EP1196803 - NEAR FIELD OPTICAL EXAMINATION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.02.2004 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2006 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Laser- und Medizin-Technologie GmbH Berlin Fabeckstrasse 60-62 14195 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/16] | For all designated states Laser- und Medizin-Technologie GmbH Fabeckstrasse 60-62 14195 Berlin / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MÜLLER, Gerhard An der Rehwiese 8 D-14129 Berlin / DE | 02 /
HELFMANN, Jürgen Clara-Zetkin-Strasse 22 D-14532 Berlin / DE | [2002/16] | Representative(s) | Eisenführ Speiser Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Stralauer Platz 34 10243 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/16] | Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner Pacelliallee 43/45 14195 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 00942148.8 | 29.06.2000 | [2002/16] | WO2000EP06088 | Priority number, date | DE19991029875 | 29.06.1999 Original published format: DE 19929875 | [2002/16] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0101183 | Date: | 04.01.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1196803 | Date: | 17.04.2002 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.01.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1196803 | Date: | 02.04.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.01.2001 | Classification | IPC: | G02B21/00, G02B21/06 | [2002/16] | CPC: |
G02B21/34 (EP);
G01Q60/22 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2003/14] |
Former [2002/16] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | NAHFELDOPTISCHE UNTERSUCHUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2002/16] | English: | NEAR FIELD OPTICAL EXAMINATION DEVICE | [2002/16] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'EXAMEN OPTIQUE A CHAMP PROCHE | [2002/16] | Entry into regional phase | 29.01.2002 | National basic fee paid | 29.01.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.01.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.01.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 29.01.2002 | Examination requested [2002/16] | 18.06.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.10.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.01.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 17.01.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.01.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 02.04.2003 | GB | 02.04.2003 | DE | 01.01.2004 | [2006/14] |
Former [2004/31] | GB | 02.04.2003 | |
DE | 01.01.2004 | ||
Former [2004/22] | GB | 02.04.2003 | Cited in | International search | [PXA]DE19858490 (LASER & MED TECH GMBH [DE]) [PX] 1,4,8-14,16,19-28 * the whole document * [PA] 29; | [DA]DE19601109 (LASER & MED TECH GMBH [DE]) [DA] 1,29 * the whole document *; | [A]GB2126778 (ERA PATENTS LTD) [A] 1,15,29 * page 1, line 82 - line 94 * * page 4, line 19 - line 101; figure 3 *; | [A]US4041146 (GIAEVER IVAR) [A] 29 * column 6, line 42 - line 45 * * column 7, line 5 - column 8, line 42 * | [A] - POHL D W, "SCANNING NEAR-FIELD OPTICAL MICROSCOPY (SNOM)", ADVANCES IN OPTICAL AND ELECTRON MICROSCOPY,GB,LONDON, (1991), vol. 12, pages 243 - 312, XP000372084 [A] 1 * page 249, paragraph L - page 250, paragraph 1 * |