EP1191099 - NOVEL POLYPEPTIDE AND DNA THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.08.2010 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.09.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 24.10.2012 [2012/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Takeda Pharmaceutical Company Limited 1-1, Doshomachi 4-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 541-0045 / JP | [2009/41] |
Former [2004/52] | For all designated states Takeda Pharmaceutical Company Limited 1-1, Doshomachi 4-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-0045 / JP | ||
Former [2002/13] | For all designated states Takeda Chemical Industries, Ltd. 1-1 Doshomachi 4-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-0045 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ITOH, Yasuaki 36-16, Sakuragaoka-machi Tsuchiura-shi, Ibaraki 300-0832 / JP | 02 /
NISHI, Kazunori 16-1-402, Namiki 4-chome Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki 305-0044 / JP | 03 /
OGI, Kazuhiro 16-1-206, Umezono 2-chome Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki 305-0045 / JP | 04 /
OHKUBO, Shoichi 4-23, Chuo 1-chome Usiku-shi, Ibaraki 300-1234 / JP | 05 /
MOGI, Shinichi 17-16, Mizukino 1-chome, Moriya-machi Kitasoma-gun, Ibaraki 302-0121 / JP | 06 /
NOGUCHI, Yuko 13-12-301, Ninomiya 4-chome, Tsukuba-shi Ibaraki 305-0051 / JP | 07 /
YOSHIMURA, Koji 7-9-101, Kasuga 1-chome Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki 305-0821 / JP | 08 /
TANAKA, Hideyuki 7-9-1302, Kasuga 1-chome Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki 305-0821 / JP | [2002/13] | Representative(s) | Keller, Günter, et al Lederer & Keller Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Unsöldstrasse 2 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/13] | Keller, Günter, Dr., et al Lederer & Keller Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstrasse 16 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00942387.2 | 29.06.2000 | [2002/13] | WO2000JP04278 | Priority number, date | JP19990186718 | 30.06.1999 Original published format: JP 18671899 | [2002/13] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0102564 | Date: | 11.01.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1191099 | Date: | 27.03.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.01.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1191099 | Date: | 07.10.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 11.01.2001 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.06.2002 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/12, C12N5/10, C12P21/02, C07K14/47, C07K16/18, A61K45/00, A61K38/17, A61K39/395, A61K49/16, A61P19/02, A61P19/08, A61K31/7088 | [2009/18] | CPC: |
C07K14/4703 (EP,US);
C07K14/47 (KR);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P19/08 (EP);
A61K38/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2002/13] | C12N15/12, C12N5/10, C12P21/02, C07K14/47, C07K16/18, A61K45/00, A61K38/17, A61K39/395, A61K49/16, A61P19/02, A61P19/08, A61K31/7088, // C12P21:02, C12R1:19 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/13] | Extension states | AL | 28.12.2001 | LT | 28.12.2001 | LV | 28.12.2001 | MK | 28.12.2001 | RO | 28.12.2001 | SI | 28.12.2001 | Title | German: | POLYPEPTIDE UND DEREN DNA | [2002/13] | English: | NOVEL POLYPEPTIDE AND DNA THEREOF | [2002/13] | French: | NOUVEAU POLYPEPTIDE ET ADN DE CE POLYPEPTIDE | [2002/13] | Entry into regional phase | 28.12.2001 | Translation filed | 28.12.2001 | National basic fee paid | 28.12.2001 | Search fee paid | 28.12.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.12.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.08.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 28.12.2001 | Examination requested [2002/13] | 17.07.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.11.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.07.2008 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 17.07.2008 | 02.07.2008 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 17.07.2008 | Date of oral proceedings | 17.07.2008 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 03.04.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.07.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 14.07.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.07.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.04.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 16.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 07.10.2009 | BE | 07.10.2009 | CY | 07.10.2009 | DK | 07.10.2009 | FI | 07.10.2009 | IT | 07.10.2009 | NL | 07.10.2009 | SE | 07.10.2009 | GR | 08.01.2010 | ES | 18.01.2010 | PT | 08.02.2010 | IE | 29.06.2010 | LU | 29.06.2010 | MC | 30.06.2010 | [2012/43] |
