EP1188329 - CENTRALIZED MANAGEMENT OF TELECOMMUNICATIONS PARAMETERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.07.2009 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Domiras Oy Eteläesplanadi 14 00130 Helsinki / FI | [2002/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MÄKIPÄÄ, Risto Marsinkatu 8 B 22 FIN-11130 Riihimäki / FI | [2002/12] | Representative(s) | Äkräs, Tapio Juhani Kolster Oy Ab Iso Roobertinkatu 23 P.O. Box 148 00121 Helsinki / FI | [N/P] |
Former [2002/12] | Äkräs, Tapio Juhani Kolster Oy Ab,P.O. Box 148, Iso Roobertinkatu 23 00121 Helsinki / FI | Application number, filing date | 00942157.9 | 27.06.2000 | [2002/12] | WO2000FI00577 | Priority number, date | FI19990001464 | 28.06.1999 Original published format: FI 991464 | FI20000001112 | 10.05.2000 Original published format: FI 20001112 | [2002/12] | Filing language | FI | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0101712 | Date: | 04.01.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1188329 | Date: | 20.03.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.01.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1188329 | Date: | 10.09.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 04.01.2001 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q7/24 | [2002/12] | CPC: |
H04W88/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/12] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZENTRALISIERTE VERWALTUNG VON TELEKOMMUNIKATIONSPARAMETERN | [2002/12] | English: | CENTRALIZED MANAGEMENT OF TELECOMMUNICATIONS PARAMETERS | [2002/12] | French: | GESTION CENTRALISEE DE PARAMETRES DE TELECOMMUNICATIONS | [2002/12] | Entry into regional phase | 21.12.2001 | National basic fee paid | 21.12.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.12.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.01.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 21.12.2001 | Examination requested [2002/12] | 02.12.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.06.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.09.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.03.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.04.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.07.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 25.07.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.06.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 20.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 19.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2003 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   16.07.2003 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 10.09.2008 | FI | 10.09.2008 | GR | 11.12.2008 | PT | 10.02.2009 | [2011/44] |
Former [2010/47] | FI | 10.09.2008 | |
GR | 11.12.2008 | ||
PT | 10.02.2009 | ||
Former [2009/25] | FI | 10.09.2008 | |
PT | 10.02.2009 | ||
Former [2009/15] | FI | 10.09.2008 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0876072 (LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]); | [A]WO9926367 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]); | [AP]WO0042760 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]); | [AP]WO0041499 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]) |