EP1196331 - DISPENSING CLOSURES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.03.2004 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.11.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 12.01.2005 [2005/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Crown Cork & Seal Technologies Corporation 11535 South Central Avenue Alsip, IL 60803-2599 / US | [2002/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RAMSEY, Christopher, Paul Braeside, Manor Road, Wantage Oxfordshire OX12 8BP / GB | 02 /
KELDER, Maria, Louise 52 Marston Street Oxford OX4 1JU / GB | [2002/16] | Representative(s) | Smith, Debra Jane Clare, et al Carnaudmetalbox PLC, Downsview Road Wantage Oxfordshire OX12 9BP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/16] | Smith, Debra Jane Clare, et al Carnaudmetalbox PLC, Downsview Road Wantage, Oxfordshire OX12 9BP / GB | Application number, filing date | 00942280.9 | 05.07.2000 | [2002/16] | WO2000GB02585 | Priority number, date | GB19990016693 | 16.07.1999 Original published format: GB 9916693 | [2002/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0105674 | Date: | 25.01.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1196331 | Date: | 17.04.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.01.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1196331 | Date: | 14.05.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.01.2001 | Classification | IPC: | B65D51/22 | [2002/16] | CPC: |
B65D51/226 (EP,US);
B65D2251/0015 (EP,US);
B65D2251/0056 (EP,US);
B65D2251/0093 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/16] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AUSGABEVERSCHLUSS | [2002/16] | English: | DISPENSING CLOSURES | [2002/16] | French: | FERMETURES DE DISTRIBUTION | [2002/16] | Entry into regional phase | 31.12.2001 | National basic fee paid | 31.12.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.12.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.02.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 31.12.2001 | Examination requested [2002/16] | 24.10.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.02.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 19.02.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.02.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 14.05.2003 | BE | 14.05.2003 | CH | 14.05.2003 | FI | 14.05.2003 | LI | 14.05.2003 | NL | 14.05.2003 | CY | 05.07.2003 | LU | 05.07.2003 | IE | 07.07.2003 | MC | 31.07.2003 | DK | 14.08.2003 | GR | 14.08.2003 | PT | 14.08.2003 | SE | 14.08.2003 | [2005/02] |
Former [2004/40] | AT | 14.05.2003 | |
BE | 14.05.2003 | ||
CH | 14.05.2003 | ||
FI | 14.05.2003 | ||
LI | 14.05.2003 | ||
NL | 14.05.2003 | ||
CY | 05.07.2003 | ||
LU | 05.07.2003 | ||
IE | 07.07.2003 | ||
DK | 14.08.2003 | ||
GR | 14.08.2003 | ||
PT | 14.08.2003 | ||
SE | 14.08.2003 | ||
Former [2004/39] | AT | 14.05.2003 | |
BE | 14.05.2003 | ||
CH | 14.05.2003 | ||
FI | 14.05.2003 | ||
LI | 14.05.2003 | ||
NL | 14.05.2003 | ||
CY | 05.07.2003 | ||
LU | 05.07.2003 | ||
DK | 14.08.2003 | ||
GR | 14.08.2003 | ||
PT | 14.08.2003 | ||
SE | 14.08.2003 | ||
Former [2004/36] | AT | 14.05.2003 | |
BE | 14.05.2003 | ||
CH | 14.05.2003 | ||
FI | 14.05.2003 | ||
LI | 14.05.2003 | ||
NL | 14.05.2003 | ||
CY | 05.07.2003 | ||
DK | 14.08.2003 | ||
GR | 14.08.2003 | ||
PT | 14.08.2003 | ||
SE | 14.08.2003 | ||
Former [2004/28] | AT | 14.05.2003 | |
BE | 14.05.2003 | ||
CH | 14.05.2003 | ||
FI | 14.05.2003 | ||
LI | 14.05.2003 | ||
NL | 14.05.2003 | ||
DK | 14.08.2003 | ||
GR | 14.08.2003 | ||
PT | 14.08.2003 | ||
SE | 14.08.2003 | ||
Former [2004/23] | AT | 14.05.2003 | |
CH | 14.05.2003 | ||
FI | 14.05.2003 | ||
LI | 14.05.2003 | ||
NL | 14.05.2003 | ||
DK | 14.08.2003 | ||
GR | 14.08.2003 | ||
PT | 14.08.2003 | ||
SE | 14.08.2003 | ||
Former [2004/05] | AT | 14.05.2003 | |
CH | 14.05.2003 | ||
FI | 14.05.2003 | ||
LI | 14.05.2003 | ||
NL | 14.05.2003 | ||
GR | 14.08.2003 | ||
PT | 14.08.2003 | ||
SE | 14.08.2003 | ||
Former [2004/03] | AT | 14.05.2003 | |
CH | 14.05.2003 | ||
LI | 14.05.2003 | ||
NL | 14.05.2003 | ||
GR | 14.08.2003 | ||
PT | 14.08.2003 | ||
SE | 14.08.2003 | ||
Former [2004/02] | CH | 14.05.2003 | |
LI | 14.05.2003 | ||
NL | 14.05.2003 | ||
GR | 14.08.2003 | ||
PT | 14.08.2003 | ||
SE | 14.08.2003 | ||
Former [2004/01] | CH | 14.05.2003 | |
LI | 14.05.2003 | ||
SE | 14.08.2003 | ||
Former [2003/50] | SE | 14.08.2003 | Cited in | International search | [A]GB1152931 (APPLIC TECH ET IND S A T I SA [FR]) [A] * the whole document *; | [A]US5228592 (PELLERANO PIERRE [FR]) [A] 1-3,8 * figure -; claim - *; | [A]US5853109 (ELLIOTT JOHN [US]) [A] 1,2,4-8 * abstract *; | [PA]US6045004 (ELLIOTT JOHN [US]) | by applicant | EP0296100 | EP0473678 |