EP1185490 - PROCESS FOR INCREASING THE SELECTIVITY OF A REACTION TO CONVERT OXYGENATES TO OLEFINS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.11.2005 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 16.01.2008 [2008/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ExxonMobil Chemical Patents Inc. 5200 Bayway Drive Baytown, TX 77520 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2002/11] | For all designated states ExxonMobil Chemical Patents Inc. 5200 Bayway Drive Baytown, TX 77520-5200 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KUECHLER, Keith, H. 912 Applewood Drive Friendswood, TX 77546 / US | 02 /
SUN, Hsiang-ning 4212 Villanova Houston, TX 77005 / US | 03 /
KUECHLER, William, L., Sr. 3 Rum Row Hilton Road, SC 29928 / US | [2002/11] | Representative(s) | Mareschal, Anne, et al ExxonMobil Chemical Europe Inc. IP Law Europe Hermeslaan 2 1831 Machelen / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/11] | Mareschal, Anne, et al ExxonMobil Chemical Europe Inc., P.O. Box 105 1830 Machelen / BE | Application number, filing date | 00942775.8 | 13.06.2000 | [2002/11] | WO2000US16185 | Priority number, date | US19990333278 | 15.06.1999 Original published format: US 333278 | [2002/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0076944 | Date: | 21.12.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1185490 | Date: | 13.03.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.12.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1185490 | Date: | 19.01.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.12.2000 | Classification | IPC: | C07C1/20, C07C1/32, C07C1/26, C07C1/207 | [2002/11] | CPC: |
C07C1/322 (EP,US);
C07C1/20 (EP,US);
C07C1/26 (EP,US);
C07C1/323 (EP,US);
C07C2529/85 (EP,US);
Y02P30/20 (EP,US);
Y02P30/40 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C07C1/20, C07C11/02 (EP,US);
C07C1/26, C07C11/02 (US,EP);
C07C1/322, C07C11/02 (US,EP);
C07C1/323, C07C11/02 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/11] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ERHÖHUNG DER SELEKTIVITÄT EINER REAKTION ZUR UMSETZUNG VON SAUERSTOFFVERBINDUNGEN IN OLEFINEN | [2002/11] | English: | PROCESS FOR INCREASING THE SELECTIVITY OF A REACTION TO CONVERT OXYGENATES TO OLEFINS | [2002/11] | French: | PROCEDE PERMETTANT D'AUGMENTER LA SELECTIVITE D'UNE REACTION AFIN DE TRANSFORMER DES COMPOSES OXYGENES EN OLEFINES | [2002/11] | Entry into regional phase | 14.12.2001 | National basic fee paid | 14.12.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.12.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.12.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 14.12.2001 | Examination requested [2002/11] | 20.03.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.09.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.02.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.06.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 15.06.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.10.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 19.01.2005 | CH | 19.01.2005 | FI | 19.01.2005 | FR | 19.01.2005 | IT | 19.01.2005 | LI | 19.01.2005 | DK | 19.04.2005 | GR | 19.04.2005 | SE | 19.04.2005 | CY | 13.06.2005 | GB | 13.06.2005 | IE | 13.06.2005 | LU | 13.06.2005 | PT | 19.06.2005 | MC | 30.06.2005 | [2008/03] |
Former [2007/35] | AT | 19.01.2005 | |
CH | 19.01.2005 | ||
FI | 19.01.2005 | ||
FR | 19.01.2005 | ||
IT | 19.01.2005 | ||
LI | 19.01.2005 | ||
DK | 19.04.2005 | ||
GR | 19.04.2005 | ||
SE | 19.04.2005 | ||
CY | 13.06.2005 | ||
GB | 13.06.2005 | ||
IE | 13.06.2005 | ||
LU | 13.06.2005 | ||
MC | 30.06.2005 | ||
Former [2007/26] | AT | 19.01.2005 | |
CH | 19.01.2005 | ||
FI | 19.01.2005 | ||
FR | 19.01.2005 | ||
LI | 19.01.2005 | ||
DK | 19.04.2005 | ||
GR | 19.04.2005 | ||
SE | 19.04.2005 | ||
CY | 13.06.2005 | ||
GB | 13.06.2005 | ||
IE | 13.06.2005 | ||
LU | 13.06.2005 | ||
MC | 30.06.2005 | ||
Former [2007/20] | AT | 19.01.2005 | |
CH | 19.01.2005 | ||
FI | 19.01.2005 | ||
FR | 19.01.2005 | ||
LI | 19.01.2005 | ||
DK | 19.04.2005 | ||
GR | 19.04.2005 | ||
SE | 19.04.2005 | ||
CY | 13.06.2005 | ||
GB | 13.06.2005 | ||
IE | 13.06.2005 | ||
LU | 30.06.2005 | ||
MC | 30.06.2005 | ||
Former [2007/08] | AT | 19.01.2005 | |
CH | 19.01.2005 | ||
FI | 19.01.2005 | ||
FR | 19.01.2005 | ||
LI | 19.01.2005 | ||
DK | 19.04.2005 | ||
GR | 19.04.2005 | ||
SE | 19.04.2005 | ||
GB | 13.06.2005 | ||
IE | 13.06.2005 | ||
LU | 30.06.2005 | ||
MC | 30.06.2005 | ||
Former [2006/35] | AT | 19.01.2005 | |
CH | 19.01.2005 | ||
FI | 19.01.2005 | ||
FR | 19.01.2005 | ||
LI | 19.01.2005 | ||
DK | 19.04.2005 | ||
GR | 19.04.2005 | ||
SE | 19.04.2005 | ||
GB | 13.06.2005 | ||
IE | 13.06.2005 | ||
MC | 30.06.2005 | ||
Former [2006/31] | AT | 19.01.2005 | |
CH | 19.01.2005 | ||
FI | 19.01.2005 | ||
FR | 19.01.2005 | ||
LI | 19.01.2005 | ||
DK | 19.04.2005 | ||
GR | 19.04.2005 | ||
SE | 19.04.2005 | ||
IE | 13.06.2005 | ||
MC | 30.06.2005 | ||
Former [2006/28] | AT | 19.01.2005 | |
CH | 19.01.2005 | ||
FI | 19.01.2005 | ||
LI | 19.01.2005 | ||
DK | 19.04.2005 | ||
GR | 19.04.2005 | ||
SE | 19.04.2005 | ||
IE | 13.06.2005 | ||
MC | 30.06.2005 | ||
Former [2006/25] | AT | 19.01.2005 | |
CH | 19.01.2005 | ||
FI | 19.01.2005 | ||
LI | 19.01.2005 | ||
DK | 19.04.2005 | ||
GR | 19.04.2005 | ||
SE | 19.04.2005 | ||
IE | 13.06.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 19.01.2005 | |
CH | 19.01.2005 | ||
FI | 19.01.2005 | ||
LI | 19.01.2005 | ||
DK | 19.04.2005 | ||
GR | 19.04.2005 | ||
SE | 19.04.2005 | ||
Former [2006/12] | AT | 19.01.2005 | |
CH | 19.01.2005 | ||
FI | 19.01.2005 | ||
LI | 19.01.2005 | ||
DK | 19.04.2005 | ||
SE | 19.04.2005 | ||
Former [2005/51] | AT | 19.01.2005 | |
FI | 19.01.2005 | ||
SE | 19.04.2005 | ||
Former [2005/48] | FI | 19.01.2005 | |
SE | 19.04.2005 | ||
Former [2005/46] | FI | 19.01.2005 | Cited in | International search | [X]WO9324431 (EXXON CHEMICAL PATENTS INC [US]) [X] 1-14* page 13; claim - * |