Former [2012/37] | AT | 07.10.2009 | |
BE | 07.10.2009 | ||
CY | 07.10.2009 | ||
DK | 07.10.2009 | ||
FI | 07.10.2009 | ||
IT | 07.10.2009 | ||
NL | 07.10.2009 | ||
SE | 07.10.2009 | ||
GR | 08.01.2010 | ||
ES | 18.01.2010 | ||
PT | 08.02.2010 | ||
IE | 29.06.2010 | ||
MC | 30.06.2010 | ||
Former [2011/19] | AT | 07.10.2009 | |
BE | 07.10.2009 | ||
DK | 07.10.2009 | ||
FI | 07.10.2009 | ||
IT | 07.10.2009 | ||
NL | 07.10.2009 | ||
SE | 07.10.2009 | ||
GR | 08.01.2010 | ||
ES | 18.01.2010 | ||
PT | 08.02.2010 | ||
IE | 29.06.2010 | ||
MC | 30.06.2010 | ||
Former [2011/14] | AT | 07.10.2009 | |
BE | 07.10.2009 | ||
DK | 07.10.2009 | ||
FI | 07.10.2009 | ||
IT | 07.10.2009 | ||
NL | 07.10.2009 | ||
SE | 07.10.2009 | ||
GR | 08.01.2010 | ||
ES | 18.01.2010 | ||
PT | 08.02.2010 | ||
MC | 30.06.2010 | ||
Former [2011/07] | AT | 07.10.2009 | |
BE | 07.10.2009 | ||
DK | 07.10.2009 | ||
FI | 07.10.2009 | ||
NL | 07.10.2009 | ||
SE | 07.10.2009 | ||
GR | 08.01.2010 | ||
ES | 18.01.2010 | ||
PT | 08.02.2010 | ||
MC | 30.06.2010 | ||
Former [2010/47] | AT | 07.10.2009 | |
BE | 07.10.2009 | ||
DK | 07.10.2009 | ||
FI | 07.10.2009 | ||
NL | 07.10.2009 | ||
SE | 07.10.2009 | ||
GR | 08.01.2010 | ||
ES | 18.01.2010 | ||
PT | 08.02.2010 | ||
Former [2010/35] | AT | 07.10.2009 | |
BE | 07.10.2009 | ||
DK | 07.10.2009 | ||
FI | 07.10.2009 | ||
NL | 07.10.2009 | ||
SE | 07.10.2009 | ||
ES | 18.01.2010 | ||
PT | 08.02.2010 | ||
Former [2010/32] | AT | 07.10.2009 | |
BE | 07.10.2009 | ||
FI | 07.10.2009 | ||
NL | 07.10.2009 | ||
SE | 07.10.2009 | ||
ES | 18.01.2010 | ||
PT | 08.02.2010 | ||
Former [2010/29] | AT | 07.10.2009 | |
BE | 07.10.2009 | ||
FI | 07.10.2009 | ||
SE | 07.10.2009 | ||
ES | 18.01.2010 | ||
PT | 08.02.2010 | ||
Former [2010/22] | FI | 07.10.2009 | |
SE | 07.10.2009 | ||
ES | 18.01.2010 | ||
PT | 08.02.2010 | ||
Former [2010/19] | ES | 18.01.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9831800 (HUMAN GENOME SCIENCES INC [US], et al) [A] 1-24 * pages 58-59; figures 4,5 *; | [E]WO0148203 (TAKEDA CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES LTD [JP], et al) [E] 1-24* the whole document *; | [E]WO0155332 (HYSEQ INC [US], et al) [E] 1-24 * the whole document *; | [X] - ARAKAWA T., ET AL, EMBL, (19990628), Database accession no. AV169321, XP002199699 [X] 1,2 * abstract * | [X] - MARRA M., ET AL, "The WahU-HHMI mouse EST project", EMBL, (19970220), Database accession no. AA222797, XP002199700 [X] 1,2 * abstract * | [A] - BOSSERHOFF ANJA K ET AL, "Mouse CD-RAP/MIA gene: Structure, chromosomal localization, and expression in cartilage and chondrosarcoma.", DEVELOPMENTAL DYNAMICS, (1997), vol. 208, no. 4, ISSN 1058-8388, pages 516 - 525, XP001080394 [A] 1-24 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/(SICI)1097-0177(199704)208:4<516::AID-AJA7>3.0.CO;2-L | [A] - DIETZ UWE H ET AL, "Cloning of a retinoic acid-sensitive mRNA expressed in cartilage and during chondrogenesis.", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, (1996), vol. 271, no. 6, ISSN 0021-9258, pages 3311 - 3316, XP001079161 [A] 1-24 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.271.6.3311 | International search | [X]WO9503328 (BOEHRINGER MANNHEIM GMBH [DE], et al); | [XP]WO9932614 (GENETICS INST [US]); | [X] - BLESCH A. ET AL., "Cloning of a novel malignant melanoma-derived growth-regulatory protein, MIA", CANCER RES., (1994), vol. 54, pages 5695 - 5701, XP002933796 | [X] - BOSSERHOFF A.-K. ET AL., "Structure and promoter analysis of the gene encoding the human melanoma-inhibiting protein MIA", J. BIOL. CHEM., (1996), vol. 271, pages 490 - 495, XP002933797 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.271.1.490 |