EP1194889 - DATA PROCESSOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.06.2005 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.06.2008 | Change - representative | published on 16.07.2008 [2008/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ISIS INNOVATION LIMITED Ewert House, Ewert Place Summertown Oxford OX2 7SG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/15] | For all designated states ISIS INNOVATION LIMITED Ewert House, Ewert Place Summertown, Oxford OX2 7BZ / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BENJAMIN, Simon Charles Dept.of Physics Univ. of Oxford Parks Road Oxford OX1 3PJ / GB | [2002/15] | Representative(s) | Nicholls, Michael John J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/29] | Nicholls, Michael John J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | ||
Former [2002/15] | Nicholls, Michael John J.A. KEMP & CO. 14, South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | Application number, filing date | 00942273.4 | 05.07.2000 | [2002/15] | WO2000GB02573 | Priority number, date | GB19990016209 | 09.07.1999 Original published format: GB 9916209 | [2002/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0104835 | Date: | 18.01.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1194889 | Date: | 10.04.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.01.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.01.2001 | Classification | IPC: | G06N1/00 | [2002/15] | CPC: |
B82Y10/00 (EP,US);
G06N10/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/22] |
Former [2002/15] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | RECHNER | [2002/15] | English: | DATA PROCESSOR | [2002/15] | French: | PROCESSEUR DE DONNEES | [2002/15] | Entry into regional phase | 19.12.2001 | National basic fee paid | 19.12.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.12.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.01.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 19.12.2001 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.12.2001 | Examination requested [2002/15] | 01.02.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/32] | 08.03.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2005/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2004 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]DE19724313 (RENNER UWE DR [DE], et al) [A] 24 * abstract *; | [XAY] - BENJAMIN S. C., JOHNSON N. F., "CELLULAR STRUCTURES FOR COMPUTATION IN THE QUANTUM REGIME", URL: http://xxx.lanl.gov/pdf/cond-mat/9808243, (19980821), XP002149950 [X] 1-6,9,10,25-29 * page 2, line 1 - page 8, line 19; figures 1-3 * [A] 8,12-16,18-24 [Y] 7,11,17 | [Y] - LENT C S ET AL, "Quantum cellular automata", NANOTECHNOLOGY, JAN. 1993, UK, vol. 4, no. 1, ISSN 0957-4484, pages 49 - 57, XP000946209 [Y] 7,11,17 * abstract * * page 50, column L, line 14 - line 30 * * page 53, column R, line 23 - line 50; figure 4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1088/0957-4484/4/1/004 | [PX] - BENJAMIN S C, "Schemes for parallel quantum computation without local control of qubits", PHYSICAL REVIEW A (ATOMIC, MOLECULAR, AND OPTICAL PHYSICS), FEB. 2000, APS THROUGH AIP, USA, vol. 61, no. 2, ISSN 1050-2947, pages 020301/1 - 4, XP000915374 [PX] 1,5,17,29 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1103/PhysRevA.61.020301 | [A] - BENJAMIN S C ET AL, "A possible nanometer-scale computing device based on an adding cellular automaton", APPLIED PHYSICS LETTERS, 28 APRIL 1997, AIP, USA, vol. 70, no. 17, ISSN 0003-6951, pages 2321 - 2323, XP002149949 [A] 1,5,17,29 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1063/1.118851 |