EP1215956 - ORGANIC FERTILIZER CONTAINING COMPOST [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.05.2004 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.05.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.07.2004 [2004/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dinel, Henri 104 Chemin Juniper Chelsea Quebec JOX 1NO / CA | [N/P] |
Former [2002/26] | For all designated states Dinel, Henri 104 Chemin Juniper Chelsea, Quebec JOX 1NO / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2002/26] | Representative(s) | Lorenz, Eduard Lorenz-Seidler-Gossel Widenmayerstrasse 23 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/26] | Lorenz, Eduard Lorenz-Seidler-Gossel, Widenmayerstrasse 23 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00941840.1 | 27.06.2000 | [2002/26] | WO2000CA00765 | Priority number, date | US19990344537 | 25.06.1999 Original published format: US 344537 | [2002/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0100011 | Date: | 04.01.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1215956 | Date: | 26.06.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.01.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.01.2001 | Classification | IPC: | A01G31/00, A01G9/10, C05F11/00, C05F9/04, C05F11/04, B01J2/00 | [2002/26] | CPC: |
C05F9/04 (EP,US);
A01G24/20 (EP,US);
A01G24/44 (EP,US);
C05F11/00 (EP,US);
Y02A40/20 (EP,US);
Y02P20/145 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | NL [2004/22] |
Former [2002/26] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | KOMPOST ENTHALTENDES ORGANISCHES DÜNGEMITTEL | [2002/26] | English: | ORGANIC FERTILIZER CONTAINING COMPOST | [2002/26] | French: | ENGRAIS ORGANIQUE CONTENANT DU COMPOST | [2002/26] | Entry into regional phase | 24.01.2002 | National basic fee paid | 24.01.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.01.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.01.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 24.01.2002 | Examination requested [2002/26] | 02.01.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/28] | 04.02.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2004/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2003 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XA]FR2279458 (CENTRALE EXPLOIT COMMERCE [FR]) [X] 4,5 * the whole document * [A] 1-3; | [X]GB1485236 (ECOLOGY PATENT) [X] 1-5 * the whole document *; | [XA]EP0123570 (UTEC UNION TECH ELF CHAUFFE SA [FR]) [X] 4,5 * claim - *[A] 1-3; | [XA]EP0759323 (GREEN TOP WOOD RECYCLING LTD [IL]) [X] 4,5 * claim - * * column 2, line 20 - column 5, line 58 * [A] 1-3; | [XA]DE19750951 (HARZMANN OPTIMA MARKETING UND [DE]) [X] 4,5 * claim - * [A] 1-3 |