03.10.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.11.2008 [2008/45] |
14.12.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.01.2008 [2008/03] |
27.07.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.08.2007 [2007/35] |
25.05.2007 |
Change - lapse in a contracting state |
published on 27.06.2007 [2007/26] |
13.04.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.05.2007 [2007/20] |
26.01.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.02.2007 [2007/09] |
19.01.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.02.2007 [2007/08] |
28.07.2006 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.08.2006 [2006/35] |
09.06.2006 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.07.2006 [2006/28] |
19.05.2006 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.06.2006 [2006/25] |
17.02.2006 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] |
03.02.2006 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.03.2006 [2006/12] |
04.11.2005 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.12.2005 [2005/51] |
04.11.2005 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 21.12.2005 [2005/51] |
22.07.2005 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.09.2005 [2005/36] |
13.05.2005 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.06.2005 [2005/26] |
29.04.2005 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.06.2005 [2005/24] |
12.11.2004 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 29.12.2004 [2004/53] |
29.10.2004 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
29.10.2004 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
02.07.2004 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
18.06.2004 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
18.06.2004 |
Change - designated states |
published on 04.08.2004 [2004/32] |
04.07.2003 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
13.08.2002 |
Change - extension states |
|
05.07.2002 |
Renewal fee |
|
08.02.2002 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 27.03.2002 [2002/13] |
08.02.2002 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 27.03.2002 [2002/13] |
06.02.2002 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
31.01.2002 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
06.02.2001 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
27.12.2000 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
25.10.2000 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
09.08.2000 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|