EP1290196 - CHIMERIC HSF TRANSCRIPTION FACTORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.06.2004 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ARIAD GENE THERAPEUTICS, INC. 26 Landsdowne Street Cambridge, MA 02139-4234 / US | [2003/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NATESAN, Sridaran 30 Thornton Road Chestnut Hill, MA 02167 / US | 02 /
GILMAN, Michael, Z. 555 Chestnut Street Newton, MA 02168 / US | [2003/11] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2003/11] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00941479.8 | 16.06.2000 | [2003/11] | WO2000US16621 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0198507 | Date: | 27.12.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1290196 | Date: | 12.03.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.12.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.12.2001 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/62, C12N15/63, C12N15/67, C12N15/86, C12N7/01, C12N5/10, C07K14/47, C12Q1/68, A01K67/027, A61K48/00 | [2003/11] | CPC: |
C12N15/63 (EP);
C07K14/4705 (EP);
C12N15/62 (EP);
A01K2217/05 (EP);
C07K2319/00 (EP);
C07K2319/09 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2003/11] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | CHIMÄRE HSF TRABSKRIPTIONSFAKTOREN | [2003/11] | English: | CHIMERIC HSF TRANSCRIPTION FACTORS | [2003/11] | French: | FACTEURS DE TRANSCRIPTION HSF CHIMERES | [2003/11] | Entry into regional phase | 11.12.2002 | National basic fee paid | 11.12.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.12.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.01.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 11.12.2002 | Examination requested [2003/13] | 24.09.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.02.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/33] | 10.03.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2004/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9910510 (ARIAD GENE THERAPEUTICS INC [US], et al) [A] * the whole document *; | [A]WO9910508 (ARIAD GENE THERAPEUTICS INC [US]) [A] * the whole document *; | [T]WO0078951 (ARIAD GENE THERAPEUTICS INC [US], et al) [T] * the whole document *; | [DA] - GREENE MARIE ET AL, "A heat shock-responsive domain of human HSF1 that regulates transcription activation domain function.", MOLECULAR AND CELLULAR BIOLOGY, (1995), vol. 15, no. 6, ISSN 0270-7306, pages 3354 - 3362, XP002165298 [DA] * the whole document * | [A] - NEWTON ELIZABETH M ET AL, "The regulatory domain of human heat shock factor 1 is sufficient to sense heat stress.", MOLECULAR AND CELLULAR BIOLOGY, (1996), vol. 16, no. 3, ISSN 0270-7306, pages 839 - 846, XP002165299 [A] * the whole document * | [A] - URLINGER S ET AL, "The p65 domain from NF-kappaB is an efficient human activator in the tetracycline-regulatable gene expression system", GENE,ELSEVIER BIOMEDICAL PRESS. AMSTERDAM,NL, (200004), vol. 247, no. 1-2, ISSN 0378-1119, pages 103 - 110, XP004196556 [A] * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0378-1119(00)00112-8 |