EP1189506 - TISSUE PRODUCTS HAVING ANTIVIRAL PROPERTIES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 19.10.2007 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.2008 | Change - representative | published on 24.09.2008 [2008/39] | 22.08.2008 | Change - opposition data/opponents data or that of the opponents representative | published on 24.09.2008 [2008/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2007/47] | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US | ||
Former [2002/13] | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DECKNER, George, Endel 10572 Tanager Hills Drive Cincinnati, OH 45249 / US | 02 /
GBADAMOSI, Kamilah, Apewaiye 162 Woodstock Drive Fairfield, OH 45014 / US | 03 /
KELLY, Stephen, Robert 925 Keith Lane Owenton, KY 40359 / US | 04 /
KLOFTA, Thomas, James 10404 Hopewell Hills Drive Cincinnati, OH 45249 / US | [2002/13] | Representative(s) | Kremer, Véronique Marie Joséphine, et al Procter & Gamble Service GmbH IP Department Sulzbacher Straße 40-50 65824 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/39] | Kremer, Véronique Marie Joséphine, et al Procter & Gamble Service GmbH Sulzbacher Strasse 40-50 65824 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE | ||
Former [2002/13] | Kremer, Véronique Marie Joséphine, et al Procter & Gamble European Service GmbH, Sulzbacher Strasse 40-50 65824 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE | Application number, filing date | 00941717.1 | 26.06.2000 | [2002/13] | WO2000US17529 | Priority number, date | US19990342777 | 29.06.1999 Original published format: US 342777 | [2002/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0100023 | Date: | 04.01.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1189506 | Date: | 27.03.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.01.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1189506 | Date: | 21.04.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/17] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP1189506 | Date: | 21.11.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.01.2001 | Classification | IPC: | A01N25/34, A01N25/10, A01N37/40, A47K10/16, D21H21/36, D21H27/30 | [2002/13] | CPC: |
D21H21/36 (EP,US);
A47K10/16 (EP,KR,US);
A01N25/10 (EP,US);
A01N25/34 (EP,US);
A01N37/40 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
A01N37/40, A01N2300/00 (US,EP);
A01N37/40, A01N25/10, A01N25/34 (EP,US) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/13] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TISSUEPRODUKTE MIT ANTIVIRALEN EIGENSCHAFTEN | [2002/13] | English: | TISSUE PRODUCTS HAVING ANTIVIRAL PROPERTIES | [2002/13] | French: | PRODUITS TISSULAIRES AYANT DES PROPRIETES ANTIVIRALES | [2002/13] | Entry into regional phase | 21.12.2001 | National basic fee paid | 21.12.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.12.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.12.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 21.12.2001 | Examination requested [2002/13] | 08.05.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.09.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.10.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.02.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.09.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.01.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 08.01.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
21.01.2005
28.01.2005
ADMISSIBLE KIMBERLY-CLARK WORLDWIDE, INC. 401 North Lake Street Neenah WI 54956 / US Opponent's representative Beacham, Annabel Rose Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/39] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
21.01.2005
28.01.2005
ADMISSIBLE KIMBERLY-CLARK WORLDWIDE, INC. 401 North Lake Street Neenah WI 54956 / US Opponent's representative Beacham, Annabel Rose Frank B. Dehn & Co. St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | ||
Former [2005/11] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
21.01.2005
