ||
FI | 09.05.2007 | ||
LI | 09.05.2007 | ||
NL | 09.05.2007 | ||
MC | 30.06.2007 | ||
SE | 09.08.2007 | ||
ES | 20.08.2007 | ||
PT | 09.10.2007 | ||
Former [2008/09] | AT | 09.05.2007 | |
BE | 09.05.2007 | ||
CH | 09.05.2007 | ||
DK | 09.05.2007 | ||
FI | 09.05.2007 | ||
LI | 09.05.2007 | ||
NL | 09.05.2007 | ||
MC | 30.06.2007 | ||
SE | 09.08.2007 | ||
ES | 20.08.2007 | ||
Former [2008/08] | AT | 09.05.2007 | |
BE | 09.05.2007 | ||
CH | 09.05.2007 | ||
DK | 09.05.2007 | ||
FI | 09.05.2007 | ||
LI | 09.05.2007 | ||
SE | 09.08.2007 | ||
ES | 20.08.2007 | ||
Former [2008/04] | AT | 09.05.2007 | |
BE | 09.05.2007 | ||
CH | 09.05.2007 | ||
FI | 09.05.2007 | ||
LI | 09.05.2007 | ||
SE | 09.08.2007 | ||
ES | 20.08.2007 | ||
Former [2007/50] | AT | 09.05.2007 | |
CH | 09.05.2007 | ||
FI | 09.05.2007 | ||
LI | 09.05.2007 | ||
SE | 09.08.2007 | ||
ES | 20.08.2007 | ||
Former [2007/48] | CH | 09.05.2007 | |
FI | 09.05.2007 | ||
LI | 09.05.2007 | ||
SE | 09.08.2007 | ||
ES | 20.08.2007 | ||
Former [2007/47] | ES | 20.08.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB419187 (ARTHUR MERRILL HOOD) [A] 5 * the whole document *; | [A]US5052996 (LANTZ CHRISTER [SE]) [A] 5* the whole document *; | [AD]RU2054572 (DITO TOO FA [RU]) [AD] 1-5 * abstract *; | [A]US5637217 (HERMAN PETER K [US], et al) [A] 5 * the whole document *; | [AD]RU2105184 (TOVARISHCHESTVO S OGRANICHENNO, et al) [AD] 1-5 * abstract *; | [A]RU2133764 (OTKRYTOE AKTSIONERNOE OBSHCHES, et al) [A] 1-5 * abstract * | International search | [A]SU1813912 ; | [A]DE3442980 (KNECHT FILTERWERKE GMBH [DE]); | [A]US5052996 (LANTZ CHRISTER [SE]); | [A]RU2054572 (DITO TOO FA [RU]); | [A]RU2105184 (TOVARISHCHESTVO S OGRANICHENNO, et al) |