EP1112640 - HOME NETWORK SYSTEM FOR TWO-WAY MULTIMEDIA SERVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.01.2009 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.01.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.02.2009 [2009/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416 Maetan-dong Paldal-gu Suwon City, Kyungki-do 442-370 / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2001/27] | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416 Maetan-dong, Paldal-gu Suwon City, Kyungki-do 442-370 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jang, Soon-Mo c/o SAMSUNG ELECT.CO.LTD., 9th floor Samsung Plaza, 263, Seohyeon-Dong, Pundang-Gu Sungnam-Shi, Kyunggi-Do, 463-050 / KR | [2001/29] |
Former [2001/27] | 01 /
Jang, Soon-Mo, Chungmyung maeul Deawoo Apt. 303-1403, Yongtong-dong, Paltal-gu Suwon-shi, Kyonggi-do 442-470 / KR | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/27] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00942508.3 | 12.07.2000 | [2001/27] | WO2000KR00751 | Priority number, date | KR19990028086 | 12.07.1999 Original published format: KR 9928086 | [2001/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0105097 | Date: | 18.01.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1112640 | Date: | 04.07.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.01.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 18.01.2001 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.08.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/28 | [2001/27] | CPC: |
H04N21/43615 (EP);
H04L12/28 (KR);
H04N21/4122 (EP);
H04N21/42204 (EP);
H04N21/4263 (EP);
H04N7/106 (EP);
H04N21/426 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/27] | Title | German: | HEIMNETZSYSTEM FÜR ZWEIWEG-MULTIMEDIADIENST | [2001/27] | English: | HOME NETWORK SYSTEM FOR TWO-WAY MULTIMEDIA SERVICE | [2001/27] | French: | SYSTEME DE RESEAU LOCAL DOMESTIQUE POUR SERVICE MULTIMEDIA BIDIRECTIONNEL | [2001/27] | Entry into regional phase | 12.03.2001 | National basic fee paid | 12.03.2001 | Search fee paid | 12.03.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.03.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.03.2001 | Examination requested [2001/27] | 16.10.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.02.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.06.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.10.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.03.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.08.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/06] | 15.09.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2008 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]US5389963 (LEPLEY JOHN A [US], et al) [Y] 1 * column W * [A] 2-10; | [YA]US5708961 (HYLTON DENNY L [US], et al) [Y] 1 * column 4, line 54 - column 6, line 44 * [A] 2-10; | [A]WO9837648 (NEXT LEVEL COMM [US]) [A] 1-10 * page 9, line 18 - page 13, line 12 *; | [A]EP0430711 (THORN EMI BUSINESS COMMUNICATI [GB]) [A] 1-10 * column 4, line 22 - column 5, line 22 *; | [A]EP0325331 (PHILIPS ELECTRONICS UK LTD [GB], et al) [A] 1-10 * abstract * | [A] - DROITCOURT J L, "UNDERSTANDING HOW INTERACTIVE TELEVISION SET TOP BOX WORKS... AND WHAT IT WILL MEAN TO THE CUSTOMER", INTERNATIONAL BROADCASTING CONVENTION, LONDON, GB, (19950914), vol. 413, pages 382 - 394, XP000562377 [A] 1-10 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1049/cp:19950981 | International search | [A]US5682597 (GANEK ALAN GEORGE [US], et al); | [A]US5721829 (DUNN MATTHEW W [US], et al); | [A]US5920800 (SCHAEFER JOHANN-PETER [DE]) | [A] - BRAVE G., FROIDURE J.C., BLONDEL M., "Impact of clipping distortions on hybrid AM-VSB/16 QAM CATV systems", ELECTROTECHNICAL CONFERENCE. MELECON'96, 8TH MEDITARRANEAN, (1996), vol. 2, pages 1031 - 1034 |