Kimberly-Clark Worldwide, Inc. 401 North Lake Street Neenah, Wisconsin 54956 / US Opponent's representative Beacham, Annabel Rose Frank B. Dehn & Co., European Patent Attorneys, 179 Queen Victoria Street London EC4V 4EL / GB | 25.02.2005 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 05.09.2005 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 22.03.2006 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 11.05.2006 | 22.03.2006 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 29.03.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M02) | 11.05.2006 | Date of oral proceedings | 31.05.2006 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 31.07.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M02) | 31.07.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04) | 09.10.2006 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 17.11.2006 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 08.12.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M02) | 06.02.2007 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 05.03.2007 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 15.03.2007 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 09.06.2007 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 06.09.2007 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 21.04.2004 | BE | 21.04.2004 | CH | 21.04.2004 | CY | 21.04.2004 | FI | 21.04.2004 | IT | 21.04.2004 | LI | 21.04.2004 | NL | 21.04.2004 | LU | 26.06.2004 | IE | 28.06.2004 | MC | 30.06.2004 | DK | 21.07.2004 | GR | 21.07.2004 | SE | 21.07.2004 | ES | 01.08.2004 | PT | 21.09.2004 | [2008/03] |
Former [2007/35] | AT | 21.04.2004 | |
BE | 21.04.2004 | ||
CH | 21.04.2004 | ||
CY | 21.04.2004 | ||
FI | 21.04.2004 | ||
IT | 21.04.2004 | ||
LI | 21.04.2004 | ||
NL | 21.04.2004 | ||
LU | 26.06.2004 | ||
IE | 28.06.2004 | ||
MC | 30.06.2004 | ||
DK | 21.07.2004 | ||
GR | 21.07.2004 | ||
SE | 21.07.2004 | ||
ES | 01.08.2004 | ||
Former [2007/08] | AT | 21.04.2004 | |
BE | 21.04.2004 | ||
CH | 21.04.2004 | ||
CY | 21.04.2004 | ||
FI | 21.04.2004 | ||
LI | 21.04.2004 | ||
NL | 21.04.2004 | ||
LU | 26.06.2004 | ||
IE | 28.06.2004 | ||
MC | 30.06.2004 | ||
DK | 21.07.2004 | ||
GR | 21.07.2004 | ||
SE | 21.07.2004 | ||
ES | 01.08.2004 | ||
Former [2006/13] | AT | 21.04.2004 | |
BE | 21.04.2004 | ||
CH | 21.04.2004 | ||
FI | 21.04.2004 | ||
LI | 21.04.2004 | ||
NL | 21.04.2004 | ||
LU | 26.06.2004 | ||
IE | 28.06.2004 | ||
MC | 30.06.2004 | ||
DK | 21.07.2004 | ||
GR | 21.07.2004 | ||
SE | 21.07.2004 | ||
ES | 01.08.2004 | ||
Former [2005/24] | AT | 21.04.2004 | |
BE | 21.04.2004 | ||
CH | 21.04.2004 | ||
FI | 21.04.2004 | ||
LI | 21.04.2004 | ||
LU | 26.06.2004 | ||
IE | 28.06.2004 | ||
MC | 30.06.2004 | ||
DK | 21.07.2004 | ||
GR | 21.07.2004 | ||
SE | 21.07.2004 | ||
ES | 01.08.2004 | ||
Former [2005/23] | AT | 21.04.2004 | |
BE | 21.04.2004 | ||
CH | 21.04.2004 | ||
FI | 21.04.2004 | ||
LI | 21.04.2004 | ||
LU | 26.06.2004 | ||
MC | 30.06.2004 | ||
DK | 21.07.2004 | ||
GR | 21.07.2004 | ||
SE | 21.07.2004 | ||
ES | 01.08.2004 | ||
Former [2005/18] | AT | 21.04.2004 | |
BE | 21.04.2004 | ||
CH | 21.04.2004 | ||
FI | 21.04.2004 | ||
LI | 21.04.2004 | ||
MC | 30.06.2004 | ||
DK | 21.07.2004 | ||
GR | 21.07.2004 | ||
SE | 21.07.2004 | ||
ES | 01.08.2004 | ||
Former [2005/14] | AT | 21.04.2004 | |
BE | 21.04.2004 | ||
CH | 21.04.2004 | ||
FI | 21.04.2004 | ||
LI | 21.04.2004 | ||
MC | 30.06.2004 | ||
GR | 21.07.2004 | ||
SE | 21.07.2004 | ||
ES | 01.08.2004 | ||
Former [2005/11] | AT | 21.04.2004 | |
CH | 21.04.2004 | ||
FI | 21.04.2004 | ||
LI | 21.04.2004 | ||
MC | 30.06.2004 | ||
GR | 21.07.2004 | ||
SE | 21.07.2004 | ||
ES | 01.08.2004 | ||
Former [2005/06] | CH | 21.04.2004 | |
FI | 21.04.2004 | ||
LI | 21.04.2004 | ||
GR | 21.07.2004 | ||
SE | 21.07.2004 | ||
ES | 01.08.2004 | ||
Former [2005/02] | CH | 21.04.2004 | |
FI | 21.04.2004 | ||
LI | 21.04.2004 | ||
SE | 21.07.2004 | ||
ES | 01.08.2004 | ||
Former [2004/52] | CH | 21.04.2004 | |
LI | 21.04.2004 | ||
SE | 21.07.2004 | ||
Former [2004/51] | CH | 21.04.2004 | |
LI | 21.04.2004 | Cited in | International search | [A]GB2103089 (KIMBERLY CLARK CO [US]) [A] 1-10 * page 2, line 28 - page 3, line 30 *; | [X]GB2134781 (DIOMED DEV LTD) [X] 1 * page 1, line 30 - line 33 * * page 1, line 57 - line 65 *; | [DA]US4738847 (ROTHE ROBERT A [US], et al) [DA] 1-10 * column 1, line 22 - column 2, line 54 *; | [A]US4764418 (KUENN CARY K [US], et al) [A] 1-10* column 1, line 33 - column 3, line 54 *; | [X]WO8910745 (ZILA PHARM INC [US]) [X] 1 * page 3, line 33 - page 4, line 4 * * page 6, line 13 - line 15 *; | [X]WO9528165 (UNIV KENTUCKY RES FOUND [US]) [X] 4,10 * page 32, paragraph 4 * * page 36, paragraph 3 *; | [A]WO9840207 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [A] 1-10 * claim 1 *; | [X]US5906814 (EPSTEIN HOWARD [US]) [X] 1 * column 2, line 17 - line 24 * * column 2, line 45 - line 62 * | Examination | US4355021 | US4643939 | - J.S.Oxford, C.W.Potter,C.McLaren and W.Hardy,Applied Microbiology ,April 1971, pages 606-610 | - Matindale,The complete drug reference, Ed.Kathleen Parfitt, Thirty Second Edition,Pharmaceutical Press, 1999,pages 1101-1102 |