EP1192743 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR TRANSMITTING AND RECEIVING MESSAGES, IN PARTICULAR IN BROADCAST TRANSMISSIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.08.2011 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 26.06.2013 [2013/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Thomson Licensing 1-5, rue Jeanne d'Arc 92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2010/07] | For all designated states Thomson Licensing 1, rue Jeanne d'Arc 92443 Issy-les-Moulineaux Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2005/40] | For all designated states Thomson Licensing 46, quai Alphonse Le Gallo 92100 Boulogne Billancourt / FR | ||
Former [2004/20] | For all designated states THOMSON Licensing S.A. 46, Quai Alphonse Le Gallo 92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR | ||
Former [2002/38] | For all designated states Canal+ Technologies 34, Place Raoul Dautry 75015 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2002/14] | For all designated states CANAL+ Société Anonyme 85/89 Quai André Citroen 75711 Paris Cedex 15 / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FICHET, Laurent 13, rue Léon Bobin F-78320 Le Mesnil Saint Denis / FR | 02 /
LEPINE, Thierry Canal+ Technologies SA, 34 Place Raoul Dautry F-75516 Paris Cedex 15 / FR | [2002/14] | Representative(s) | Kohrs, Martin TECHNICOLOR 1-5, rue Jeanne d'Arc 92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2010/42] | Kohrs, Martin Technicolor 1-5 rue Jeanne d'Arc 92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR | ||
Former [2010/42] | Kohrs, Martin Thomson 1, rue Jeanne d'Arc 92443 Issy-les-Moulineaux Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2004/38] | Kohrs, Martin Thomson multimedia 46, quai A. Le Gallo 92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR | ||
Former [2003/16] | Rinuy, Santarelli 14, avenue de la Grande Armée 75017 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2003/12] | Stankoff, Hélène, et al Cabinet Rinuy, Santarelli 14 avenue de la Grande Armée 75017 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2002/14] | Cozens, Paul Dennis, et al Mathys & Squire 100 Grays Inn Road London WC1X 8AL / GB | Application number, filing date | 00942314.6 | 03.07.2000 | [2002/14] | WO2000IB00955 | Priority number, date | EP19990401680 | 05.07.1999 Original published format: EP 99401680 | EP19990401958 | 30.07.1999 Original published format: EP 99401958 | [2002/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0103341 | Date: | 11.01.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/02] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1192743 | Date: | 03.04.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.01.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1192743 | Date: | 20.10.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.12.2001 | Classification | IPC: | H04H60/15, H04N7/167 | [2010/22] | CPC: |
H04L12/1895 (EP,US);
H04N7/08 (KR);
H04H60/14 (EP,US);
H04N21/2747 (EP,US);
H04N21/4622 (EP,US);
H04N21/4782 (EP,US);
H04N21/4786 (EP,US);
H04N21/4788 (EP,US);
H04N21/6143 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2002/14] | H04H1/00, H04N7/167 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/14] | Extension states | AL | 21.01.2002 | LT | 21.01.2002 | LV | 21.01.2002 | MK | 21.01.2002 | RO | 21.01.2002 | SI | 21.01.2002 | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG FÜR DIE ÜBERTRAGUNG UND DEN EMPFANG VON DURCHSAGEN, INSBESONDERE IN RUNDFUNKÜBERTRAGUNGEN | [2002/14] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR TRANSMITTING AND RECEIVING MESSAGES, IN PARTICULAR IN BROADCAST TRANSMISSIONS | [2002/14] | French: | DIFFUSION ET RECEPTION DE MESSAGES | [2002/14] | Entry into regional phase | 21.01.2002 | National basic fee paid | 21.01.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.01.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.01.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 21.01.2002 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.01.2002 | Examination requested [2002/14] | 08.03.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.06.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.09.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.01.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.05.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.08.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 30.08.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.07.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 17.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 23.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 24.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 20.10.2010 | BE | 20.10.2010 | CY | 20.10.2010 | DK | 20.10.2010 | FI | 20.10.2010 | IT | 20.10.2010 | NL | 20.10.2010 | SE | 20.10.2010 | GR | 21.01.2011 | ES | 31.01.2011 | PT | 21.02.2011 | IE | 03.07.2011 | LU | 03.07.2011 | [2013/26] |
Former [2013/25] | AT | 20.10.2010 | |
BE | 20.10.2010 | ||
DK | 20.10.2010 | ||
FI | 20.10.2010 | ||
IT | 20.10.2010 | ||
NL | 20.10.2010 | ||
SE | 20.10.2010 | ||
GR | 21.01.2011 | ||
ES | 31.01.2011 | ||
PT | 21.02.2011 | ||
IE | 03.07.2011 | ||
LU | 03.07.2011 | ||
Former [2012/35] | AT | 20.10.2010 | |
BE | 20.10.2010 | ||
DK | 20.10.2010 | ||
FI | 20.10.2010 | ||
IT | 20.10.2010 | ||
NL | 20.10.2010 | ||
SE | 20.10.2010 | ||
GR | 21.01.2011 | ||
ES | 31.01.2011 | ||
PT | 21.02.2011 | ||
IE | 03.07.2011 | ||
Former [2012/03] | AT | 20.10.2010 | |
BE | 20.10.2010 | ||
DK | 20.10.2010 | ||
FI | 20.10.2010 | ||
IT | 20.10.2010 | ||
NL | 20.10.2010 | ||
SE | 20.10.2010 | ||
GR | 21.01.2011 | ||
ES | 31.01.2011 | ||
PT | 21.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/40] | AT | 20.10.2010 | |
BE | 20.10.2010 | ||
DK | 20.10.2010 | ||
FI | 20.10.2010 | ||
NL | 20.10.2010 | ||
SE | 20.10.2010 | ||
GR | 21.01.2011 | ||
ES | 31.01.2011 | ||
PT | 21.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/35] | AT | 20.10.2010 | |
BE | 20.10.2010 | ||
FI | 20.10.2010 | ||
NL | 20.10.2010 | ||
SE | 20.10.2010 | ||
GR | 21.01.2011 | ||
ES | 31.01.2011 | ||
PT | 21.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/31] | AT | 20.10.2010 | |
BE | 20.10.2010 | ||
FI | 20.10.2010 | ||
NL | 20.10.2010 | ||
SE | 20.10.2010 | ||
GR | 21.01.2011 | ||
PT | 21.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/24] | FI | 20.10.2010 | |
NL | 20.10.2010 | ||
SE | 20.10.2010 | ||
PT | 21.02.2011 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0461436 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1,13,22,35,44,54-58 * the whole document *; | [A]FR2672756 (TELEDIFFUSION FSE [FR]) [A] 1,13,22,35,44,54-58 * page 1, line 1 - page 3, line 10; figure 1; claim 1 *; | [A]GB2311442 (MALING REGINALD GEORGE [GB]) [A] 1,13,22,35,44,54-58 * page 1, line 1 - page 4, line 25; figure 1; claims 1,2 *; | [A]EP0817485 (THOMSON MULTIMEDIA SA [FR]) [A] 1,13,22,35,44,54-58 * column 1, line 1 - column 3, line 28; figures 1A,1B; claim 1 *; | [A]WO9808341 (FRANCE TELECOM [FR], et al) [A] 1,13,22,35,44,54-58 * page 1, line 1 - page 3, line 5; claim 1 *; | [A]EP0866613 (CANAL PLUS SA [FR]) [A] 1,13,22,35,44,54-58* column 1, line 1 - column 3, line 21; claim 1 * | Examination | EP0256596 | EP0463451 |