Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
13.06.2008 | Change - representative | published on 16.07.2008 [2008/29] |
24.06.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.08.2005 [2005/32] |
04.03.2005 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
31.08.2004 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | |
09.04.2004 | Change - designated states | published on 26.05.2004 [2004/22] |
24.07.2003 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
24.07.2002 | Renewal fee | |
22.02.2002 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 10.04.2002 [2002/15] |
22.02.2002 | Request for examination filed | published on 10.04.2002 [2002/15] |
21.02.2002 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
31.01.2002 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
31.01.2002 | Amendment by applicant | |
31.01.2002 | Change - extension states | |
05.03.2001 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
23.01.2001 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
19.10.2000 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
09.08.2000 | PCT data prior to European publication |