Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU770789B | Global Dossier | 04.03.2004 | B2 | AU5727600 | 02.01.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | US32943399 | 10.06.1999 | US0015586 | 06.06.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1190022 | Global Dossier | 29.12.2004 | B1 | EP1190022 | 27.03.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US32943399 | 10.06.1999 | US0015586 | 06.06.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE286113T | 15.01.2005 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US32943399 | 10.06.1999 | US0015586 | 06.06.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2376637 | 21.12.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US32943399 | 10.06.1999 | US0015586 | 06.06.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE60017129T | 12.01.2006 | T2 | DE60017129D1 | 03.02.2005 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US32943399 | 10.06.1999 | US0015586 | 06.06.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO0077132 | Global Dossier | 21.12.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US32943399 | 10.06.1999 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6071862 | 06.06.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | US32943399 | 10.06.1999 |