blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1186102

EP1186102 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR THE OPEN-LOAD DIAGNOSIS OF A SWITCHING STAGE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  03.10.2008
Database last updated on 03.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip03.10.2008No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 05.11.2008  [2008/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Continental Automotive GmbH
Vahrenwalder Strasse 9
30165 Hannover / DE
For all designated states
X-FAB Semiconductor Foundries GmbH
Haarbergstrasse 67
99097 Erfurt / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/29]For all designated states
Continental Automotive GmbH
Vahrenwalder Strasse 9
30165 Hannover / DE
For all designated states
X-FAB Semiconductor Foundries GmbH
Haarbergstrasse 67
99097 Erfurt / DE
Former [2008/12]For all designated states
VDO Automotive AG
Siemensstrasse 12
93055 Regensburg / DE
For all designated states
X-FAB Semiconductor Foundries GmbH
Haarbergstrasse 67
99097 Erfurt / DE
Former [2007/39]For all designated states
Siemens VDO Automotive AG
Siemensstrasse 12
93055 Regensburg / DE
For all designated states
X-FAB Semiconductor Foundries GmbH
Haarbergstrasse 67
99097 Erfurt / DE
Former [2002/11]For all designated states
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Wittelsbacherplatz 2
80333 München / DE
For all designated states
X-FAB Semiconductor Foundries GmbH
Haarbergstrasse 67
99097 Erfurt / DE
Inventor(s)01 / SASS, Dieter
Flösserstr. 10
D-93059 Regensburg / DE
02 / HAIMERL, Stefan
Dr.-Leo-Ritter-Str. 59
D-93049 Regensburg / DE
03 / FREY, Michael
Lassalle Str. 15
D-99086 Erfurt / DE
04 / SEIFERT, Mario
Parkstr. 29
D-08485 Lengenfeld / DE
 [2002/11]
Representative(s)(deleted)
[2003/14]
Former [2002/11]Zedlitz, Peter, Dipl.-Inf.
Patentanwalt, Postfach 22 13 17
80503 München / DE
Application number, filing date00941901.104.05.2000
[2002/11]
WO2000DE01406
Priority number, dateDE199912046504.05.1999         Original published format: DE 19920465
[2002/11]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report
No.:WO0067379
Date:09.11.2000
Language:DE
[2000/45]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1186102
Date:13.03.2002
Language:DE
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.11.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2002/11]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1186102
Date:28.11.2007
Language:DE
[2007/48]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP19.04.2001
ClassificationIPC:H03K17/00
[2002/11]
CPC:
F02D41/20 (EP,US); F02D41/221 (EP,US); F02P3/0554 (EP,US);
Y02T10/40 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesFR,   IT [2004/21]
Former [2002/11]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR OPEN-LOAD-DIAGNOSE EINER SCHALTSTUFE[2002/11]
English:METHOD AND DEVICE FOR THE OPEN-LOAD DIAGNOSIS OF A SWITCHING STAGE[2002/11]
French:PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF POUR EFFECTUER UN DIAGNOSTIC "CHARGE OUVERTE" SUR UN ETAGE DE COMMUTATION[2002/11]
Entry into regional phase04.10.2001National basic fee paid 
04.10.2001Designation fee(s) paid 
04.10.2001Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure04.12.2000Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
04.10.2001Examination requested  [2002/11]
18.06.2007Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.10.2007Fee for grant paid
11.10.2007Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)29.08.2008No opposition filed within time limit [2008/45]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
19.05.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
17.05.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
19.05.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
22.05.2006Renewal fee patent year 07
22.05.2007Renewal fee patent year 08
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[A]US5438286  (PAVLIN ANTOINE [FR], et al) [A] 1,4;
 [A]EP0743529  (SGS THOMSON MICROELECTRONICS [IT], et al) [A] 1,4;
 [A]US5895989  (IMAIZUMI NOBUHIRO [JP], et al) [A] 1,4;
 [A]DE19705339  (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1,4
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.