EP1183430 - DEVICE FOR SCREWING IN FASTENING ELEMENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.01.2004 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.01.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.03.2004 [2004/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Harald Zahn GmbH Ludwig-Wagner-Strasse 10 69168 Wiesloch / DE | [2002/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZAHN, Harald Ludwig-Wagner-Strasse 10 D-69168 Wiesloch / DE | [2002/10] | Application number, filing date | 00941894.8 | 27.04.2000 | [2002/10] | WO2000DE01334 | Priority number, date | DE1999208282U | 08.05.1999 Original published format: DE 29908282 U | [2002/10] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0068529 | Date: | 16.11.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1183430 | Date: | 06.03.2002 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.11.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1183430 | Date: | 19.03.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.11.2000 | Classification | IPC: | E04D15/04, B25B23/10 | [2002/10] | CPC: |
B25B23/10 (EP);
B25B21/002 (EP);
B25B23/04 (EP);
E04D2015/047 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, FR, LI, NL [2003/12] |
Former [2002/10] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUM EINSCHRAUBEN VON BEFESTIGUNGSELEMENTEN | [2002/10] | English: | DEVICE FOR SCREWING IN FASTENING ELEMENTS | [2002/10] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE VISSAGE D'ELEMENTS DE FIXATION | [2002/10] | Entry into regional phase | 28.09.2001 | National basic fee paid | 28.09.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.09.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.10.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 28.09.2001 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.09.2001 | Examination requested [2002/10] | 20.09.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.10.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 31.10.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.12.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0600285 (HARDO BEFESTIGUNGEN GMBH) [A] 1,2 * column 5, line 50 - column 6, line 37; figure - *; | [DPA]DE19811929 (ZAHN HARALD GMBH) [DPA] 1,2 * figures 1-7; claim - *; | [DA]DE4240607 (HARDO BEFESTIGUNGEN GMBH) [DA] 1,2 * abstract *; | [A]BE491345 (GOBIN-DAUDÉ SA) [A] 1 * figure -; claim - *; | [A]EP0567240 (ARIEL IND PLC) [A] 1 * abstract * |