EP1105314 - CARTON WITH REINFORCED HANDLE STRUCTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.09.2005 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.10.2009 | Change - representative | published on 04.11.2009 [2009/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MeadWestvaco Packaging Systems LLC One High Ridge Park Stamford Connecticut 06905 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2003/43] | For all designated states MeadWestvaco Packaging Systems LLC One High Ridge Park Stamford, Connecticut 06905 / US | ||
Former [2001/24] | For all designated states THE MEAD CORPORATION Courthouse Plaza NE Dayton Ohio 45463 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BATES, Aaron 2431 Rachel Court Marietta, GA 30066 / US | 02 /
OLIFF, James. 530 Greystone Lane Douglasville, GA 30135 / US | 03 /
HOLLEY, John, M, Jr. 950 Brentwood Avenue Lawrenceville, GA 30244 / US | [2001/24] | Representative(s) | Hepworth, John Malcolm, et al Avidity IP Merlin House Falconry Court Baker's Lane Epping, Essex CM16 5DQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/45] | Hepworth, John Malcolm, et al HLBBshaw Merlin House Falconry Court Baker's Lane Epping, Essex CM16 5DQ / GB | ||
Former [2001/24] | Hepworth, John Malcolm, et al Hepworth Lawrence Bryer & Bizley Bloxam Court Corporation Street Rugby, Warwickshire CV21 2DU / GB | Application number, filing date | 00941454.1 | 15.06.2000 | [2001/24] | WO2000US16505 | Priority number, date | US19990336502 | 18.06.1999 Original published format: US 336502 | US19990382428 | 24.08.1999 Original published format: US 382428 | US20000568231 | 05.05.2000 Original published format: US 568231 | [2001/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0078618 | Date: | 28.12.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1105314 | Date: | 13.06.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.12.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1105314 | Date: | 24.11.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.12.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B65D5/46 | [2001/24] | CPC: |
B65D71/36 (EP);
B65D5/46192 (EP);
B65D71/20 (EP);
B65D2571/00141 (EP);
B65D2571/00462 (EP);
B65D2571/00469 (EP);
B65D2571/00524 (EP);
B65D2571/00543 (EP);
B65D2571/00549 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/24] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | 19.03.2001 | LV | 19.03.2001 | MK | Not yet paid | RO | 19.03.2001 | SI | 19.03.2001 | Title | German: | KARTON MIT VERSTÄRKTEM HANDGRIFF | [2001/24] | English: | CARTON WITH REINFORCED HANDLE STRUCTURE | [2001/24] | French: | CARTON A STRUCTURE DE POIGNEE RENFORCEE | [2001/24] | Entry into regional phase | 19.03.2001 | National basic fee paid | 19.03.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.03.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.03.2001 | Examination requested [2001/24] | 02.10.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.01.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.03.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.09.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 03.09.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP04020606.2 / EP1518792 | Opposition(s) | 25.08.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 24.11.2004 | DK | 24.02.2005 | GR | 24.02.2005 | SE | 24.02.2005 | CY | 15.06.2005 | LU | 15.06.2005 | MC | 30.06.2005 | [2007/26] |
Former [2007/20] | FI | 24.11.2004 | |
DK | 24.02.2005 | ||
GR | 24.02.2005 | ||
SE | 24.02.2005 | ||
CY | 15.06.2005 | ||
LU | 30.06.2005 | ||
MC | 30.06.2005 | ||
Former [2007/08] | FI | 24.11.2004 | |
DK | 24.02.2005 | ||
GR | 24.02.2005 | ||
SE | 24.02.2005 | ||
LU | 30.06.2005 | ||
MC | 30.06.2005 | ||
Former [2006/28] | FI | 24.11.2004 | |
DK | 24.02.2005 | ||
GR | 24.02.2005 | ||
MC | 30.06.2005 | ||
Former [2005/46] | FI | 24.11.2004 | |
DK | 24.02.2005 | ||
GR | 24.02.2005 | ||
Former [2005/26] | FI | 24.11.2004 | |
GR | 24.02.2005 | ||
Former [2005/24] | FI | 24.11.2004 | Cited in | International search | [A]GB2239862 (ST REGIS PACKAGING LTD [GB]) [A] 1 * page 3, line 27 - page 4, line 15; figures 1-5 *; | [A]US5333734 (STOUT JAMES T [US], et al) [A] 1,15,20,30,39,48,57,65 * column 1, line 48 - column 2, line 61; figures 1-5 *; | [A]US5472136 (ROCCAFORTE HARRY I [US]) [A] 1* column 3, line 25 - column 4, line 30; figures 1-8 *; | [A]EP0816238 (MEAD CORP [US]) [A] 1 * column 3, line 46 - column 4, line 44; figures 1-8 *; | [A]US5873515 (DUNN JACKIE WAYNE [US], et al) [A] 1,15,20,30,39,48,57,65 * column 3, line 13 - column 4, line 15; figures 1-5 * |