EP1190022 - LUBRICATING OIL ADDITIVES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.11.2005 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.10.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 05.11.2008 [2008/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Lubrizol Corporation Patent Dept.-022B, 29400 Lakeland Boulevard Wickliffe, OH 44092-2298 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2002/13] | For all designated states The Lubrizol Corporation Patent Dept.-022B, 29400 Lakeland Boulevard Wickliffe, OH 44092-2298 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHANKLIN, James, R., Jr. 7458 Hunting Lake Drive Concord, OH 44077 / US | 02 /
MATHUR, Naresh, C. 393 Leverett Lane Highland Hts., OH 44143 / US | [2002/13] | Representative(s) | Crisp, David Norman, et al D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/13] | Crisp, David Norman, et al D. YOUNG & CO. 21 New Fetter Lane London EC4A 1DA / GB | Application number, filing date | 00942688.3 | 06.06.2000 | [2002/13] | WO2000US15586 | Priority number, date | US19990329433 | 10.06.1999 Original published format: US 329433 | [2002/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0077132 | Date: | 21.12.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1190022 | Date: | 27.03.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.12.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1190022 | Date: | 29.12.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/53] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.12.2000 | Classification | IPC: | C10M159/12, C10L1/22, C08F8/30, C08G81/02, C08G85/00, // (C10M159/12, 129:92, 129:93, 129:95, 133:02, 133:04, 133:06, 145:12, 145:14), C10M145:16,(C10N20/04, 30:02, 30:04) | [2002/13] | CPC: |
C10M159/12 (EP,US);
C10M129/26 (EP);
C10M129/93 (EP);
C10M129/95 (EP);
C10M133/06 (EP);
C10M133/08 (EP);
C10M143/00 (EP);
C10M143/06 (EP);
C10M143/10 (EP);
C10M145/14 (EP);
C10M145/16 (EP);
C10M2205/00 (EP,US);
C10M2205/02 (EP,US);
C10M2205/026 (EP,US);
C10M2205/04 (EP,US);
C10M2207/10 (EP,US);
C10M2207/129 (EP,US);
C10M2207/34 (EP,US);
C10M2209/084 (EP,US);
C10M2209/086 (EP,US);
C10M2215/04 (EP,US);
C10M2215/042 (EP,US);
C10M2215/22 (EP,US);
C10M2215/221 (EP,US);
C10M2215/225 (EP,US);
C10M2215/226 (EP,US);
C10M2215/26 (EP,US);
C10M2215/30 (EP,US);
C10M2217/046 (EP,US);
C10M2217/06 (EP,US);
C10M2227/00 (EP,US);
C10N2040/25 (EP,US);
C10N2040/251 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C10M159/12, C10M129/26, C10M129/93, C10M129/95, C10M133/06, C10M133/08, C10M143/00, C10M143/06, C10M143/10, C10M145/14, C10M145/16 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2004/32] |
Former [2002/13] | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHMIERÖLZUSÄTZE | [2002/13] | English: | LUBRICATING OIL ADDITIVES | [2002/13] | French: | ADDITIFS POUR HUILES LUBRIFIANTES | [2002/13] | Entry into regional phase | 07.01.2002 | National basic fee paid | 07.01.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.01.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.01.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 07.01.2002 | Examination requested [2002/13] | 23.06.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.10.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 21.10.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.09.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 29.12.2004 | BE | 29.12.2004 | CH | 29.12.2004 | FI | 29.12.2004 | IT | 29.12.2004 | LI | 29.12.2004 | NL | 29.12.2004 | DK | 29.03.2005 | GR | 29.03.2005 | SE | 29.03.2005 | ES | 09.04.2005 | PT | 29.05.2005 | CY | 06.06.2005 | GB | 06.06.2005 | LU | 06.06.2005 | IE | 07.06.2005 | FR | 30.06.2005 | MC | 30.06.2005 | [2008/45] |
Former [2008/03] | AT | 29.12.2004 | |
BE | 29.12.2004 | ||
