EP1228347 - DOSING DEVICE ADAPTED FOR DISPENSING A CONCENTRATE FROM A HOLDER IN A METERED MANNER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.05.2012 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.05.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.06.2012 [2012/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sara Lee/DE B.V. Keulsekade 143 3532 AA Utrecht / NL | [2011/44] |
Former [2002/32] | For all designated states Sara Lee/DE N.V. Keulsekade 143 3532 AA Utrecht / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BRAMER, Albertus, Maria Bikolaan 63 4105 HB Culemborg / NL | 02 /
D'HOND, Paul, Isodore Berlijnseplein 47 NL-3332 SB Zwijndrecht / NL | [2002/32] | Representative(s) | Prins, Adrianus Willem, et al V.O. Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2002/32] | Prins, Adrianus Willem, et al Vereenigde, Nieuwe Parklaan 97 2587 BN Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 00942550.5 | 20.06.2000 | [2002/32] | WO2000NL00427 | Priority number, date | NL19991012395 | 21.06.1999 Original published format: NL 1012395 | NL19991013392 | 26.10.1999 Original published format: NL 1013392 | NL19991013393 | 26.10.1999 Original published format: NL 1013393 | [2002/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0079223 | Date: | 28.12.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/52] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1228347 | Date: | 07.08.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.12.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.06.2002 | Classification | IPC: | G01F11/22 | [2002/32] | CPC: |
G01F11/22 (EP,KR,US);
A47J31/402 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/32] | Extension states | AL | 21.01.2002 | LT | 21.01.2002 | LV | 21.01.2002 | MK | 21.01.2002 | RO | 21.01.2002 | SI | 21.01.2002 | Title | German: | DOSIERVORRICHTUNG ZUM SPENDEN EINES KONZENTRATES AUS EINEM BEHÄLTER AUF EINE DOSIERTE WEISE | [2002/32] | English: | DOSING DEVICE ADAPTED FOR DISPENSING A CONCENTRATE FROM A HOLDER IN A METERED MANNER | [2002/32] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE DOSAGE CONCU POUR DISTRIBUER UNE QUANTITE DE CONCENTRE A PARTIR D'UN RECIPIENT | [2002/32] | Entry into regional phase | 21.01.2002 | National basic fee paid | 21.01.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.01.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.01.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 21.01.2002 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.01.2002 | Examination requested [2002/32] | 12.02.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.07.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.01.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/26] | 07.02.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2012/26] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.02.2008 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 13.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 16.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2011 | 12   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US4334640 (VAN OVERBRUGGEN GARARDUS J J, et al) [A] 1-13 * column 1, line 9 - line 21 * * column 2, line 21 - column 4, line 64; figures 1-5 *; | [A]EP0067466 (DOUWE EGBERTS TABAKSFAB [NL]) [A] 1-13* page 17, line 1 - page 24, line 19; figures 1-4 *; | [DA]GB2103296 (DAGMA GMBH & CO [DE]) [DA] 1-13 * page 3, line 4 - page 5, line 105; figures 1-3 *; | [A]US5836482 (OPHARDT HERMANN [DE], et al) [A] 1-13 * column 1, line 4 - line 12 * * column 3, line 65 - column 16, line 61; figures 1-13 * | by applicant | US4334690 | EP0067466 | GB2103296 | US5836482 |