CH | 29.12.2004 | ||
FI | 29.12.2004 | ||
IT | 29.12.2004 | ||
LI | 29.12.2004 | ||
NL | 29.12.2004 | ||
DK | 29.03.2005 | ||
GR | 29.03.2005 | ||
SE | 29.03.2005 | ||
ES | 09.04.2005 | ||
PT | 29.05.2005 | ||
CY | 06.06.2005 | ||
GB | 06.06.2005 | ||
LU | 06.06.2005 | ||
IE | 07.06.2005 | ||
MC | 30.06.2005 | ||
Former [2007/35] | AT | 29.12.2004 | |
BE | 29.12.2004 | ||
CH | 29.12.2004 | ||
FI | 29.12.2004 | ||
IT | 29.12.2004 | ||
LI | 29.12.2004 | ||
NL | 29.12.2004 | ||
DK | 29.03.2005 | ||
GR | 29.03.2005 | ||
SE | 29.03.2005 | ||
ES | 09.04.2005 | ||
CY | 06.06.2005 | ||
GB | 06.06.2005 | ||
LU | 06.06.2005 | ||
IE | 07.06.2005 | ||
MC | 30.06.2005 | ||
Former [2007/26] | AT | 29.12.2004 | |
BE | 29.12.2004 | ||
CH | 29.12.2004 | ||
FI | 29.12.2004 | ||
LI | 29.12.2004 | ||
NL | 29.12.2004 | ||
DK | 29.03.2005 | ||
GR | 29.03.2005 | ||
SE | 29.03.2005 | ||
ES | 09.04.2005 | ||
CY | 06.06.2005 | ||
GB | 06.06.2005 | ||
LU | 06.06.2005 | ||
IE | 07.06.2005 | ||
MC | 30.06.2005 | ||
Former [2007/20] | AT | 29.12.2004 | |
BE | 29.12.2004 | ||
CH | 29.12.2004 | ||
FI | 29.12.2004 | ||
LI | 29.12.2004 | ||
NL | 29.12.2004 | ||
DK | 29.03.2005 | ||
GR | 29.03.2005 | ||
SE | 29.03.2005 | ||
ES | 09.04.2005 | ||
CY | 06.06.2005 | ||
GB | 06.06.2005 | ||
IE | 07.06.2005 | ||
LU | 30.06.2005 | ||
MC | 30.06.2005 | ||
Former [2007/08] | AT | 29.12.2004 | |
BE | 29.12.2004 | ||
CH | 29.12.2004 | ||
FI | 29.12.2004 | ||
LI | 29.12.2004 | ||
NL | 29.12.2004 | ||
DK | 29.03.2005 | ||
GR | 29.03.2005 | ||
SE | 29.03.2005 | ||
ES | 09.04.2005 | ||
GB | 06.06.2005 | ||
IE | 07.06.2005 | ||
LU | 30.06.2005 | ||
MC | 30.06.2005 | ||
Former [2006/35] | AT | 29.12.2004 | |
BE | 29.12.2004 | ||
CH | 29.12.2004 | ||
FI | 29.12.2004 | ||
LI | 29.12.2004 | ||
NL | 29.12.2004 | ||
DK | 29.03.2005 | ||
GR | 29.03.2005 | ||
ES | 09.04.2005 | ||
GB | 06.06.2005 | ||
IE | 07.06.2005 | ||
MC | 30.06.2005 | ||
Former [2006/28] | AT | 29.12.2004 | |
BE | 29.12.2004 | ||
CH | 29.12.2004 | ||
FI | 29.12.2004 | ||
LI | 29.12.2004 | ||
NL | 29.12.2004 | ||
DK | 29.03.2005 | ||
GR | 29.03.2005 | ||
ES | 09.04.2005 | ||
IE | 07.06.2005 | ||
MC | 30.06.2005 | ||
Former [2006/25] | AT | 29.12.2004 | |
BE | 29.12.2004 | ||
CH | 29.12.2004 | ||
FI | 29.12.2004 | ||
LI | 29.12.2004 | ||
NL | 29.12.2004 | ||
DK | 29.03.2005 | ||
GR | 29.03.2005 | ||
ES | 09.04.2005 | ||
IE | 07.06.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 29.12.2004 | |
BE | 29.12.2004 | ||
CH | 29.12.2004 | ||
FI | 29.12.2004 | ||
LI | 29.12.2004 | ||
NL | 29.12.2004 | ||
DK | 29.03.2005 | ||
GR | 29.03.2005 | ||
ES | 09.04.2005 | ||
Former [2006/12] | AT | 29.12.2004 | |
BE | 29.12.2004 | ||
CH | 29.12.2004 | ||
FI | 29.12.2004 | ||
LI | 29.12.2004 | ||
DK | 29.03.2005 | ||
GR | 29.03.2005 | ||
ES | 09.04.2005 | ||
Former [2005/51] | AT | 29.12.2004 | |
BE | 29.12.2004 | ||
FI | 29.12.2004 | ||
GR | 29.03.2005 | ||
Former [2005/36] | AT | 29.12.2004 | |
FI | 29.12.2004 | ||
GR | 29.03.2005 | ||
Former [2005/26] | FI | 29.12.2004 | |
GR | 29.03.2005 | ||
Former [2005/24] | FI | 29.12.2004 | Cited in | International search | [DA]US3933761 (COLEMAN LESTER EARL) [DA] 1-3,5-12,14,28,30,36,37 * example 23 *; | [A]US4594378 (TIPTON CRAIG D [US], et al) [A] 1-3,5-9,11,14,15,27,36,37 * example 32B1 *; | [DA]EP0352072 (EXXON CHEMICAL PATENTS INC [US]) [DA] 1-37 * the whole document *; | [DA]EP0759443 (LUBRIZOL CORP [US]) [DA] 24 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0773234 (SHELL INT RESEARCH [NL]) [A] 1-37 * the whole document *; | [DA]EP0775740 (BP CHEMICALS ADDITIVES [GB]); | [DA]EP0825249 (CHEVRON CHEM CO [US]) [DA] 1-37 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0853115 (LUBRIZOL CORP [US]) [A] 1-3,5-15,27,28,30,36,37 * example 7N; claims 1-13 * |